Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
SCHOLL, DAMON P. VS POE, ANDREW
On February 14, 2007 a money case was filed by Scholl, Damon P., against Poe, Andrew, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 14, 2007
Last Refreshed
November 06, 2022
Filing Location
San Francisco County, CA
Category
MONEY
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
6 years, 7 months and 2 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2013 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, AS TO DEFENDANT POE, ANDREW | |
October 19, 2007 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS ORDERED DESTROYED | |
July 05, 2007 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL FROM POST OFFICE SENT TO DEFENDANT ANDREW POE-ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN- UNABLE TO FORWARD. | |
June 26, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
June 18, 2007 | hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: PAUL SLAVIT |
|
June 18, 2007 | Docket Event | THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF SCHOLL, DAMON P. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT POE, ANDREW $291.48 PRINCIPAL, $30.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $321.48 STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS | |
May 02, 2007 | Docket Event | INSTRUCTIONS FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE MAILED TO DEFENDANT ANDREW POE. | |
May 02, 2007 | Docket Event | INSTRUCTIONS FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE SENT TO ANDREW POE IN BOTH HIS CHICAGO, ILL. ADDRESS AND WATERLOO, IA ADDRESS. | |
April 23, 2007 | hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: PAUL SLAVIT |
|
April 23, 2007 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS DISPOSITION APR-23-2007, CONTINUED BY COURT TO JUN-18-2007 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 506 | |
April 12, 2007 | Docket Event | DECLARATION. DEFT POE SHALL CONTACT THE COURT IN WRITING ON OR BEFORE MAY 1, 2007 TO ADVISE THE COURT HOW HE CHOOSES TO PROCEED. | |
April 12, 2007 | Docket Event | DEFT POE MAY APPEAR BY TELEPHONE, TO BE PRE- ARRANGED W/ THE COURT; OR MAY SUBMIT WRITTEN DECLARATION & EVIDENCE PURSUANT TO TRIAL BY | |
April 06, 2007 | Docket Event | DEFT'S REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE, FILED $10.00 FEE PAID. | |
April 06, 2007 | Docket Event | NEW ADDRESS OF DEFT PER REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE: 181 PROSPECT BLVD WATERLOO, IA 50701 | |
February 14, 2007 | Docket Event | MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $1,500.00 FILED BY SCHOLL, DAMON P. AS TO DEFENDANT POE, ANDREW ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR APR-23-2007 AT 06:30 PM IN DEPT 506 |