Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA VS. LEWIS
A 06: Limited Breach Of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 To 25,000 case was filed by Capital One Bank,, represented by Patenaude & Felix, Apc, against Lewis, Shaun P, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. Judge Peter M. Williams presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 20, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 13, 2023
Filing Location
Yolo County, CA
Category
06: Limited Breach of Contract/Warranty - 10,000 to 25,000
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
10 months and 16 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Williams, Peter M. |
|
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Purge and Destroy FILE DEST - SCANNED Notes: FILE DESTROYED - SCANNED |
|
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal REQ FOR DISMISSAL Notes: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE |
|
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed SUMMONS FILED |
|
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed - DO NOT USE FOR CLERK EDITION ONLY LIMITED COLLECT COMP Notes: LIMITED COLLECTIONS CASE |
|
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet COLL/$$ OWED/OPN BK |
|
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: DECL OF PLTFF'S ATTY RE NONMILITARY STATUS |
|
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed LIMITED COLLECT COMP Notes: LIMITED COLLECTIONS CASE |