Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MOSSER COMPANIES INC. VS. ERIN MAHER ET AL
On April 18, 2018 an unlawful detainer - residential case was filed by Mosser Companies Inc., represented by Wasserman, David, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 18, 2018
Last Refreshed
November 22, 2023
Filing Location
San Francisco County, CA
Category
UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Unlawful Detainer
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
2 months and 2 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, SATISFIED AS TO REAL PROPERTY ONLY AS TO DEFENDANT MAHER, ERIN | |
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT MAHER, ERIN | |
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE $71.36 PER DAY (DAILY RENTAL VALUE) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MOSSER COMPANIES INC. | |
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DAVID P. WASSERMAN, ESQ. RE COPY OF LEASE AGREEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MOSSER COMPANIES INC. | |
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PLAINTIFF MOSSER COMPANIES INC. SERVED MAY-07-2018, POSTING AND MAILING AS TO DEFENDANT MAHER, ERIN | |
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event | RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MOSSER COMPANIES INC. AS TO DEFENDANT MAHER, ERIN | |
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PLAINTIFF MOSSER COMPANIES INC. SERVED MAY-07-2018, POSTING AND MAILING AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10 | |
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT MAHER, ERIN | |
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 1169 C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF MOSSER COMPANIES INC. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT MAHER, ERIN THE RESTITUTION AND POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES: 455 EDDY STREET, APARTMENT E708, CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94109, LEASE FORFEITED, ***JUDGMENT APPLIES TO ALL OCCUPANTS OF THE PREMESIS INCLUDING TENANTS, SUBTENANTS IF ANY, AND NAMED CLAIMANTS IF ANY (CODE OF CIV. PROC., 715.010, 1169, AND 1174.3)***; SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 1169 C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF MOSSER COMPANIES INC. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT MAHER, ERIN THE RESTITUTION AND POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES: 455 EDDY STREET, APARTMENT E708, CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94109, LEASE FORFEITED, ***JUDGMENT APPLIES TO ALL OCCUPANTS OF THE PREMESIS INCLUDING TENANTS, SUBTENANTS IF ANY, AND NAMED CLAIMANTS IF ANY (CODE OF CIV. PROC., §§ 715.010, 1169, AND 1174.3)***; SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS (NO SASE, COPY IN DEPT. 501 PICK UP BOX) | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF MOSSER COMPANIES INC. | |
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS | |
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event | UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MOSSER COMPANIES INC. AS TO DEFENDANT MAHER, ERIN DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED |