Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
SHERYL A FREDRICKSEN-N-KENNETH ST JOHN
A Dv Prevention W/O Minor Children case was filed in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. Judge Dorr, James M presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 31, 2012
Last Refreshed
November 20, 2022
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Daniel, Deborah;Category
DV Prevention w/o Minor Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Domestic Violence
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Judgment (Other)
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2020 | hearing | Default Department Changed Comment DEFAULT DPT. CHANGED FROM DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM S51 TO S52. TO . | |
September 24, 2012 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Dorr, James M Comment HEARING ON DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY SHERYL A FREDRICKSEN James M Dorr,JUDGE CLERK: ANDREA ROMERO COURT REPORTER RHONDA BROWN;8134 BAILIFF: C BARAJAS - APPEARANCES: PETITIONER SHERYL A FREDRICKSEN PRESENT PARTIES NOT PRESENT: KENNETH ST JOHN - PROCEEDINGS: OSC/MOTION HELD. THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE AND NO CONTACT WITH THE COURT BY RESPONDENT, COURT PROCEEDS AT: 08:43 WITNESS -- SHERYL A FREDRICKSEN IS SWORN AND EXAMINED. AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT : COURT FINDS: REQUESTED ORDERS GRANTED - RESTRAINING ORDERS KENNETH ST JOHN IS ENJOINED AND RESTRAINED FROM HARASS, ATTACK, STRIKE, THREATEN, ASSAULT (SEXUALLY OR OTHERWISE), HIT, FOLLOW, STALK, DESTROY PERSONAL PROPERTY, KEEP UNDER SURVEILLANCE, OR BLOCK MOVEMENTS. CONTACT (EITHER DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY), OR TELEPHONE, OR SEND MESSAGES OR E-MAIL TAKE ANY ACTION, DIRECTLY OR THROUGH OTHERS, TO GET THE ADDRESSES OR LOCATION OF ANY PROTECTED PERSONS OR OF THEIR FAMILY MEMBERS, CARETAKERS, OR GUARDIANS. PEACEFUL WRITTEN CONTACT THROUGH A LAWYER OR A PROCESS SERVER OR OTHER PERSON FOR SERVICE OF LEGAL PAPERS RELATED TO A COURT CASE DOES NOT VIOLATE THESE ORDERS KENNETH ST JOHN MUST STAY AT LEAST 100 YARDS FROM: PETITIONER,SHERYL A FREDRICKSEN PROTECTED PERSON(S) RESIDENCE PROTECTED PERSON(S) VEHICLE(S) RESTRAINED PERSON MUST MOVE OUT IMMEDIATELY FROM AND NOT RETURN TO THE RESIDENCE LOCATED AT; 1148 HANCOCK ST., SAN BERNARDINO, CA 92411 THE PROTECTED PERSON MAY RECORD ANY PROHIBITED COMMUNICATIONS MADE TO HIM OR HER BY THE RESTRAINED PERSON. SHERYL A FREDRICKSEN IS GIVEN THE SOLE POSSESSION, CARE, AND CONTROL OF THE ANIMALS LISTED BELOW. KENNETH ST JOHN MUST STAY AT LEAST 100 YARDS AWAY FROM AND NOT TAKE,SELL TRANSFER,ENCUMBER,CONCEAL,MOLEST,ATTACK,STRIKE, THREATEN, HARM, OR OTHERWISE DISPOSE OF THE FOLLOWING ANIMALS: DOG "BROWNIE" THE RESTRAINED PERSON CANNOT OWN, HAVE, BUY OR TRY TO BUY, RECEIVE OR TRY TO RECEIVE, OR IN ANY OTHER WAY GET A GUN OR FIREARM. SHERYL A FREDRICKSEN MUST SELL TO A LICENSED GUN DEALER OR TURN IN TO POLICE ANY GUNS OR FIREARMS THAT HE OR SHE HAS OR CONTROLS. THIS MUST BE DONE WITHIN 24 HOURS OF BEING SERVED WITH THIS ORDER. SHERYL A FREDRICKSEN MUST BRING A RECEIPT TO THE COURT WITHIN 48 HOURS OF RECEIVING THIS ORDER,TO PROVE THAT GUNS OR FIREARMS HAVE BEEN TURNED IN OR SOLD. THIS ORDER SHALL EXPIRE AT MIDNIGHT ON 09/24/15 THE PREVAILING PARTY/SHERYL A FREDRICKSEN SHALL PREPARE THE ORDER AFTER HEARING AND TRANSMIT COPIES OF IT TO THE APPROPRIATE LAW ENFORCEMENT AGENCIES. COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING.(FL) DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING (FL) ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
September 24, 2012 | hearing | Restraining Order After Hearing Filed Comment RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING (CLETS) FILED. HEARING DATE: 09/24/12. ORDER EXPIRES: 09/24/15. | |
September 24, 2012 | hearing | Hearing on Domestic Violence Original Type Hearing on Domestic Violence Judicial Officer Dorr, James M Hearing Time 08:30 AM Result Held Comment HEARING ON DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY SHERYL A FREDRICKSEN | |
September 06, 2012 | hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF RESTRAINING ORDER ETC BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 09/05/12 AS TO KENNETH ST JOHN, FILED. | |
September 04, 2012 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Daniel, Deborah Comment EX-PARTE MOTION RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE DEBORAH A DANIEL,COMMISSIONER CLERK: JOHN FILES COURT REPORTER RHONDA BROWN;8134 BAILIFF: C BARAJAS - APPEARANCES: PETITIONER SHERYL A FREDRICKSEN PRESENT PARTIES NOT PRESENT: KENNETH ST JOHN - PROCEEDINGS: OSC/MOTION HELD. EX PARTE ORDERS GRANTED SET COURT DATE 09/24/12 8:30AM DEPT S11 ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
September 04, 2012 | hearing | Declaration Regarding Ex Parte Notice Filed Comment DECLARATION REGARDING EX-PARTE NOTICE FILED. | |
September 04, 2012 | hearing | Case Assigned for All Purposes Comment CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S11 | |
September 04, 2012 | hearing | Temporary Restraining Order re: Domestic Violence Prevention Comment TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE PREVENTION) FILED BY SHERYL A FREDRICKSEN. | |
September 04, 2012 | hearing | Temporary Restraining Order re: Domestic Violence Prevention Comment NOTICE OF HEARING (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE PREVENTION)FILED BY SHERYL A FREDRICKSEN. | |
September 04, 2012 | hearing | Ex Parte Hearing Original Type Ex Parte Hearing Judicial Officer Daniel, Deborah Hearing Time 8:15 AM Result Held Comment EX-PARTE MOTION RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE | |
August 31, 2012 | hearing | Certificate of Assignment Received Comment CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. | |
August 31, 2012 | hearing | Ex Parte Filed Re: Comment EX PARTE RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY SHERYL A FREDRICKSEN | |
August 31, 2012 | hearing | Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER DOMESTIC VIOLENCE PREVENTION | |
August 31, 2012 | hearing | Request and Party Information Entered (DV) Comment REQUEST AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.(DV) |