Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MORGAN CAMPBELL VS JACQUELINE LOCKWOOD
A (43) Limited Other Petition (Not Spec): Under 10,000 case was filed by Morgan, Campbell, against Jacqueline, Lockwood, represented by Flocks, Reed, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 30, 2003
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Santa Cruz County, CA
Category
(43) Limited Other Petition (Not Spec): Under 10,000
Case Duration
7 months and 20 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2004 | Docket Event | ||
March 11, 2004 | Docket Event | ||
March 11, 2004 | Docket Event | Other Hearing | |
January 13, 2004 | Docket Event | ||
January 13, 2004 | Docket Event | Other Hearing | |
January 12, 2004 | Docket Event | ||
December 30, 2003 | Docket Event |