Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC -v- CASTRO et al Print
On May 31, 2024 a rule 3.740 collections $10,000 or less limited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. Judge Joseph T Ortiz presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 31, 2024
Last Refreshed
June 02, 2024
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
Rule 3.740 Collections $10,000 or Less Limited
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Summons Issued and Filed
Date: Jun 01, 2024Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: Jun 01, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 31, 2024Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 31, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2025 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
June 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed | |
June 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Sent | |
June 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jurisdiction Verified Victorville, CA 92395 |
|
May 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Civil Case Cover Sheet |
|
May 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Assignment Received Certificate of Assignment |
|
May 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed Complaint |
|
May 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $240.00 via e-file on 6/1/24 by plaintiff for 1st appearance fees. |