Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CO SAN BDNO vs. MIGUEL BURGUENO
Governmental Complaint To Establish Child Sppt/Health Ins case was filed in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. Judge Crawley, John presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 02, 2009
Last Refreshed
November 20, 2022
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Duke D Rouse;Category
Governmental Complaint to Establish Child Sppt/Health Ins
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Child Support
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Trial Verdict
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2013 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Crawley, John Comment HEARING RE: CHILD SUPPORT JOHN A CRAWLEY,COMMISSIONER CLERK: KIMBERLY BEHAN COURT REPORTER JULIE NAREZ-ARMBRUSTER;12512 BAILIFF: L HITCHCOCK - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY VICTOR URSO PRESENT FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO CHILD SUPPORT DIVISION. DEFENDANT MIGUEL BURGUENO PRESENT ON GOVERNMENTAL COMPLAINT OF THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO, THE FOLLOWING PARTIES ARE PRESENT LETICIA HERNANDEZ. - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR HRG RE: RFO RE: CS(091812) BY LETICIA HERNANDEZ. MODIFICATION HEARING HELD. THE COURT FINDS JUDGMENT OF NON-PATERNITY OF WAS FILED 03/03/10 AND THIS COURT HAS NO JURISDICTION TO MAKE A SUPPORT ORDER IN THIS MATTER. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
February 13, 2013 | hearing | Hearing Re: Original Type Hearing Re: Judicial Officer Crawley, John Hearing Time 8:00 AM Result Held Comment HEARING RE: CHILD SUPPORT | |
January 31, 2013 | hearing | Comment: Comment FILE SENT TO CS1 WALL | |
January 31, 2013 | hearing | Update Jurisdiction to Comment UPDATE JURISDICTION TO KS. | |
January 03, 2013 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Rouse, Duke D Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY LETICIA HERNANDEZ RE: CHILD CUST/VISIT/ SUPPORT DUKE D ROUSE,JUDGE CLERK: TRACEE TAYLOR COURT REPORTER WANDA HARRISON;10489 BAILIFF: A CIMINO - APPEARANCES: PETITIONER LETICIA HERNANDEZ PRESENT RESPONDENT MIGUEL BURGUENO PRESENT SPANISH INTERPRETER CARMEN CORTEZ, DULY SWORN OR BY OATH ON FILE, PRESENT TO INTERPRET FOR THE WITNESS. - PROCEEDINGS: REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD. FAMILY COURT SERVICES REPORT FILED. WITNESS -- BOTH PARTIES ARE / IS SWORN AND EXAMINED. - THE COURT FINDS IT HAS JURISDICTION TO MAKE ORDERS REGARDING CHILD CUSTODY UNDER THE UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT. CUSTODY AND VISITATION ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: PURSUANT TO FAMILY CODE SECTION 3048, THE COURT HAS JURISDICTION TO MAKE ORDERS REGARDING CUSTODY UNDER THE FAMILY CODE AND THE UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT. NOTICE AND OPPORTUNITY TO BE HEARD WAS GIVEN TO THE PARTIES/RESPONDING PARTY AS PROVIDED BY THE LAWS OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA. THE COUNTRY OF HABITUAL RESIDENCE OF THE CHILD/CHILDREN IS THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. WRITTEN REPORT RECEIVED FROM CHILD CUSTODY RECOMMENDING COUNSELOR J. HILTON-LE BLANC. COURT MAKES ORDERS PURSUANT TO CHILD CUSTODY RECOMMENDING COUNSELING REPORT AS ATTACHED AND ORDERED INCORPORATED INTO THE MINUTE ORDER. PURSUANT TO THE ATTACHED AGREEMENT. PURSUANT TO ATTACHED RECOMMENDATION AS MODIFIED. COURT ORDERS FATHER TO COOPERATE WITH OBTAINING PASSPORTS FOR THE MINOR CHILD(REN). - SUPPORT ORDERS: COURT FINDS IT HAS NO JURISDICTION TO MAKE CHILD SUPPORT ORDERS. - HEARINGS: HEARING RE:CHILD SUPPORT SET FOR 02/13/13 AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT CS1. NOTICE WAIVED. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
January 03, 2013 | hearing | Request For Order Re: Original Type Request For Order Re: Judicial Officer Rouse, Duke D Hearing Time 08:30 AM Result Held Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY LETICIA HERNANDEZ RE: CHILD CUST/VISIT/ SUPPORT | |
October 02, 2012 | hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR ORDER BY PERSONAL ON 09/26/12 AS TO MIGUEL BURGUENO, FILED. | |
September 19, 2012 | hearing | Update Complaint of Comment UPDATE COMPLAINT OF FCS DESTRUCTION YEAR/INTERPRETER UPDATES | |
September 18, 2012 | hearing | Family Court Services Re: Comment FAMILY COURT SERVICES: APPOINTMENT 12-05-12 @ 1PM | |
September 18, 2012 | hearing | Party is Directed to Report to Family Court Services Comment LETICIA HERNANDEZ IS DIRECTED TO REPORT TO FAMILY COURT SERVICES FORTHWITH FOR ORIENTATION AND CHILD CUSTODY RECOMMENDING COUNSELING APPOINTMENTS. | |
September 18, 2012 | hearing | Income and Expense Declaration Filed Comment INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY LETICIA HERNANDEZ | |
September 18, 2012 | hearing | Declaration Under UCCJEA filed Comment DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED | |
September 18, 2012 | hearing | Request for Order Filed re: Comment REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY LETICIA HERNANDEZ RE: CHILD CUST/VISIT/SUPPORT. | |
September 18, 2012 | hearing | Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed is Granted Comment REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY LETICIA HERNANDEZ IS GRA | |
September 18, 2012 | hearing | Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted Filed Comment ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED. | |
September 18, 2012 | hearing | Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs Filed Comment REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY LETICIA HERNANDEZ. | |
September 18, 2012 | hearing | Update Jurisdiction to Comment UPDATE JURISDICTION TO SS. | |
September 18, 2012 | hearing | Filing Fee Waived for Comment FILING FEE WAIVED ON LETICIA HERNANDEZ FOR 1ST FILING/RFO IN THE AMOUNT OF $525.00. | |
March 03, 2010 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Crawley, John Comment MOTION RE: RE: JUDGMENT FOR CHILD SUPPORT,HEALTH CARE(10/08/09) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. (INITIAL GOVERNMENTAL) JOHN A CRAWLEY PRESIDING. CLERK: JANET DEAN COURT REPORTER JULIE NAREZ-ARMBRUSTER;12512 BAILIFF: M GROSSI - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY VICTOR URSO PRESENT FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO CHILD SUPPORT DIVISION. OTHER PARENT LETICIA HERNANDEZ PRESENT DEFENDANT MIGUEL BURGUENO PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR MTN JUDGMENT FILED 10/08/09 BY DCSS. INITIAL HEARING HELD. THE COURT ENTERS A JUDGMENT OF NON-PATERNITY AS THE DEFENDANT WAS EXCLUDED BY GENETIC TESTING AS THE BIOLOGICAL FATHER OF THE MINOR KYARA BURGUENO; DOB: 12/11/00. === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
March 03, 2010 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Crawley, John Comment HEARING RE: DEF REQ SET ASIDE VOL DECL PAT FILED 10/8/09 JOHN A CRAWLEY PRESIDING. CLERK: JANET DEAN COURT REPORTER JULIE NAREZ-ARMBRUSTER;12512 BAILIFF: M GROSSI - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY VICTOR URSO PRESENT FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO CHILD SUPPORT DIVISION. OTHER PARENT LETICIA HERNANDEZ PRESENT DEFENDANT MIGUEL BURGUENO PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR SET ASIDE VOLUNTARY DECLARATION OF PATERNITY. OSC/MOTION HELD. THE COURT SETS ASIDE THE VOLUNTARY DECLARATION OF PATERNITY AS THE DEFENDANT WAS EXCLUDED BY GENETIC TESTING AS THE BIOLOGICAL FATHER OF KYARA BURGUENO; DOB: 12/11/00. === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
March 03, 2010 | hearing | Received Documents for Imaging Scanned Comment RECEIVED DOCUMENTS FOR IMAGING | |
March 03, 2010 | hearing | Judgment After Trial on Governmental Complaint Comment JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING/TRIAL ON GOVERNMENTAL COMPLAINT OF THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FILED. JUDGMENT ON GOVERNMENTAL COMPLAINT OF THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO ORDERED ENTERED 03/03/10 JUDGMENT FOR: THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO JUDGMENT AGAINST: MIGUEL BURGUENO COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING.(FL) DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING (FL) ON THE GOVERNMENTAL COMPLAINT OF THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO, LETICIA HERNANDEZ IS ADDED AS A OTHER PARENT. | |
March 03, 2010 | hearing | DCSS - OSC / MTN / RFO Initial Original Type DCSS - OSC / MTN / RFO Initial Judicial Officer Crawley, John Hearing Time 8:00 AM Result Held Comment MOTION RE: RE: JUDGMENT FOR CHILD SUPPORT,HEALTH CARE(10/08/09) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. (INITIAL GOVERNMENTAL) | |
March 03, 2010 | hearing | Hearing Re: Original Type Hearing Re: Judicial Officer Crawley, John Hearing Time 8:00 AM Result Held Comment HEARING RE: DEF REQ SET ASIDE VOL DECL PAT FILED 10/8/09 | |
January 27, 2010 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment REQUEST FOR HEARING RE: RE: HRG & APP TO SET ASIDE VOLUNTARY DEC OF PAT(120809) BY MIGUEL BURGUENO FILED. (MODIFICATION GOVERNMENTAL) VACATE GOVHM HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/27/10 AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT CS1. | |
January 27, 2010 | hearing | DCSS - OSC / MTN / RFO Modification Original Type DCSS - OSC / MTN / RFO Modification Hearing Time 8:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment REQUEST FOR HEARING RE: RE: HRG & APP TO SET ASIDE VOLUNTARY DEC OF PAT(120809) BY MIGUEL BURGUENO FILED. (MODIFICATION GOVERNMENTAL) | |
January 11, 2010 | hearing | Received Documents for Imaging Scanned Comment RECEIVED DOCUMENTS FOR IMAGING | |
January 11, 2010 | hearing | Order After Hearing Filed Comment ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED. HEARING DATE 01/06/10 IN DEPT CS1. | |
January 07, 2010 | hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF CONT TO 3/3/10 BY MAIL ON 01/07/10 AS TO MIGUEL BURGUENO/LETICIA HERNANDEZ, FILED. | |
January 06, 2010 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Crawley, John Comment MOTION RE: RE: JUDGMENT FOR CHILD SUPPORT,HEALTH CARE(10/08/09) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. (INITIAL GOVERNMENTAL) JOHN A CRAWLEY PRESIDING. CLERK: JANET DEAN COURT REPORTER KAREN CUELLAR;13210 BAILIFF: M GROSSI - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY VICTOR URSO PRESENT FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO CHILD SUPPORT DIVISION. OTHER PARENT LETICIA HERNANDEZ PRESENT DEFENDANT MIGUEL BURGUENO PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR MTN JUDGMENT FILED 10/08/09 BY DCSS. INITIAL HEARING HELD. THE COURT ADVANCES THE DEFENDANTS REQUEST TO SET ASIDE THE VOLUNTARY DECLARATION OF PATERNITY SET FOR 1/27/10 TO THIS DATE. JOINDER OF CUSTODIAL PARENT: THE FOLLOWING PERSON HAS BEEN ADDED AS A PARTY TO THIS ACTION PURSUANT TO FC17404: LETICIA HERNANDEZ THE COURT ORDERS GENETIC TESTING. BOTH PARTIES ARE ORDERED TO COOPERATE WITH GENETIC TESTING AND MAKE THE MINOR CHILD AVAILABLE FOR GENETIC TESTING. - HEARINGS: HEARING RE:DEF REQ SET ASIDE VOL DECL PAT FILED 10/8/09 SET FOR 03/03/10 AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT CS1. CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 03/03/10 AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT CS1. HRG MTN JUDGMENT FILED 10/8/09 BY DCSS DCSS TO GIVE NOTICE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
January 06, 2010 | hearing | DCSS - OSC / MTN / RFO Initial Original Type DCSS - OSC / MTN / RFO Initial Judicial Officer Crawley, John Hearing Time 8:00 AM Result Held Comment MOTION RE: RE: JUDGMENT FOR CHILD SUPPORT,HEALTH CARE(10/08/09) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. (INITIAL GOVERNMENTAL) | |
December 30, 2009 | hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE BY MAIL ON 12/28/09 AS TO MIGUEL BUGUENO/LETICIA HERNANDE, FILED. | |
December 30, 2009 | hearing | Responsive Declaration re: RFO filed Comment RESPONSIVE DECLARATION OF THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO TO OSC OR NOTICE OF MOTION FILED ON 12/08/09. | |
December 30, 2009 | hearing | Received Documents for Imaging Scanned Comment RECEIVED DOCUMENTS FOR IMAGING | |
December 22, 2009 | hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR HEARING SET FOR 1/27/10 BY MAIL ON 12/21/09 AS TO LETICIA HERNANDEZ, FILED. | |
December 08, 2009 | hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR HEARING PACKET BY MAIL ON 12/08/09 AS TO DCSS/LETICIA HERNANDEZ C/O DCSS, FILED. | |
December 08, 2009 | hearing | Declaration Filed Comment DECLARATION OF MIGUEL BURGUENO FILED | |
December 08, 2009 | hearing | Hearing Re: Comment REQUEST FOR HEARING RE: RE: HRG & APP TO SET ASIDE VOLUNTARY DEC OF PAT(120809) BY MIGUEL BURGUENO FILED. (MODIFICATION GOVERNMENTAL) | |
November 12, 2009 | hearing | Proof of Service Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF CONT TO 1/06 IN CS1 BY MAIL ON 11/10/09 AS TO MIGUEL BURGUENO/LETICIA HERNANDEZ, FILED. | |
November 04, 2009 | hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Crawley, John Comment MOTION RE: RE: JUDGMENT FOR CHILD SUPPORT,HEALTH CARE(10/08/09) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. (INITIAL GOVERNMENTAL) JOHN A CRAWLEY PRESIDING. CLERK: JANET DEAN COURT REPORTER JULIE NAREZ-ARMBRUSTER;12512 BAILIFF: M GROSSI - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY VICTOR URSO PRESENT FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO CHILD SUPPORT DIVISION. DEFENDANT MIGUEL BURGUENO PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR MTN JUDGMENT FILED 10/08/09 BY DCSS. INITIAL HEARING HELD. STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED MATTER IS CONTINUED FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE A MOTION TO SET ASIDE VOLUNTARY DECLARATION OF PATERNITY. THE MOTHER HAS INDICATED TO THE DEFENDANT THAT HE IS NOT THE BIOLOGICAL FATHER OF THE MINOR. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 01/06/10 AT 08:00 IN DEPARTMENT CS1. HRG MTN JUDGMENT FILED 10/08/09 BY DCSS DCSS TO GIVE NOTICE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
November 04, 2009 | hearing | Received Documents for Imaging Scanned Comment RECEIVED DOCUMENTS FOR IMAGING | |
November 04, 2009 | hearing | Stipulation for Appointment of Court Commissioner filed Comment STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED | |
November 04, 2009 | hearing | DCSS - OSC / MTN / RFO Initial Original Type DCSS - OSC / MTN / RFO Initial Judicial Officer Crawley, John Hearing Time 8:00 AM Result Held Comment MOTION RE: RE: JUDGMENT FOR CHILD SUPPORT,HEALTH CARE(10/08/09) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. (INITIAL GOVERNMENTAL) | |
October 08, 2009 | hearing | Received Documents for Imaging Scanned Comment RECEIVED DOCUMENTS FOR IMAGING | |
October 08, 2009 | hearing | Notice Filed re: Comment NOTICE TO APPEAR AND PRODUCE FILED BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. | |
October 08, 2009 | hearing | Declaration Filed Comment DECLARATION OF CSO FILED | |
October 08, 2009 | hearing | Motion Filed Re: Comment MOTION RE: RE: JUDGMENT FOR CHILD SUPPORT,HEALTH CARE(10/08/09) BY THE COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FILED. (INITIAL GOVERNMENTAL) | |
August 20, 2009 | hearing | Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Comment DEFAULT PACKET IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): DEFENDANT HAS ANSWERED CANNOT DEFAULT . | |
August 10, 2009 | hearing | Received Documents for Imaging Scanned Comment RECEIVED DOCUMENTS FOR IMAGING | |
August 10, 2009 | hearing | Answer to Complaint or Supplemental Filed (Governmental) Comment ANSWER FILED BY MIGUEL BURGUENO; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER. (GOVERNMENTAL) | |
June 25, 2009 | hearing | Received Documents for Imaging Scanned Comment RECEIVED DOCUMENTS FOR IMAGING | |
June 25, 2009 | hearing | Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET ON MIGUEL BURGUENO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 06/23/09 | |
June 02, 2009 | hearing | Attachment Filed Comment ATTACHMENT FILED | |
June 02, 2009 | hearing | Attachment: Proposed Judgment Comment ATTACHMENT: PROPOSED JUDGMENT | |
June 02, 2009 | hearing | Summons Issued - Electronically Filed with Court Comment Summons ISSUED - ELECTRONICALLY FILED WITH COURT. | |
June 02, 2009 | hearing | Governmental Case Initiated and Party Information Entered Comment GOVERNMENTAL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED | |
June 02, 2009 | hearing | Set Default Department to Comment SET DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO CS1 | |
June 02, 2009 | hearing | Attachment: Guideline Calculations Filed Comment ATTACHMENT: GUIDELINE CALCULATIONS |