Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO VS. DAVID PLATA
On January 31, 2003 a summons and complaint regarding parental obligations case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. Judge Rebecca L. Wightman presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 31, 2003
Last Refreshed
August 29, 2023
Filing Location
San Francisco County, CA
Category
SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT REGARDING PARENTAL OBLIGATIONS
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Other Parent-Child
Status
Other
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED 10/08/2014; PERSONS SERVED: DAVID PLATA AND BRENDA LARA | |
October 08, 2014 | hearing |
NOTICE OF MOTION TO MODIFY SUPPORT ORDER Modification of Child Support
Judge: REBECCA L. WIGHTMAN |
|
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION FOR Modification of Child Support ON OCT-08-2014 - RE CHILD SUPPORT GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER | |
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER AFTER HEARING -HEARD ON 10/08/14 FILED BY PETITIONER CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO | |
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR OCT-08-2014 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 416 | |
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION TO MODIFY SUPPORT ORDER Modification of Child Support FILED BY PETITIONER CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO HEARING SET FOR OCT-08-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 416 | |
August 23, 2011 | hearing |
NOTICE OF MOTION TO MODIFY SUPPORT ORDER
Judge: REBECCA L. WIGHTMAN |
|
August 23, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION TO MODIFY SUPPORT ORDER ON AUG-23-2011 OFF CALENDAR -REQUESTED BY CSA = SAPORITO. | |
August 23, 2011 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR AUG-23-2011 8:30 AM FOR DEPT 416 | |
August 02, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION TO MODIFY SUPPORT ORDER FILED BY PETITIONER CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO HEARING SET FOR AUG-23-2011 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT 416 | |
July 07, 2003 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES | |
June 30, 2003 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT REGARDING PARENTAL OBLIGATIONS | |
June 19, 2003 | hearing |
NOTICE OF MOTION TO MODIFY SUPPORT ORDER
Judge: REBECCA L. WIGHTMAN |
|
June 19, 2003 | Docket Event | MOTION TO MODIFY SUPPORT ORDER ; SET ASIDE JUDGMENT ON JUN-19-2003 - RE CHILD SUPPORT GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER | |
June 19, 2003 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR JUN-19-2003 8:30 AM FOR DEPT 416 | |
May 23, 2003 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM - FAMILY COURT SERVICES - OPEN/CLOSED/MED.C.V., MEDIATOR ASSIGNED TO CASE: Z | |
May 22, 2003 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES | |
May 22, 2003 | Docket Event | RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY PETITIONER CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO | |
May 20, 2003 | hearing |
Order To Show Cause Re: Child Custody & Vistation
Judge: REBECCA L. WIGHTMAN |
|
May 20, 2003 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR MAY-20-2003 8:55 AM FOR DEPT 416 | |
May 20, 2003 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION TO MODIFY SUPPORT ORDER ; SET ASIDE JUDGMENT FILED BY RESPONDENT PLATA, DAVID HEARING SET FOR JUN-19-2003 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT 416 | |
May 20, 2003 | Docket Event | ORDER RE: WAIVER OF FEES ON TITLE IV-D MATTERS FOR RESPONDENT PLATA, DAVID | |
May 20, 2003 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CHILD CUSTODY & VISTATION ON MAY-20-2003 - GRANTED PER STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED THIS DATE. | |
May 20, 2003 | Docket Event | STIPULATION RE: HEARING BEFORE A TEMPORAY PRO TEM JUDGE FILED BY CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO LARA, BRENDA | |
May 20, 2003 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
May 09, 2003 | Docket Event | BRENDA LARA APPEARED FOR ORIENTATION ON MAY-08-2003 | |
May 09, 2003 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (CSS) FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES | |
May 09, 2003 | Docket Event | DAVID PLATA APPEARED FOR ORIENTATION ON MAY-08-2003 | |
May 07, 2003 | Docket Event | DOCUMENT IN SUPPORT OF CHILD SUPPORT ACTION | |
May 05, 2003 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT REGARDING PARENTAL OBLIGATIONS | |
May 05, 2003 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT | |
April 30, 2003 | hearing |
Order To Show Cause Re: Child Custody & Vistation
Judge: REBECCA L. WIGHTMAN |
|
April 30, 2003 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR APR-30-2003 8:55 AM FOR DEPT 416 | |
April 30, 2003 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CHILD CUSTODY & VISTATION ON APR-30-2003 CONTINUED TO CHILD CUSTODY/VISITATION CALENDAR ON MAY-20-2003 AT 8:55 AM IN DEPT. 416 - | |
April 07, 2003 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PETITIONER CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO AS TO RESPONDENT PLATA, DAVID | |
March 13, 2003 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CHILD CUSTODY & VISTATION FILED BY OTHER PARENT LARA, BRENDA AS TO RESPONDENT PLATA, DAVID HEARING SET FOR APR-30-2003 AT 08:55 AM IN DEPT 416 | |
February 26, 2003 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES | |
February 24, 2003 | Docket Event | DECLARATION AMENDED PROPOSED JUDGMENT | |
February 18, 2003 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (Summons AND COMPLAINT) | |
February 10, 2003 | Docket Event | DOCUMENT IN SUPPORT OF CHILD SUPPORT ACTION | |
February 04, 2003 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES (Summons AND COMPLAINT & PROPOSED JUDGMENT) | |
January 31, 2003 | Docket Event | Summons AND COMPLAINT REGARDING PARENTAL OBLIGATIONS FSB # 91406 FILED BY PETITIONER CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO AS TO RESPONDENT PLATA, DAVID Summons ISSUED |