Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO -V- GARCIA Print
On October 14, 2009 an other collections $10,000 or less limited case was filed by County Of San Bernardino, represented by Office Of County Counsel, against Garcia, Alfred, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. Judge Gafkowski, Frank presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 14, 2009
Last Refreshed
October 14, 2022
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
San Bernardino
Category
Collections (ltd)
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
7 months and 12 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - San Bernardino LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED PARTIALLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00. |
|
April 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Acknowlgmt of Satisfaction of Jmnt Filed - Fully Satisfied Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment FILED; JUDGMENT IS FULLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $15,165.45 |
|
April 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed - Status is now: JUDGMENT STATUS IS NOW SATISFIED. |
|
September 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment ISSUED | |
August 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - San Bernardino WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY. ( $15,190.45 ) |
|
August 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): ABSTRACT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): JUDGMENT AMOUNT DOES NOT MATCH. |
|
August 02, 2010 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 | |
July 09, 2010 | |||
July 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL |
|
May 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Reqst for Court Judgment under CCP585D Filed DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED. |
|
May 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Complaint Filed JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO FILED JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO ORDERED ENTERED 05/27/10 JUDGMENT FOR: COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO JUDGMENT AGAINST: ALFRED GARCIA JUDGME |
|
May 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE OSCDM HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/09/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37. |
|
May 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO AS TO ALFRED GARCIA. |
|
May 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALFRED GARCIA FILED. |
|
May 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Does Only DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO AS TO DOES ONLY |
|
May 11, 2010 | Docket Event | DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED | |
May 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FILED BY COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO. |
|
April 30, 2010 |
Judge: Gafkowski, Frank |
||
April 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FRANK GAFKOWSKI PRESIDING. CLERK: LORI MOWLES COURT REPORTER KATHY SELLERS;4420 COURT ATTENDANT N PINGREY - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY PAUL ST JOHN, DEPUTY COUNTY COUNSEL PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ALFRED G |
|
April 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO CP37 |
|
January 29, 2010 | |||
January 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION |
|
January 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE OSCSV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/29/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37. |
|
January 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO ALFRED GARCIA SERVED ON 01/09/10 WITH FEES OF $32.50. |
|
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37 | |
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Pursuant to Government Code Section 6103.5 Fees are Waived PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO ARE WAIVED FOR FILING FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $340.00. |
|
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED | |
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet FILED. | |
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event | Summons ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE. |