Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MARIA RAYGOZA AND JOSE MARQUEZ
A Dissolution W/O Minor Children case was filed by Raygoza, Maria Del Rosario, against Raygoza Marquez, Jose Guillermo, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 16, 2016
Last Refreshed
February 10, 2021
Filing Location
San Mateo County, CA
Category
Dissolution w/o Minor Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
22 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Minute CDIS: CASE DISMISSED. |
|
April 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety REQDC1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF PETITION - DISSO W/O MINOR CHILD OF RAYGOZA WITH PREJUDICE IN ITS ENTIRETY FILED. |
|
April 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Conversion Action COMM: JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION 7/26/13, SAN BERNARDINO SUPERIOR COURT, CASE # FAVS 120297. |
|
March 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver Granted OWFG: ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES FILED BY MARIA DEL ROSARIO RAYGOZA GRANTEDIN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00, SIGNED BY JUDGE GREENBERG ON 03/17/16. |
|
March 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order sent for signature to Judicial Officer OFS: ORDER SENT TO DEPARTMENT 3 FOR SIGNATURE. |
|
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of ADR NADR: NOTICE OF ADR FILED BY MARIA DEL ROSARIO RAYGOZA. |
|
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request to Waive Court Fees APWF: APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY MARIA DEL ROSARIO RAYGOZA. |
|
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed S30IF: 30 DAY Summons, ISSUED AND FILED. |
|
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department for all purposes APJFL3: CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 3 FOR ALL PURPOSES |
|
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Petition for Dissolution of Marriage/Domestic Partnership PDM: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED. |
|
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |