Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
HELENA MAY GAGNON VS. KELLISHA MAGEE
On January 23, 2018 an auto accident case was filed by Gagnon, Helena May, against Magee, Kellisha, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. Judge Cecilia P. Castellanos presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 23, 2018
Last Refreshed
August 29, 2022
Filing Location
San Francisco County, CA
Category
AUTO ACCIDENT
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
5 months and 26 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
ORDER RE: DISMISSED W/O PREJUDICE (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS)
Date: Jun 05, 2018ORDER RE: CONTINUED FOR PROOF OF SERVICE (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS)
Date: Mar 19, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | REMARK: RETURNED MAIL: SMALL CLAIMS ORDER OF DISMISSAL MAILED TO PLAINTIFF ON 6/5/18. PER U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, "RETURN TO SENDER - VACANT - UNABLE TO FORWARD." | |
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER RE: DISMISSED W/O PREJUDICE (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS) | |
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERS DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF OR DEFENDANT. NO PROOF OF SERVICE. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: CECILIA P\. CASTELLANOS; CLERK: G. FELICIANO; NOT REPORTED. 506 | |
June 05, 2018 | hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: VISITING JUDGE |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF MAR-19-2018 - CONTINUED FOR PROOF OF SERVICE TO JUN-05-2018 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 506 PLAINTIFF HELENA GAGNON IS PRESENT. DEFENDANT IS NOT PRESENT. NO PROOF OF SERVICE. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: CECILIA P\. CASTELLANOS; CLERK: G. FELICIANO; NOT REPORTED. 506 | |
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER RE: CONTINUED FOR PROOF OF SERVICE (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS) | |
March 19, 2018 | hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: VISITING JUDGE |
|
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event | AUTO ACCIDENT CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $5,984.49 FILED BY GAGNON, HELENA MAY AS TO DEFENDANT MAGEE, KELLISHA ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR MAR-19-2018 AT 03:30 PM IN DEPT 506 | |
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GAGNON, HELENA MAY ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52 |