Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company -v- Kimberly Gonzalez, et al Print
On January 17, 2024 an uninsured motorist unlimited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. Judge Jay H Robinson presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 17, 2024
Last Refreshed
May 17, 2024
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
Uninsured Motorist Unlimited
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Overview
Causes of Action
SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA
COUNTY 0F SAN BERNARDINO
SAN BERNARDINO DISTRICT
1/17/2024 4:41 PM
By: Michelle Gomez-Casillas, DEPUTY
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a petition filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company in the Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino, regarding an underinsured motorist arbitration case. The petition requests the court to open a discovery ca…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Notice of Required Documents Sent
Date: Mar 14, 2024Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: Mar 14, 2024Notice of Required Documents Sent
Date: Mar 14, 2024Petition Filed (Civil)
Date: Jan 17, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2024 |
Department S35 - SBJC
Judge: Robinson, Jay H |
||
June 11, 2024 |
Department S35 - SBJC
Judge: Robinson, Jay H |
||
June 06, 2024 |
Department S35 - SBJC
Judge: Robinson, Jay H |
||
May 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Remote Hearing Held Via Court Call | |
May 13, 2024 |
Department S35 - SBJC
Judge: Robinson, Jay H |
||
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES OF AARON TORRES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE, WITHOUT OBJECTIONS | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES OF AARON TORRES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, WITHOUT OBJECTIONS | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES OF KIMBERLY GONZALEZ TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES OF KIMBERLY GONZALEZ TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE, WITHOUT OBJECTIONS | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL KIMBERLY GONZALEZ S RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL AARON TORRES RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Required Documents Sent Please submit mandatory form, Civil Case Cover Sheet. |
|
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Sent | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Required Documents Sent COA |
|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Petition Filed (Civil) | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $435 paid via efile 03/14/24 |