Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
STATE FUND VS WILLIAMS ET AL
A (43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) case was filed by State Compensation Insurance Fund, represented by Anderson, John R., Esq, against Williams, Donna Marie, in the jurisdiction of Calaveras County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 29, 2008
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
Calaveras County, CA
Category
(43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec)
Case Duration
1 year, 1 month and 18 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Records imaged | |
July 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
May 12, 2008 | Docket Event | OSC Hearing | |
April 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Entire Action | |
April 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice | |
February 29, 2008 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
February 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of delay reduction information and setting | |
February 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed |