Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MIDLAND FUNDING VS PEREZ
A Collection Assignee Decl. Crc 3.740 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. Judge Christopher B. Harmon presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 25, 2020
Last Refreshed
December 11, 2021
Filing Location
Riverside County, CA
Category
Collection Assignee Decl. CRC 3.740
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Settlement
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2021 | HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.74 (CORONA) | ||
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385(c)) |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200) on Complaint (Collections - Corona) of MIDLAND FUNDING LLC |
|
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collections - Corona) of MIDLAND FUNDING LLC served on PAULETTEA PEREZ with service date of 10/21/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collections - Corona) of MIDLAND FUNDING LLC |
|
October 28, 2020 |
PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTIONS - CORONA) FILED 10/01/2020 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC SERVED ON PAULETTEA PEREZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/21/20 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE) Not Applicable |
||
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | System Generated Notice re: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing. |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment. |
|
October 08, 2020 |
SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING. Not Applicable |
||
October 08, 2020 |
SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT. Not Applicable |
||
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons Issued on Complaint (Collections - Corona) of MIDLAND FUNDING LLC and filed. |
|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92881. |
|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration re: BP 63221 filed by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC |
|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Assignee Declaration CRC 3.740 filed. (Corona) |
|
October 01, 2020 |
LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTIONS ASSIGNEE DECLARATION CRC 3.740 FILED. (CORONA) Not Applicable |
||
October 01, 2020 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET 4/21/21 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT C1. | ||
October 01, 2020 | COLLECTION CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT C1. (CORONA) | ||
October 01, 2020 |
DECLARATION RE: BP 63221 FILED BY MIDLAND FUNDING LLC Not Applicable |
||
October 01, 2020 |
Civil Case Cover Sheet FILED. Not Applicable |
||
October 01, 2020 |
Summons ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTIONS - CORONA) FILED 10/01/2020 OF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC AND FILED. Not Applicable |
||
October 01, 2020 |
COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED (COLLECTION) (CORONA) Not Applicable |
||
October 01, 2020 |
CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92881. Not Applicable |
||
April 21, 2020 | hearing |
Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.74 (Corona) Vacated Judge: Christopher B. Harmon |
|
April 21, 2020 | hearing | HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.74 (CORONA) | |
February 25, 2020 | hearing |
Hearing on Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement Pursuant to CRC 3.1385(c) Vacated Judge: Christopher B. Harmon |