Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CHRIS OGILVIE VS THEODORE OGILVIE
A Statement For Reg Of California Supp Order - Dcss case was filed in the jurisdiction of Butte County. Judge David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 27, 1994
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
Butte County, CA
Category
Statement for Reg of California Supp Order - DCSS
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Child Support
Status
Foreign,Sister-State Judgment
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case File Imaged CASE PREPARED FOR IMAGING Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARN |
|
November 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information PROOF OF MAILING NTC RE PYMT SUPP T OLGILVIE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC |
|
November 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information PROOF OF MAILING NTC RE PYMT SUPPORT C CORLEY-OGILVIE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC |
|
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC RE PAYMENT OF SUPPORT (FC4200) (FORMER APP & ORD TO PAY THRU DCSS/BCFTF) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TLC |
|
September 05, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER AFTER HEARING Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: LLM | |
September 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS MTN FOR MOD OF C/S, H/C Desc2: *FILED 5-15-06* Desc3: CONT'D FROM 8-22-06 Disp Code: 342 - HEARD/ORDERS MADE Disp Clerk: LLM Filing Clerk: LLM Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
September 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration RESPONSE TO GOVERNMENTAL NTC OF MTN BY RESP Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
August 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS MTN FOR MOD OF C/S, H/S Desc2: FILED 5-15-06*CONT'D BY STIP & ORDER* Disp Code: 342 - HEARD IN PART-CONT TO 9-5-06 Disp Clerk: LLM Filing Clerk: SAT Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
August 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS MTN FOR MOD OF C/S & H/C Desc2: *FILED 5-15-06* Disp Code: 906 - CONTINUED TO 8-22-06 Disp Clerk: SAT Filing Clerk: LLM Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
August 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order STIP & ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING CK12333 HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 547470 Fee Amount: 20.00 Entry Clerk: SAT 494 - $20.00 |
|
August 04, 2006 | Docket Event | INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION [R] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARR | |
June 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAIL OF NTC OF MTN FILED 8-15-06 ON THEODORE & CHRIS OGILVIE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: LLM |
|
May 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
RFO-OSC-MTN - Other (Non DCSS) NTC OF MTN FILED BY DCSS FOR MOD OF C/S & H/C Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 40.00 Entry Clerk: LLM 495 - $40.00 |
|
April 19, 1994 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Issued ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 7.00 Entry Clerk: MAE 40 - $7.00 |
|
February 17, 1994 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: GME | |
February 01, 1994 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information APPL FOR ORD & ORD TO PAY THROUGH FAMILY TRUST FUND AND APPT OF DA TO ENFORCE SUPPORT ORDERS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KMH |
|
January 27, 1994 | Docket Event | STATEMENT FOR REGISTRATION OF FOREIGN SUPPORT ORDER & CLERK'S NOTICE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KMH | |
January 27, 1994 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE(170.6) JUDGE AHR BY: DA Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KMH |