Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CINDY MCDOWELL VS JAMES B MCKAY
A (32) Unlimited Residential Unlawful Detainer case was filed by Cindy, Mcdowell, represented by Brick, David, against Mckay, James B, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 30, 2003
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2021
Filing Location
Santa Cruz County, CA
Category
(32) Unlimited Residential Unlawful Detainer
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Unlawful Detainer
Case Duration
7 years, 10 months and 3 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event | ||
February 03, 2004 | Docket Event | ||
January 27, 2004 | Docket Event | ||
January 27, 2004 | Docket Event | Other Hearing | |
January 06, 2004 | Docket Event | ||
December 30, 2003 | Docket Event |