Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
COUNTY OF SB -V- ELIAS GOMEZ Print
On October 14, 2009 an other collections $10,000 or less limited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 14, 2009
Last Refreshed
October 14, 2022
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
San Bernardino
Category
Collections (ltd)
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Closed
Case Duration
6 months and 20 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2010 | |||
May 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
May 05, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
May 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO CP36 |
|
February 05, 2010 |
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
February 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION DONALD ALVAREZ PRESIDING. CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON;7079 COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY PAUL ST JOHN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. - PROCEEDINGS: HEARING ON: OSC RE SERVICE COMP |
|
February 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO CP36 |
|
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Summons ISSUED AND FILED | |
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Pursuant to Government Code Section 6103.5 Fees are Waived PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO ARE WAIVED FOR INITIAL FILING FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $335.00. |
|
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED | |
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36 |