Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
California Clean Energy Committee vs County of Merced et al.
A (02): Judicial Review Writ Mandate-Ceqa case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Merced County. Judge McCabe, Brian presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 18, 2013
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
Merced County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Kirihara, John;Category
(02): Judicial Review Writ Mandate-CEQA
Practice Area
Appeals
Matter Type
General Appeals
Status
Dismissal
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Post-Dispo)
Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Request Dismissal Granted Full | |
April 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice | |
April 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Hearing: Other
Judge: Kirihara, John |
|
April 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice | |
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
March 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order
Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
February 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Request | |
February 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
February 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice | |
February 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 31, 2014 | Docket Event | Stipulation | |
January 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice | |
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice | |
January 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice Other | |
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice | |
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
December 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Petition for Writ of Mandate | |
December 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice |