Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ROBERT BABCOCK -V- STEPHAN BURKHARD
A Dv Prevention W/O Minor Children case was filed in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. Judge Michael J. Gassner presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 28, 2009
Last Refreshed
January 29, 2023
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Category
DV Prevention w/o Minor Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Domestic Violence
Status
Dismissal
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2018 | hearing | Default Department Changed Comment DEFAULT DPT. CHANGED FROM DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM S47 TO ANN. TO . | |
August 01, 2018 | hearing | Default Department Changed Comment DEFAULT DPT. CHANGED FROM DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM ANN TO S48. TO . | |
November 24, 2009 | hearing | Comment: Comment CASE TRACKED TO DC | |
November 23, 2009 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Comment HEARING ON DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY ROBERT BABCOCK MICHAEL J GASSNER PRESIDING. CLERK: CRYSTAL BURTON COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE BAILIFF: E BROCK - APPEARANCES: PETITIONER ROBERT BABCOCK PRESENT PARTIES NOT PRESENT: STEPHAN BURKHARD - PROCEEDINGS: AT THE REQUEST OF THE MOVING PARTY COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - OTHER DISMISSAL BEFORE HEARING (FL) DISPOSITION OTHER DISMISSAL BEFORE HEARING (FL) ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
November 23, 2009 | hearing | Hearing on Domestic Violence Original Type Hearing on Domestic Violence Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held Comment HEARING ON DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY ROBERT BABCOCK | |
October 30, 2009 | hearing | Comment: Comment BACKGROUND CHECK SENT TO CAL PREP FOR 112309 | |
October 30, 2009 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Comment EX-PARTE MOTION RE: TRO MICHAEL J GASSNER PRESIDING. CLERK: TIFFANY LEMUS COURT REPORTER KAREN DIGGS;7789 BAILIFF: A KENNEDY - APPEARANCES: PETITIONER ROBERT BABCOCK PRESENT RESPONDENT STEPHAN BURKHARD PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: EX-PARTE HEARING IS HELD. EX PARTE ORDERS GRANTED EX PARTE ORDER SIGNED BY THE COURT. TEMPORARY ORDERS ARE MADE ON PETITIONER'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED THIS DATE. - HEARINGS: HEARING SET 11/23/09 AT 8:30 IN R15 PERSONAL SERVICE OF OSC DOCUMENTS EXECUTED ON THIS DATE IN OPEN COURT. PERSONAL SERVICE OF PARTY: STEPHAN BURKHARD. DATE: 10/30/09. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
October 30, 2009 | hearing | Declaration Regarding Ex Parte Notice Filed Comment DECLARATION REGARDING EX-PARTE NOTICE FILED. | |
October 30, 2009 | hearing | Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is: Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF RQST FOR TRO/TRO FILED AS TO STEPHAN BURKHARD. PARTY SERVED ON 10/30/09. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL IN OPEN COURT. WITH FEES OF $0.00. | |
October 30, 2009 | hearing | Temporary Restraining Order re: Domestic Violence Prevention Comment TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE PREVENTION)FILED BY ROBERT BABCOCK | |
October 30, 2009 | hearing | Ex Parte Hearing Original Type Ex Parte Hearing Judicial Officer Gassner, Michael J Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held Comment EX-PARTE MOTION RE: TRO | |
October 28, 2009 | hearing | Ex Parte Filed Re: Comment EX PARTE RE: TRO FILED BY ROBERT BABCOCK | |
October 28, 2009 | hearing | Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER DOMESTIC VIOLENCE PREVENTION | |
October 28, 2009 | hearing | Request and Party Information Entered (DV) Comment REQUEST AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.(DV) | |
October 28, 2009 | hearing | Case Assigned for All Purposes Comment CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R15 | |
October 28, 2009 | hearing | Comment: Comment CONF CLETS INFO SHEET REC'D |