Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
PANYA WONGSENAKHUM et al VS. THOMAS BYRNE et al
On February 27, 2006 an unlawful detainer - residential case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. Judge Robert L. Dondero presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 27, 2006
Last Refreshed
August 31, 2023
Filing Location
San Francisco County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Sue M. Kaplan;Category
UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Unlawful Detainer
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 month and 28 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Causes of Action
complaint as follows:
Y ONE of the next two boxes:
generally denies each statement of the complaint. (Do not check this box if the complaint demands more
.
ant admits that all of the statements of the complaint are true EXCEPT
t claims the following statements of the complaint ara false (use paragraph numbers from the complaint
d on Attachment 2b(1).
t has no information or belief that the following statements of the complaint are true, so defendant denies
ragraph numbers from the complaint or explain):
d on Attachment 26(2).
VE DEFENSES (NOTE: For each box checked, you must stale brief facts to support it in the space provided atthe
two (item 3).)
payment of rent only) Plaintiff has breached the warranty to provide habitable premises.
yment of rent only) Defendant made needed repairs and properly deducted the cost from the rent, and plaintiff did
per credit. .
yment of rent only) On (date): , before the notice to pay or quit expired, defendant ~~
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
MINUTES FOR MAR-22-2006 1:30 PM FOR DEPT 218
Date: Mar 22, 2006ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BYRNE, THOMAS MCMAHON, TONY
Date: Mar 07, 2006NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS
Date: Feb 27, 2006Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2006 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT INCLUDING ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION, WITH POS BY MAIL | |
March 27, 2006 | hearing |
COURT TRIAL
Judge: SUE M. KAPLAN |
|
March 27, 2006 | hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: ROBERT L. DONDERO |
|
March 27, 2006 | Docket Event | MASTER JURY CALENDAR OF MAR-27-2006 ASSIGNED TO COURT TRIAL CALENDAR ON MAR-27-2006 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 218, SUE M KAPLAN TO PUT TERMS OF THE SETTLEMENT ON THE RECORD AFTER SETTLING WITH JUDGE PRO TEM. (206) | |
March 27, 2006 | Docket Event | COURT TRIAL SET FOR MAR-27-2006 VACATED. CASE SETTLED. DEPT. 218, COMM. SUE KAPLAN, CLERK: E. BURA, CSR: JANET POND. | |
March 27, 2006 | Docket Event | MINI-MINUTES FOR MAR-27-2006 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 218 | |
March 22, 2006 | Docket Event | MINUTES FOR MAR-22-2006 1:30 PM FOR DEPT 218 | |
March 22, 2006 | hearing |
OTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: SUE M. KAPLAN |
|
March 22, 2006 | Docket Event | SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HELD, CASE NOT SETTLED--PENDING SETTLEMENT LIKELY. WILL CHEN, PRO TEM JUDGE; D. CARTER, CLERK; NOT REPORTED. | |
March 22, 2006 | Docket Event | JURY FEES, TRAN # W2106322J044, TAG # 014900, RECEIPT NUMBER 028823, DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT BYRNE, THOMAS | |
March 16, 2006 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: WOLFORD, JASON N SUBSTITUTED FOR PRO PER AS ATTORNEY FOR BYRNE, THOMAS | |
March 16, 2006 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: WOLFORD, JASON N SUBSTITUTED FOR PRO PER AS ATTORNEY FOR MCMAHON, TONY | |
March 13, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING WAIVER OF 985.(I) CRC COURT FEES AND COSTS AS TO DEFENDANT MCMAHON, TONY | |
March 13, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING WAIVER OF 985.(J) CRC JURY FEES AND EXPENSES AS TO DEFENDANT MCMAHON, TONY | |
March 13, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING WAIVER OF 985.(J) CRC REPORTERS FEES AS TO DEFENDANT MCMAHON, TONY | |
March 09, 2006 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF WONGSENAKHUM, PANYA LIMDULPAIBOON, RATSEMEE JURY TRIAL SET FOR MAR-27-2006 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 206 | |
March 09, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL AND SETTLEMENT HEARING HEARING SET FOR MAR-22-2006 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 218 | |
March 07, 2006 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BYRNE, THOMAS MCMAHON, TONY | |
March 07, 2006 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR JURY AND MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY DEFENDANT BYRNE, THOMAS MCMAHON, TONY | |
March 07, 2006 | Docket Event | APPLICATION PENDING FOR WAIVER OF 985.(J) CRC JURY FEES AND EXPENSES (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY DEFENDANT MCMAHON, TONY | |
March 07, 2006 | Docket Event | APPLICATION PENDING FOR WAIVER OF 985.(J) CRC REPORTERS FEES (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY DEFENDANT MCMAHON, TONY | |
March 07, 2006 | Docket Event | APPLICATION PENDING FOR WAIVER OF 985.(I) CRC COURT FEES AND COSTS (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY DEFENDANT MCMAHON, TONY | |
February 27, 2006 | Docket Event | UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WONGSENAKHUM, PANYA LIMDULPAIBOON, RATSEMEE AS TO DEFENDANT BYRNE, THOMAS MCMAHON, TONY DOES 1 TO X INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED | |
February 27, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS |