Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In re: Patrick Scott Adams II Print
On November 10, 2021 a petition for change ofname and gender case was filed by Adams Ii, Patrick Scott, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. Judge Ronald J Gilbert presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 10, 2021
Last Refreshed
December 20, 2023
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
Petition for Change ofName and Gender
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a petition for a change of name, recognition of change of gender, and issuance of a new birth certificate. The petitioner, Patrick Scott Adams II, is requesting that the court decree a name change to Naomi Evelyn Adams to confor…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Documents
Decree Changing Name and Gender Granted
Date: Feb 18, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: Nov 10, 2021Order to Show Cause for Change of Name
Date: Nov 10, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: Nov 10, 2021Petition re: Change of Name and Gender Filed
Date: Nov 10, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2022 |
Department S16 - SBJC
Judge: Gilbert, Ronald J |
||
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Decree Changing Name and Gender Granted | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Name and Gender Time Standard | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $435.80 credit card paid on 1/4/22 for first appearance/postage |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Assignment Received | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause for Change of Name and Gender |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition re: Change of Name and Gender Filed |