Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
IN RE SHAWN SMITH Print
On October 14, 2009 an other petition (not spec) unlimited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. Judge Frank J. Gafkowski presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 14, 2009
Last Refreshed
October 14, 2022
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
San Bernardino
Category
Miscellaneous Petition
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
General Family
Status
Closed
Case Duration
2 months and 7 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event | FEE PAYMENT 190429-0901-MO FCP/ 30.00 PAYMT 190429-0901-MO REFERENCE NUMBER 25876210588 | |
January 15, 2010 | Docket Event | FEE PAYMENT 100115-3514-CS FCP/ 7.50 PAYMT | |
December 21, 2009 |
Judge: Gafkowski, Frank |
||
December 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: PETTION FOR TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT FRANK GAFKOWSKI PRESIDING. CLERK: LORI MOWLES COURT REPORTER KATHY SELLERS;4420 COURT ATTENDANT N PINGREY - APPEARANCES: SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY SUZANNE KLUMP FOR PLAINTIFF. PAYEE SHAWN SMITH PRESENT |
|
December 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Comment: ORDER APPROVING TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS BY AND BETWEEN SHAWN SMITH, AND 321 RECEIVABLES ORIGINATION, LLC FILED. |
|
December 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO CP37 |
|
November 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is: PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION/VERIFIED PETITION FILED AS TO SHAWN SMITH. PARTY SERVED ON 11/06/09. TYPE OF SERVICE IS VIA FEDERAL EXPRESS. WITH FEES OF $0.00. |
|
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. | |
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event | SET DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO S37 | |
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event | PETITION FILED (CIVIL) 091104-0826-CK CVF/ 355.00 PAYMT | |
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed NOTICE OF HERAING ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL FOR TRANSFER OF STRUCTERED SETTLEMENT FILED. |