Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Cavalry SPV I, LLC -v- Chavez et al Print
On November 10, 2021 a rule 3.740 collections$10,000.01 - $25,000 limited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. Judge Ronald J Gilbert presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 10, 2021
Last Refreshed
December 20, 2023
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
San Bernardino
Category
Rule 3.740 Collections$10,000.01 - $25,000 Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: Jan 03, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: Jan 03, 2022Declaration re:
Date: Nov 10, 2021Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: Nov 10, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: Nov 10, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2023 |
Department S16 - SBJC
Judge: Gilbert, Ronald J |
||
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to: |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Sent | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Declaration regarding Statement of Venue |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Assignment Received | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $380.00 check paid on 1/3/22 for first appearance fees |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed |