Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DISCOVER BANK VS RODRIGUEZ
A Collection Crc 3.740-Under $10,000 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. Judge Christopher B. Harmon presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 19, 2020
Last Refreshed
April 18, 2022
Filing Location
Riverside County, CA
Category
Collection CRC 3.740-Under $10,000
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Claim of Exemption on Complaint (Collections - Corona) of DISCOVER BANK |
|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing (eFiling) on on Complaint (Collections - Corona) of DISCOVER BANK |
|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption on Complaint (Collections - Corona) of DISCOVER BANK |
|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing (eFiling) on Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption on Complaint (Collections - Corona) of DISCOVER BANK |
|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption on Complaint (Collections - Corona) of DISCOVER BANK |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest (MC-012) on Complaint (Collections - Corona) of DISCOVER BANK |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Waiver of Post Judgment Costs |
|
October 19, 2021 | HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.74 (CORONA) | ||
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk on Complaint (Collections - Corona) of DISCOVER BANK |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint (Collections - Corona) of DISCOVER BANK |
|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Counsel for Plaintiff Re: Order to Show Cause |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration re Non-Active Military Status |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration in support of entry of Judgment re: Compliance with CCP Section 1033 |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Statement of Case on Complaint (Collections - Corona) of DISCOVER BANK |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint (Collections - Corona) of DISCOVER BANK |
|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service on Complaint (Collections - Corona) of DISCOVER BANK |
|
October 19, 2020 | hearing |
Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.74 (Corona) Vacated Judge: Christopher B. Harmon |
|
October 19, 2020 | hearing | HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.74 (CORONA) | |
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event | System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING. |
|
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons Issued on Complaint (Collections - Corona) of DISCOVER BANK and filed. |
|
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92509. |
|
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Corona) |
|
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event | System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT. |
|
October 02, 2020 | COLLECTION CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT C1. (CORONA) | ||
October 02, 2020 |
LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTIONS UNDER $10,000. CRC 3.740 FILED. (CORONA) Not Applicable |
||
October 02, 2020 |
SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING. Not Applicable |
||
October 02, 2020 |
CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92509. Not Applicable |
||
October 02, 2020 |
SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTIONS - CORONA) FILED 10/02/2020 OF DISCOVER BANK AND FILED. Not Applicable |
||
October 02, 2020 |
COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED (COLLECTION) (CORONA) Not Applicable |
||
October 02, 2020 |
SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT. Not Applicable |
||
October 02, 2020 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET 10/19/21 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT C1. | ||
October 02, 2020 |
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. Not Applicable |
||
April 19, 2020 | hearing |
Hearing re: Claim of Exemption
Judge: Christopher B. Harmon |
|
April 19, 2020 | hearing |
Hearing re: Motion Hearing on Opposition to Claim of Exemption
Judge: Christopher B. Harmon |