Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ELLISON VS. ELLISON
A Dissolution W/ Minor Children case was filed by Ellison, Desiree, against Ellison, Steven, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. Judge James L. Curry presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 10, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
Yuba County, CA
Category
Dissolution w/ Minor Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Closed
Case Duration
4 months and 8 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Status Conference
Judge: Curry, James L |
|
July 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Curry, James L |
|
July 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Mediation Orientation
Judge: Conversion Error, . |
|
June 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
June 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Dismiss Without Prejudice | |
June 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
June 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons | |
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event | FL Mediation Orientation | |
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
June 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Related Cases | |
June 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Order - Granted | |
June 10, 2010 | Docket Event | FL Notice of Status/Case Management Conference | |
June 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Request - Original | |
June 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration | |
June 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted - Original | |
June 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Petition for Disso with Child | |
June 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
June 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Property Declaration | |
June 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act |