Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
PRASAD VS. WAYNE
A 32: Limited Residential Unlawful Detainer - Under 10,000 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. Judge Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 26, 2014
Last Refreshed
February 24, 2021
Filing Location
Yolo County, CA
Judge
Hon. Judge, Assigned
Category
32: Limited Residential Unlawful Detainer - under 10,000
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Unlawful Detainer
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
Case Duration
28 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
*Unlawful Detainer 60-Day Confidentiality Surpassed RESTORE CONF CASE Notes: RESTORE CONFIDENTIAL CASE |
|
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned WRIT FILED* |
|
March 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL MUNESH PRASAD, S&T WITH ATTY R MEHIGAN DARRELL KENNED, S&T PLTF'S EXH 1 RECEIVED: 3-DAY NOTICE TO QUIT RECEIVED JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF; DEF TO PAY PRINCIPAL $1,300.00 HOLDOVER 563.42 ATTY FEES 350.00 COSTS 315.00 TOTAL 2,528.42 Judge: O'Mara, J Kent |
|
March 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: YOLO COUNTY FOR POSSESSION ONLY. |
|
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
At-Issue Memorandum AT ISSUE MEMO - UD |
|
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS - SUBSERVICE* Notes: SERVED: ALL TENANTS, SUBTENANTS, NAMED CLAIMANTS AND OTHER OCCUPANTS OF THE PREMISES ON 3/4/14 AND MAILED 3/5/14. |
|
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: DARRELL WAYNE AKA DARRELL KENNEDY W/SUMMONS (UD) AND COMPLAINT ON 3/4/14. |
|
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited ANSWER CV/FL/PB Notes: FILED BY DARRELL KENNEDY |
|
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of UD Action NTC UD ACTION |
|
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed SUMMONS FILED |
|
February 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet UD - RESIDENTIAL |
|
February 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
*Unlawful Detainer Complaint Filed COMPL - UD Notes: LIMITED COLLECTIONS CASE |