Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Midland Credit Management Inc. -v- Pearson et al Print
On May 31, 2024 a rule 3.740 collections $10,000.01 - $35,000 limited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. Judge Carlos Cabrera presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 31, 2024
Last Refreshed
June 02, 2024
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
Rule 3.740 Collections $10,000.01 - $35,000 Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Overview
Causes of Action
COMPLAINT FOR:
(1) Breach 0f Contract
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a legal case filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc. against Nalleli Pearson for breach of contract in the Superior Court of California, San Bernardino District. Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a debt buyer that purchased th…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: Jun 01, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 31, 2024Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 31, 2024Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 31, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2025 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Cabrera, Carlos |
||
June 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Sent | |
May 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed Complaint |
|
May 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Civil Case Cover Sheet |
|
May 31, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed | |
May 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Assignment Received Certificate of Assignment |
|
May 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jurisdiction Verified Fort Irwin, CA 92310-2483 |
|
May 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $380.00 via e-file paid on 06-01-24 by Plaintiff for first appearance fees |