Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Lvnv Funding Llc -v- Viviana Gaviria, an individual; and DOES 1 through 10 inclusive Print
On May 31, 2024 a rule 3.740 collections -reduced filing fee limited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. Judge Joseph T Ortiz presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 31, 2024
Last Refreshed
June 02, 2024
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
Rule 3.740 Collections -Reduced Filing Fee Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Overview
interest t0 original creditor, Synchrony Bank.
NNNNNNNNNHHr—r—r—HHHHH
Causes of Action
FACTS COMMON TO ALL CAUSES OF ACTION
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a legal case filed by LVNV Funding LLC against Viviana Gaviria and other individuals. LVNV Funding LLC is a debt buyer and the owner of the debt in question, originally from Synchrony Bank. The complaint states that the debt was…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: Jun 01, 2024Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 31, 2024Declaration re:
Date: May 31, 2024Declaration re:
Date: May 31, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 31, 2024Summons Issued on
Date: May 31, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2025 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
June 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Sent | |
June 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jurisdiction Verified Fontana CA 92336-0724 |
|
June 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $196.00 PAID VIA EFILE paid on 06/01/2024 plaintiffs filing fee |
|
June 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed | |
May 31, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of Assignment Received | |
May 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Re: Venue |
|
May 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Re: Reduced Filling Fee |
|
May 31, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed | |
May 31, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons Issued on | |
May 31, 2024 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed |