Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Erasmo Salinas Martinez -v- Celia Tran Print
On October 05, 2022 a dissolution w/o minor children case was filed by Salinas Martinez, Erasmo, against Tran, Celia, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. Judge Aruna P Rodrigo presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 05, 2022
Last Refreshed
October 17, 2023
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
Dissolution w/o Minor Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2024 |
Department S54 - Historic
Judge: Rodrigo, Aruna P |
||
October 17, 2023 |
Department S54 - Historic
Judge: Rodrigo, Aruna P |
||
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration re: RFO filed RFO filed by Erasmo Martinez on 8/29/23 |
|
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Filed re: other: motion for reconsideration |
|
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed responsive declaratino to request for order, declaration of respondent |
|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: Copy of Ruling on Submitted Matter |
|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certified - Registered Interpreter The interpreter is certified or registered for the language to be interpreted. The interpreter s identification has been verified by the Court using an identification badge issued by the Judicial Council or other documentation accompanied by photo identification. The interpreter oath has been administered and/or placed on file with the court administrator. |
|
September 21, 2023 |
Department S54 - Historic
Judge: Rodrigo, Aruna P |
||
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Proof of Personal Service returned; Petitioners address different from currently filed with the court. If you need to change address submit MC-040 form. |
|
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Filed re: Other: Debt IRS 2022 Tax Debt, Hud Debt of 12,960.00, respodent sold 2018 Chevy Silverado |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certified - Registered Interpreter The interpreter is certified or registered for the language to be interpreted. The interpreter s identification has been verified by the Court using an identification badge issued by the Judicial Council or other documentation accompanied by photo identification. The interpreter oath has been administered and/or placed on file with the court administrator. |
|
June 30, 2023 |
Department S54 - Historic
Judge: Rodrigo, Aruna P |
||
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Decl re: Service of Decl of Disclosure and I & E Filed Preliminary |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference Brief Filed | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration Filed | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Community and Quasi Community Property Declaration Filed | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed MSC Brief, INE Decl. property decl., Prelimiary decl. of disclosure. By mail. |
|
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certified - Registered Interpreter The interpreter is certified or registered for the language to be interpreted. The interpreter s identification has been verified by the Court using an identification badge issued by the Judicial Council or other documentation accompanied by photo identification. The interpreter oath has been administered and/or placed on file with the court administrator. |
|
April 14, 2023 |
Department S54 - Historic
Judge: Rodrigo, Aruna P |
||
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Family Law At-Issue Memorandum for Trial Setting Filed | |
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Decl re: Service of Decl of Disclosure and I & E Filed Preliminary/ Final |
|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certified - Registered Interpreter The interpreter is certified or registered for the language to be interpreted. The interpreter s identification has been verified by the Court using an identification badge issued by the Judicial Council or other documentation accompanied by photo identification. The interpreter oath has been administered and/or placed on file with the court administrator. |
|
January 03, 2023 |
Department S54 - Historic
Judge: Rodrigo, Aruna P |
||
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Response to Petition Filed | |
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted | |
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Tab Updated response filed |
|
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees Filed | |
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed RESPONSE |
|
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons, Comp/Pet and RFO Filed and PD;RFO |
|
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Filed re: Other: Division of Property by Erasno Salinas Martniez (10/5/22) |
|
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Family Law Petition Filed | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees Filed | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Informational Check List Provided (FL100) | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Community and Quasi Community Property Declaration Filed | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Family Law Summons Issued - Original Filed in Court File | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Assignment Received | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver- Granted-New Petition Family Law |