Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC -v- SAGAGON et al Print
On June 08, 2023 a rule 3.740 collections -reduced filing fee limited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. Judge Brian S McCarville presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 08, 2023
Last Refreshed
September 06, 2023
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
Rule 3.740 Collections -Reduced Filing Fee Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Overview
Causes of Action
COMPLAINT FOR COMMON COUNTS
1. Account Stated
2. Open Book
Demand Amount: $1,305.77
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by CAVALRY SPV LLC against Moises O Sagahon and other unnamed defendants. The complaint includes two common counts: account stated and open book. The demand amount stated in the complaint is $1,305.77.
The bac…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: Jun 09, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: Jun 09, 2023Declaration re:
Date: Jun 08, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: Jun 08, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: Jun 08, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2024 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Sent | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration re: Reduced Filing Fees BP6322.1(c)(1) Filed | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed. (Limited Jurisdiction - Dec BP6322.1(c)(1)) | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Declaration of Venue |
|
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Assignment Received | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $196 CHK PAID ON 6/9/23 FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES |