Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
BENDOR JEWELRY INC VS GONZALEZ, ENRIQUE
On July 12, 2011 contract & indebtedness case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 12, 2011
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Miami-Dade County, FL
Category
Contract & Indebtedness
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Default Judgment
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Returned Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Certificate of No Objections to Production Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice: Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of: LOST ORIGINAL SUMMONS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Text ORIGINAL MAILED TO ATTORNEY SPRECHAMAN & ASSOCIATES Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Execution Issued $ 64001.16 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Gonzalez Enrico; Gonzalez Enrique |
|
January 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Default Final Judgment $ 0.00 BK:27979 PG:0521 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Gonzalez Enrique |
|
January 25, 2012 | hearing |
Default Final Judgment $ 0.00 BK:27979 PG:0521 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Final Disposition Document Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Affidavit as to Attorney Fees Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Affidavit as to Costs Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Proof(claim) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
December 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Affidavit as to Interest Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Gonzalez Enrique |
|
October 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Non-Military Affidavit Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
October 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Service Returned BADGE # 898 P 09/13/2011 Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Gonzalez Enrique |
|
July 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Complaint Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Gonzalez Enrique |