Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
JORGE A. ARROYO-CORDOVA VS. CARMEN PEREZ-RAMIREZ
On September 10, 2007 a petition for dissolution with children case was filed by Arroyo-Cordova, Jorge A., against Perez-Ramirez, Carmen, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 10, 2007
Last Refreshed
November 06, 2022
Filing Location
San Francisco County, CA
Category
PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
1 year, 11 months and 6 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2009 | Docket Event | COPYING FEES PAID BY PETITIONER ARROYO-CORDOVA, JORGE A. | |
June 18, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
June 18, 2008 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT, DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE, MARITAL STATUS ENDS JUN-13-2008 | |
June 13, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF RESERVATION OF CHILD SUPPORT BY NON-CUSTODIAL PARENT FILED BY PETITIONER ARROYO-CORDOVA, JORGE A. | |
June 11, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION REGARDING OUT OF COUNTRY SERVICE FILED BY PETITIONER ARROYO-CORDOVA, JORGE A. | |
June 11, 2008 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT CHECK LIST FILED BY PETITIONER ARROYO-CORDOVA, JORGE A. | |
June 11, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT (FAMILY LAW) WITH ATTACHED INCOME AND EXPENSE AS TO RESPONDENT PEREZ-RAMIREZ, CARMEN | |
June 11, 2008 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons FILED BY PETITIONER ARROYO-CORDOVA, JORGE A. | |
June 11, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT | |
June 11, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FILED BY PETITIONER ARROYO-CORDOVA, JORGE A. | |
June 11, 2008 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE STATEMENT FILED BY PETITIONER ARROYO-CORDOVA, JORGE A. | |
May 12, 2008 | Docket Event | DEFAULT REQUEST/JUDGMENT RECEIVED PRO PER | |
September 17, 2007 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO CRC 3.50 - 3.63 AS TO PETITIONER ARROYO-CORDOVA, JORGE A. | |
September 10, 2007 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED BY PETITIONER ARROYO-CORDOVA, JORGE A. AS TO RESPONDENT PEREZ-RAMIREZ, CARMEN Summons ISSUED AND FILED | |
September 10, 2007 | Docket Event | APPLICATION PENDING FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68511.3 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PETITIONER ARROYO-CORDOVA, JORGE A. |