Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CO SAN BDNO vs. ALBERT SANDOVAL
Governmental Complaint To Establish Child Sppt/Health Ins case was filed in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. Judge Crawley, John presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 28, 2009
Last Refreshed
October 14, 2022
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Category
Governmental Complaint to Establish Child Sppt/Health Ins
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Child Support
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2014 | hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED 07/31/14 BY MAIL ON 08/15/14 AS TO ALBERT SANDOVAL, FILED. | |
July 31, 2014 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Crawley, John Comment MOTION RE: RE: MODIFICATION CHILD SUPPORT(063014) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FILED. (MODIFICATION GOVERNMENTAL) JOHN A CRAWLEY,COMMISSIONER CLERK: JULIE FRANCIS COURT REPORTER LONI HUNLEY;11489 BAILIFF: T SMITH-HAGANS - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY SHAUNA BRITTON PRESENT FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO CHILD SUPPORT DIVISION. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ALBERT SANDOVAL, DESIREE C CALVILLO - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR MOTION RE: Modification of Child Support. MOTION FILED 6/30/14 BY COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO MODIFICATION HEARING HELD. THE COURT FINDS THERE IS TIMELY SERVICE, NO WRITTEN OPPOSITION AND NO APPEARANCE BY EITHER PARENT. THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO'S MOTION TO MODIFY CHILD SUPPORT IS GRANTED. DEFENDANT IS HOMELESS WITH NO INCOME, AND THE CHILD IS WITH A NON-NEEDY CARETAKER, NOT WITH MOTHER. - THE COURT ADOPTS THE PROPOSED FINDINGS ATTACHED TO THE MOTION. THE COURT ORDERS ALBERT SANDOVAL TO PAY AS AND FOR CHILD SUPPORT FOR A TOTAL OF $$0.00 PER MONTH, PAYABLEON THE 1ST DAY OF EACH MONTH COMMENCING 7/1/2014 AND CONTINUING UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
July 31, 2014 | hearing | Order After Hearing Filed Comment ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED. HEARING DATE 07/31/14 IN DEPT CS1. | |
July 31, 2014 | hearing | DCSS - OSC / MTN / RFO Modification Original Type DCSS - OSC / MTN / RFO Modification Judicial Officer Crawley, John Hearing Time 8:00 AM Result Held Comment MOTION RE: RE: MODIFICATION CHILD SUPPORT(063014) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FILED. (MODIFICATION GOVERNMENTAL) | |
June 30, 2014 | hearing | Hearing Re: Comment MOTION RE: RE: MODIFICATION CHILD SUPPORT(063014) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FILED. (MODIFICATION GOVERNMENTAL) | |
June 30, 2014 | hearing | Income and Expense Declaration Filed Comment INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ALBERT SANDOVAL | |
April 12, 2010 | hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILED 04/02/10 BY MAIL ON 04/08/10 AS TO DESIREE C CALVILLO, FILED. (IMAGED) | |
April 02, 2010 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Crawley, John Comment MOTION RE: RE: JUDGMENT FOR CHILD SUPPORT,HEALTH CARE(12/30/09) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. (INITIAL GOVERNMENTAL) JOHN A CRAWLEY PRESIDING. CLERK: JANET DEAN BAILIFF: L HITCHCOCK NOT REPORTED - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY KIM WEST PRESENT FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO CHILD SUPPORT DIVISION. DEFENDANT ALBERT SANDOVAL PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR MTN JUDGMENT FILED 12/30/09 BY DCSS. INITIAL HEARING HELD. STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO'S MOTION JUDGMENT FILED 12/30/09 IS GRANTED. THE COURT ACCEPTS AND APPROVES STIPULATION AND ORDER. FOR JUDGMENT === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
April 02, 2010 | hearing | Received Documents for Imaging Scanned Comment RECEIVED DOCUMENTS FOR IMAGING | |
April 02, 2010 | hearing | On Case Party is Added as: Comment ON THE GOVERNMENTAL COMPLAINT OF THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO, DESIREE C CALVILLO IS ADDED AS A OTHER PARENT. | |
April 02, 2010 | hearing | Stipulated Judgment on Governmental Complaint Filed Comment Stipulated Judgment ON GOVERNMENTAL COMPLAINT OF THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FILED. JUDGMENT ENTERED BY STIPULATION JUDGMENT FOR: THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO JUDGMENT AGAINST: ALBERT SANDOVAL COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING.(FL) DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING (FL) | |
April 02, 2010 | hearing | Stipulation for Appointment of Court Commissioner filed Comment STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED | |
April 02, 2010 | hearing | DCSS - OSC / MTN / RFO Initial Original Type DCSS - OSC / MTN / RFO Initial Judicial Officer Crawley, John Hearing Time 8:00 AM Result Held Comment MOTION RE: RE: JUDGMENT FOR CHILD SUPPORT,HEALTH CARE(12/30/09) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. (INITIAL GOVERNMENTAL) | |
March 03, 2010 | hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF CONT TO 4/2/10 BY MAIL ON 03/02/10 AS TO DESIREE C. CALVILLO/ ALBERT SANDOVAL, FILED. | |
February 19, 2010 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Crawley, John Comment MOTION RE: RE: JUDGMENT FOR CHILD SUPPORT,HEALTH CARE(12/30/09) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. (INITIAL GOVERNMENTAL) JOHN A CRAWLEY PRESIDING. CLERK: JANET DEAN COURT REPORTER JULIE NAREZ-ARMBRUSTER;12512 BAILIFF: M GROSSI - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY KIM WEST PRESENT FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO CHILD SUPPORT DIVISION. OTHER PARENT DESIREE CALRILLO PRESENT PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ALBERT SANDOVAL - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR MTN JUDGMENT FILED 12/30/09 BY DCSS. INITIAL HEARING HELD. MATTER IS CONTINUED AS THE PARTIES HAVE UNDERGONE GENETIC TESTING AND ARE WAITING FOR THE GENETIC TEST RESULTS. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/02/10 AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT CS1. HRG MTN JUDGMENT FILED 12/30/09 BY DCSS DCSS TO GIVE NOTICE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
February 19, 2010 | hearing | DCSS - OSC / MTN / RFO Initial Original Type DCSS - OSC / MTN / RFO Initial Judicial Officer Crawley, John Hearing Time 8:00 AM Result Held Comment MOTION RE: RE: JUDGMENT FOR CHILD SUPPORT,HEALTH CARE(12/30/09) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. (INITIAL GOVERNMENTAL) | |
December 30, 2009 | hearing | Received Documents for Imaging Scanned Comment RECEIVED DOCUMENTS FOR IMAGING | |
December 30, 2009 | hearing | Income and Expense Declaration Filed Comment INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ALBERT SANDOVAL | |
December 30, 2009 | hearing | Declaration Filed Comment DECLARATION OF CSO FILED | |
December 30, 2009 | hearing | Notice Filed re: Comment NOTICE TO APPEAR AND PRODUCE FILED BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. | |
December 30, 2009 | hearing | Motion Filed Re: Comment MOTION RE: RE: JUDGMENT FOR CHILD SUPPORT,HEALTH CARE(12/30/09) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FILED. (INITIAL GOVERNMENTAL) | |
November 24, 2009 | hearing | Received Documents for Imaging Scanned Comment RECEIVED DOCUMENTS FOR IMAGING | |
November 24, 2009 | hearing | Income and Expense Declaration Filed Comment INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ALBERT SANDOVAL | |
November 24, 2009 | hearing | Answer to Complaint or Supplemental Filed (Governmental) Comment ANSWER FILED BY ALBERT SANDOVAL; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER. (GOVERNMENTAL) | |
November 16, 2009 | hearing | Received Documents for Imaging Scanned Comment RECEIVED DOCUMENTS FOR IMAGING | |
November 16, 2009 | hearing | Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET ON ALBERT SANDOVAL; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/09/09 | |
November 13, 2009 | hearing | Received Documents for Imaging Scanned Comment RECEIVED DOCUMENTS FOR IMAGING | |
November 13, 2009 | hearing | Declaration for Amended Proposed Judgment filed (Gov) Comment DECLARATION FOR AMENDED PROPOSED JUDGMENT FILED. AMENDS PROPOSED JUDGMENT LODGED ON 10/28/09 ON GOVERNMENTAL COMPLAINT OF THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. | |
October 28, 2009 | hearing | Attachment: Proposed Judgment Comment ATTACHMENT: PROPOSED JUDGMENT | |
October 28, 2009 | hearing | Attachment Filed Comment ATTACHMENT FILED | |
October 28, 2009 | hearing | Attachment: Guideline Calculations Filed Comment ATTACHMENT: GUIDELINE CALCULATIONS | |
October 28, 2009 | hearing | Governmental Case Initiated and Party Information Entered Comment GOVERNMENTAL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED | |
October 28, 2009 | hearing | Set Default Department to Comment SET DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO CS1 | |
October 28, 2009 | hearing | Summons Issued - Electronically Filed with Court Comment Summons ISSUED - ELECTRONICALLY FILED WITH COURT. |