Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
JULIO DE SANTIAGO-N-YESENIA DE SANTIAGO
A Dissolution W/ Minor Children case was filed in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. Judge Duke D. Rouse presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 31, 2012
Last Refreshed
November 20, 2022
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Category
Dissolution w/ Minor Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Transfer
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 03, 2017 | hearing | Default Department Changed Comment DEFAULT DPT. CHANGED FROM DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM S52 TO S44. TO . | |
December 22, 2014 | hearing | Update Party Address Comment PARTY YESENIA DE SANTIAGO UPDATED: ADDRESS | |
December 22, 2014 | hearing | Substitution of Attorney Filed Comment SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING DS41/ WITH PRO/PER AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR YESENIA DE SANTIAGO. | |
September 16, 2014 | hearing | Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed Comment NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON RESERVED ISSUES | |
September 16, 2014 | hearing | Judgment on Reserved Issues Filed Comment JUDGMENT ON RESERVED ISSUES | |
September 09, 2014 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Rouse, Duke D Comment HEARING RE: RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT DUKE D ROUSE,JUDGE CLERK: TRACEE TAYLOR COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE BAILIFF: T TERBEST - APPEARANCES: PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JULIO DE SANTIAGO, YESENIA DE SANTIAGO ATTORNEY DAVID HEISLER'S OFFICE FOR THE PETITIONER MAKES A TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE DIANA SPIDALL FOR YESENIA DE SANTIAGO NOT PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR HEARING RE: RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT.. OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: JUDGMENT TO BE SUBMITTED TO THE COURT. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
September 09, 2014 | hearing | Hearing Re: Original Type Hearing Re: Judicial Officer Rouse, Duke D Hearing Time 8:30 AM Cancel Reason Off Calendar Comment HEARING RE: RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT | |
July 01, 2014 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Rouse, Duke D Comment HEARING RE: RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT DUKE D ROUSE,JUDGE CLERK: TRACEE TAYLOR COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE BAILIFF: T KAUKANI - APPEARANCES: PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JULIO DE SANTIAGO, YESENIA DE SANTIAGO ATTORNEY DAVID HEISLER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. ATTORNEY DIANA SPIDALL PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD MATTER CONTINUED BY STIPULATION. REASON: FOR SETTLEMENT AND RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/09/14 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S52. NOTICE WAIVED. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
July 01, 2014 | hearing | Hearing Re: Original Type Hearing Re: Judicial Officer Rouse, Duke D Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Continued Party's motion Comment HEARING RE: RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT | |
June 12, 2014 | hearing | Case Transferred to New Department Comment CASE TRANSFERRED TO NEW DEPARTMENT | |
April 11, 2014 | hearing | Notice Filed re: Comment NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY JULIO DE SANTIAGO. | |
March 24, 2014 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Rouse, Duke D Comment MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE DUKE D ROUSE,JUDGE CLERK: TRACEE TAYLOR COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE BAILIFF: C BARAJAS - APPEARANCES: PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JULIO DE SANTIAGO, YESENIA DE SANTIAGO ATTORNEY DAVID HEISLER'S OFFICE MAKES A TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE DIANA SPIDALL FOR YESENIA DE SANTIAGO NOT PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD MATTER CONTINUED BY STIPULATION. REASON: FOR RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT. - HEARINGS: HEARING RE:RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT SET FOR 07/01/14 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S12. COUNSEL FOR THE PETITIONER TO GIVE NOTICE. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
March 24, 2014 | hearing | Mandatory Settlement Conference Original Type Mandatory Settlement Conference Judicial Officer Rouse, Duke D Hearing Time 08:30 AM Result Held Comment MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | |
February 10, 2014 | hearing | Notice Filed re: Comment NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MAND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY JULIO DE SANTIAGO. | |
January 29, 2014 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment VOLUNTARY FAMILY LAW MEDIATION SESSION SETTLEMENT OFFICER: RICHARD G VOGL CLERK: CARNESHA BULLOCKS - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY DAVID H HEISLER (BRANDY) PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. - PROCEEDINGS: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD. MATTER CONTINUED BY STIPULATION. - HEARINGS: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 03/24/14 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S12 (RULE 3.1380 OF THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT SETTLED STATEMENTS SHALL BE FILED WITH THE DEPARTMENT 5 DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING) COUNSEL FOR PETITIONER TO GIVE NOTICE. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
January 29, 2014 | hearing | Other Hearing Original Type Other Hearing Hearing Time 8:00 AM Result Held Comment VOLUNTARY FAMILY LAW MEDIATION SESSION | |
November 22, 2013 | hearing | Notice Filed re: Comment NOTICE RE CONTINUANCE OF VOLUNTARY FILED BY JULIO DE SANTIAGO. | |
November 13, 2013 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Montes, Richard Comment VOLUNTARY FAMILY LAW MEDIATION SESSION RICHARD MONTES,JUDGE CLERK: KIM CALLIHAN COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY DAVID HEISLER MAKES A TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE MATTER CONTINUED BY STIPULATION. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 01/29/14 AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT S5. COUNSEL FOR PETITIONER TO GIVE NOTICE. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
November 13, 2013 | hearing | Other Hearing Original Type Other Hearing Judicial Officer Montes, Richard Hearing Time 8:00 AM Result Continued Party's motion Comment VOLUNTARY FAMILY LAW MEDIATION SESSION | |
October 07, 2013 | hearing | Notice of Entry of Default Jmnt- Marital Status Terminates Comment NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT -- DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 10/04/13. | |
October 04, 2013 | hearing | Judgment - Status Only Filed Comment JUDGMENT - STATUS ONLY | |
September 17, 2013 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Rouse, Duke D Comment STATUS CONFERENCE DUKE D ROUSE,JUDGE CLERK: TRACEE TAYLOR COURT REPORTER STACEY DETTMERS;13303 BAILIFF: T KAUKANI - APPEARANCES: PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JULIO DE SANTIAGO RESPONDENT YESENIA DE SANTIAGO PRESENT ATTORNEY DAVID HEISLER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. ATTORNEY DIANA SPIDALL PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR STATUS CONFERENCE (FL) WITNESS -- BOTH PARTIES ARE / IS SWORN AND EXAMINED. THE COURT FINDS THAT THE STATUTORY AND JURISDICTIONAL RESIDENT REQUIREMENTS ARE MET. THE COURT FINDS JURISDICTION WAS ACQUIRED BY YESENIA DE SANTIAGO ON 09/28/12 BY FILING OF RESPONSE. DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE GRANTED ON GROUNDS OF IRRECONCILABLE DIFFERENCES. MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES UPON SIGNING OF JUDGMENT NOTICE - CAUTION: YOU ARE NOT OFFICIALLY DIVORCED UNTIL JUDGMENT IS SIGNED BY A JUDICIAL OFFICER INDICATING THE OFFICIAL DATE OF THE TERMINATION OF MARRIAGE. UPON ENTRY OF THE FINAL DECREE, YESENIA DE SANTIAGO'S FORMER NAME, YESENIA DAVALOS SHALL BE RESTORED TO HER. COUNSEL FOR YESENIA DE SANTIAGO TO PREPARE ORDER OR JUDGMENT AS TO STATUS ONLY. MATTER CONTINUED BY STIPULATION. - HEARINGS: THE COURT REFERS THIS MATTER TO A VOLUNTARY FAMILY LAW MEDIATION SESSION. A ONE-HOUR BLOCK OF TIME HAS BEEN RESERVED FOR THIS PURPOSE AS FOLLOWS: 11/13/13 AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT S5. NOTICE WAIVED. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
September 17, 2013 | hearing | Status Conference Original Type Status Conference Judicial Officer Rouse, Duke D Hearing Time 08:30 AM Result Held Comment STATUS CONFERENCE | |
August 09, 2013 | hearing | At-Issue Memorandum Filed Comment AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY JULIO DE SANTIAGO | |
May 10, 2013 | hearing | Notice of Return of Document(s) Comment NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S) | |
May 10, 2013 | hearing | Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Comment INCOME WITHHOLDING ORDER IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PER COURTROOM- DOES NOT REFLECT COURT ORDERED AMOUNTS.. | |
May 02, 2013 | hearing | Decl re: Service of Decl of Disclosure and I & E Filed Comment DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY JULIO DE SANTIAGO FOR PRELIMINARY/FINAL. | |
April 25, 2013 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Rouse, Duke D Comment STATUS CONFERENCE DUKE D ROUSE,JUDGE CLERK: TRACEE TAYLOR COURT REPORTER WANDA HARRISON;10489 BAILIFF: A CIMINO - APPEARANCES: PETITIONER JULIO DE SANTIAGO PRESENT RESPONDENT YESENIA DE SANTIAGO PRESENT ATTORNEY DAVID HEISLER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. ATTORNEY DIANA SPIDALL PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR STATUS CONFERENCE (FL) WITNESS -- BOTH PARTIES ARE / IS SWORN AND EXAMINED. SEE OTHER MINUTE ORDER OF THIS DATE. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
April 25, 2013 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Rouse, Duke D Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY YESENIA DE SANTIAGO RE: CHILD CUSTODY/VISITATION/CHILD SUPPORT DUKE D ROUSE,JUDGE CLERK: TRACEE TAYLOR COURT REPORTER WANDA HARRISON;10489 BAILIFF: A CIMINO - APPEARANCES: PETITIONER JULIO DE SANTIAGO PRESENT RESPONDENT YESENIA DE SANTIAGO PRESENT ATTORNEY DAVID HEISLER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. ATTORNEY DIANA SPIDALL PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. - PROCEEDINGS: REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD. REPORT OF CHILD CUSTODY RECOMMENDING COUNSELOR IS READ AND CONSIDERED BY THE COURT. FAMILY COURT SERVICES REPORT FILED. WITNESS -- BOTH PARTIES ARE / IS SWORN AND EXAMINED. ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY BOTH PARTIES . AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT : - THE COURT FINDS IT HAS JURISDICTION TO MAKE ORDERS REGARDING CHILD CUSTODY UNDER THE UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT. CUSTODY AND VISITATION ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: PURSUANT TO FAMILY CODE SECTION 3048, THE COURT HAS JURISDICTION TO MAKE ORDERS REGARDING CUSTODY UNDER THE FAMILY CODE AND THE UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT. NOTICE AND OPPORTUNITY TO BE HEARD WAS GIVEN TO THE PARTIES/RESPONDING PARTY AS PROVIDED BY THE LAWS OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA. THE COUNTRY OF HABITUAL RESIDENCE OF THE CHILD/CHILDREN IS THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. WRITTEN REPORT RECEIVED FROM CHILD CUSTODY RECOMMENDING COUNSELOR M. ANDERSON. COURT MAKES ORDERS PURSUANT TO CHILD CUSTODY RECOMMENDING COUNSELING REPORT AS ATTACHED AND ORDERED INCORPORATED INTO THE MINUTE ORDER. PURSUANT TO THE ATTACHED AGREEMENT. PURSUANT TO ATTACHED RECOMMENDATION AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. - SUPPORT ORDERS: YESENIA DE SANTIAGO IS ORDERED TO PAY CHILD SUPPORT IN THE AMOUNT OF $562.00 EACH MONTH. PAYABLE ONE-HALF ON THE 1ST AND ONE-HALF ON THE 15TH DAYS OF EACH MONTH, COMMENCING 01/01/13 AND CONTINUING UNTIL EACH CHILD DIES, MARRIES, BECOMES EMANCIPATED, REACHES THE AGE OF 18 OR REACHES THE AG E OF 19 AND IS A FULL-TIME HIGH SCHOOL STUDENT, OR UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT, WHICHEVER FIRST OCCURS. - YESENIA DE SANTIAGO IS ORDERED TO PAY CHILD SUPPORT IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00 EACH MONTH. PAYABLE ONCE A MONTH ON THE 1ST DAY, COMMENCING 05/01/13 AND CONTINUING UNTIL EACH CHILD DIES, MARRIES, BECOMES EMANCIPATED, REACHES THE AGE OF 18 OR REACHES THE AGE OF 19 AND IS A FULL-TIME HIGHSCHOOL STUDENT, OR UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT, WHICHEVER FIRST OCCURS. - THE COURT MAKES INTERIM ORDERS YESENIA DE SANTIAGO IS ORDERED TO PAY AS AND FOR SPOUSAL SUPPORT THE SUM OF $332.00 PER MONTH, PAYABLE ONE-HALF ON THE 1ST AND ONE-HALF ON THE 15TH DAYS OF EACH MONTH, COMMENCING 01/01/13 AND CONTINUING TIL 04/30/2013 AT WHICH TIME SPOUSAL SUPPORT WILL BE REDUCED TO ZERO, COMMENCING 05/01/2013. SUPPORT FINDINGS ARE SET FORTH ON THE COMPUTER PRINTOUT ATTACHED. SUPPORT PAYMENTS ORDERED PAID BY WAGE ASSIGNMENT. COURT ORDERS THE RESPONDENT TO PAY ANY ARREARS ON CHILD SUPPORT AT THE RATE OF $500.00 PER MONTH UNTIL PAID IN FULL. ACTION - COMPLETE ==MINUTE ORDER CHANGED OR CORRECTED BY TRACEE BARRIOS; CHANGES MADE ARE AS FOLLOWS: TO INCLUDE SPOUSAL SUPPORT ORDERS. == === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
April 25, 2013 | hearing | Status Conference Original Type Status Conference Judicial Officer Rouse, Duke D Hearing Time 08:30 AM Result Held Comment STATUS CONFERENCE | |
April 25, 2013 | hearing | Request For Order Re: Original Type Request For Order Re: Judicial Officer Rouse, Duke D Hearing Time 08:30 AM Result Held Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY YESENIA DE SANTIAGO RE: CHILD CUSTODY/VISITATION/CHILD SUPPORT | |
April 09, 2013 | hearing | Hearing Rescheduled Comment HEARING RESCHEDULED TO 4/09/13 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT S12 | |
April 09, 2013 | hearing | Hearing Rescheduled Comment HEARING RESCHEDULED TO 4/09/13 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT S15A - RESCHEDULED TO: | |
April 09, 2013 | hearing | Comment: Comment HEARING RE: 4/09/13 | |
April 09, 2013 | hearing | Status: Family Law Comment FAMILY LAW STATUS CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED | |
April 09, 2013 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Haight, Raymond L, III Comment HEARING RE: REASSIGNMENT RAYMOND L HAIGHT III,JUDGE CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS NOT REPORTED COURT ATTENDANT L RUSSELL - APPEARANCES: - PROCEEDINGS: REVIEW HEARING HELD AS SUPERVISING JUDGE, JUDGE HAIGHT REASSIGNS MATTER TO JUDGE ROUSE IN DEPARTMENT S12. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. S12 ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
April 09, 2013 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY YESENIA DE SANTIAGO RE: CHILD CUSTODY/VISITATION/CHILD SUPPORT CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/25/13 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S12. | |
April 09, 2013 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Daniel, Deborah Comment STATUS CONFERENCE DEBORAH DANIEL,COMMISSIONER CLERK: ANDREA ROMERO COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE BAILIFF: C BARAJAS - APPEARANCES: PETITIONER JULIO DE SANTIAGO PRESENT ATTORNEY DAVID H HEISLER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. RESPONDENT YESENIA DE SANTIAGO PRESENT ATTORNEY DIANA SPIDALL PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR STATUS CONFERENCE (FL) RESPONDENT WILL NOT STIPULATE TO COMMISSIONER DEBORAH DANIEL HEARING THIS CASE. MATTER IS CONTINUED AND SET FOR REASSIGNMENT FORTHWITH IN DEPT. S-15. SEE OTHER MINUTE ORDER OF 4/09/13. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/09/13 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S15A. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
April 09, 2013 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Daniel, Deborah Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY YESENIA DE SANTIAGO RE: CHILD CUSTODY/VISITATION/CHILD SUPPORT DEBORAH DANIEL,COMMISSIONER CLERK: ANDREA ROMERO COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE BAILIFF: C BARAJAS - APPEARANCES: PETITIONER JULIO DE SANTIAGO PRESENT ATTORNEY DAVID H HEISLER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. RESPONDENT YESENIA DE SANTIAGO PRESENT ATTORNEY DIANA SPIDALL PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. - PROCEEDINGS: REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD. RESPONDENT DOES NOT STIPULATE TO COMMISSIONER DEBORAH DANIEL HEARING THIS CASE. MATTER IS SET FOR RE-ASSIGNMENT IN DEPT. S-15 FORTHWITH. PARTIES ARE ORDERED TO REPORT TO DEPT. S-15 FORTHWITH. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/09/13 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S15A. HEARING RE:REASSIGNMENT SET FOR 04/09/13 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S15A. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
April 09, 2013 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment STATUS CONFERENCE CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/25/13 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S12. | |
April 09, 2013 | hearing | Attachment to Minute Order Comment ATTACHMENT TO 04/09/13 MINUTE ORDER | |
April 09, 2013 | hearing | Hearing Re: Original Type Hearing Re: Judicial Officer Haight, Raymond L, III Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held Comment HEARING RE: REASSIGNMENT | |
April 09, 2013 | hearing | Request For Order Re: Original Type Request For Order Re: Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Continued Party's motion Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY YESENIA DE SANTIAGO RE: CHILD CUSTODY/VISITATION/CHILD SUPPORT | |
April 09, 2013 | hearing | Status Conference Original Type Status Conference Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Continued Party's motion Comment STATUS CONFERENCE | |
April 09, 2013 | hearing | Status Conference Original Type Status Conference Judicial Officer Daniel, Deborah Hearing Time 08:30 AM Result Continued Party's motion Comment STATUS CONFERENCE | |
April 09, 2013 | hearing | Request For Order Re: Original Type Request For Order Re: Judicial Officer Daniel, Deborah Hearing Time 08:30 AM Result Continued Party's motion Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY YESENIA DE SANTIAGO RE: CHILD CUSTODY/VISITATION/CHILD SUPPORT | |
April 08, 2013 | hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF RESPONSIVE DECL/ INCOME AND EXPENSE BY MAIL ON 04/05/13 AS TO DIANA L. SPIDALL, FILED. | |
April 08, 2013 | hearing | Income and Expense Declaration Filed Comment INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY JULIO DE SANTIAGO | |
April 08, 2013 | hearing | Responsive Declaration re: RFO filed Comment RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO RFO OF JULIO DE SANTIAGO FILED ON 12/28/13. | |
March 19, 2013 | hearing | Family Court Services Coversheet Comment FAMILY COURT SERVICES COVERSHEET | |
March 19, 2013 | hearing | FCS Orientation Certificate for: Comment FCS ORIENTATION CERTIFICATE FOR YESENIA DE SANTIAGO | |
March 11, 2013 | hearing | Family Court Services Coversheet Comment FAMILY COURT SERVICES COVERSHEET | |
March 11, 2013 | hearing | Update Complaint of Comment UPDATE COMPLAINT OF FCS FILE SCANNED | |
March 11, 2013 | hearing | Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET ON YESENIA DE SANTIAGO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 08/31/12 | |
February 19, 2013 | hearing | Notice Filed re: Comment NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HRG 1/23/13 TO 04/0913 FILED BY JULIO DE SANTIAGO. | |
January 23, 2013 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Daniel, Deborah Comment STATUS CONFERENCE DEBORAH DANIEL,COMMISSIONER CLERK: ANDREA ROMERO COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE BAILIFF: C BARAJAS - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY DAVID HEISLER (BY BRANDI) MAKES A TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE ATTORNEY DIANA SPIDALL PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR STATUS CONFERENCE (FL) STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED MATTER CONTINUED BY STIPULATION. REASON: TO TRAIL RFO SET FOR 4/09/13. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/09/13 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S11. COUNSEL FOR PETITIONER TO GIVE NOTICE. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
January 23, 2013 | hearing | Status Conference Original Type Status Conference Judicial Officer Daniel, Deborah Hearing Time 08:30 AM Result Continued Party's motion Comment STATUS CONFERENCE | |
January 07, 2013 | hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF RFO AND SUPP DOCS BY MAIL ON 01/03/13 AS TO DAVID HEISLER, ESQ, FILED. | |
December 31, 2012 | hearing | Update Complaint of Comment UPDATE COMPLAINT OF FCS DESTRUCTION YEAR ADDED | |
December 28, 2012 | hearing | Family Court Services Re: Comment FAMILY COURT SERVICES: APPOINTMENT 03-19-13 @ 1PM | |
December 28, 2012 | hearing | Decl re: Service of Decl of Disclosure and I & E Filed Comment DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY YESENIA DE SANTIAGO FOR PRELIMINARY. | |
December 28, 2012 | hearing | Income and Expense Declaration Filed Comment INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY YESENIA DE SANTIAGO | |
December 28, 2012 | hearing | Declaration Under UCCJEA filed Comment DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED | |
December 28, 2012 | hearing | Party is Directed to Report to Family Court Services Comment YESENIA DE SANTIAGO IS DIRECTED TO REPORT TO FAMILY COURT SERVICES FORTHWITH FOR ORIENTATION AND CHILD CUSTODY RECOMMENDING COUNSELING APPOINTMENTS. confidential minute: NOTICE PRINTED FOR DAVID H HEISLER ON 12/28/12. NOTICE PRINTED FOR DIANA SPIDALL ON 12/28/12. | |
December 28, 2012 | hearing | Party is Directed to Report to Family Court Services Comment YESENIA DE SANTIAGO IS DIRECTED TO REPORT TO FAMILY COURT SERVICES FORTHWITH FOR ORIENTATION AND CHILD CUSTODY RECOMMENDING COUNSELING APPOINTMENTS. | |
December 28, 2012 | hearing | Request for Order Filed re: Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY YESENIA DE SANTIAGO RE: CHILD CUSTODY/VISITATION/CHILDSUPPORT. 121228-3672-CK MMF/ 60.00 MCV/ 25.00 PAYMT 121228-3672-CK CRU/ 30.00 PAYMT | |
December 10, 2012 | hearing | At-Issue Memorandum Filed Comment AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY JULIO DE SANTIAGO | |
December 10, 2012 | hearing | Notice Filed re: Comment NOTICE AND ORDER TO ATTEND STATUS CONFERENCE FILED BY JULIO DE SANTIAGO. | |
September 28, 2012 | hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO DISSO AND UCCJEA BY MAIL ON 09/28/12 AS TO DAVID HEISLER, ESQ, FILED. | |
September 28, 2012 | hearing | Declaration Under UCCJEA filed Comment DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED | |
September 28, 2012 | hearing | Response Filed to: Comment RESPONSE TO DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN OF JULIO DE SANTIAGO BY YESENIA DE SANTIAGO FILED. REPRESENTED BY DS41/. 120928-1694-CK LFH/ 435.00 PAYMT 120928-1694-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 30044 | |
September 10, 2012 | hearing | Filing Fee Paid by Comment FILING FEE PAID BY YESENIA DE SANTIAGO FOR COPY 120910-0202-DB MJF/ 25.00 FCP/ 1.00 PAYMT 120910-0202-DB REFERENCE NUMBER 023-0130873221 | |
August 31, 2012 | hearing | Certificate of Assignment Received Comment CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. | |
August 31, 2012 | hearing | Declaration Under UCCJEA filed Comment DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED | |
August 31, 2012 | hearing | Family Law Summons Issued - Original Filed in Court File Comment FAMILY LAW Summons ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE. | |
August 31, 2012 | hearing | Case Assigned for All Purposes Comment CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S11 | |
August 31, 2012 | hearing | Petition and Party Information Entered (Family Law) Comment FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. 120831-0473-CS LFG/ 435.00 PAYMT |