Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ARROW FINANCIAL -V- MIRIAM RODRIGUEZ ETAL Print
On October 14, 2009 a rule 3.740 collections $10,000 or less limited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 14, 2009
Last Refreshed
October 14, 2022
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
San Bernardino
Category
Collections-CRC3.740
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
2 months and 25 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S) | |
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): ALL JUDGMENT DEBTORS MUST BE LISTED ON APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL. |
|
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT J COLCLOUGH III WITH RESURGENCE LEGAL GROUP PC AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR LVNV FUNDING, LLC. | |
March 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - Orange WRIT RETURNED UNSATISFIED FROM ORANGE COUNTY WITH COSTS OF $0.00. |
|
September 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - Orange WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO ORANGE COUNTY. ( 14744.14 ) 150929-1942-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 150929-1942-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 9802 |
|
September 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $5,268.36) |
|
September 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FOR LVNV FUNDING, LLC FILED. |
|
September 23, 2015 | Docket Event | ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT OF ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC FILED ADDING LVNV FUNDING, LLC AS THE ASSIGNEE OF THIS JUDGMENT. | |
May 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Comment: FINAL RETURN TO COURT/WRIT OF EXECUTION FILED |
|
April 11, 2012 | Docket Event | FEE PAYMENT 120411-2322-CK FCP/ 1.00 PAYMT 120411-2322-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 66090 | |
October 18, 2010 | |||
October 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
July 20, 2010 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED 100720-3320-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 100720-3320-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 171842 | |
July 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - San Bernardino WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY. ( $10,078.23 ) 100720-3319-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 100720-3319-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 171842 |
|
July 07, 2010 | Docket Event | COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $352.45 | |
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT MIRIAM RODRIGUEZ JOHN M PACHECO PRESIDING. CLERK: KATHLEEN SAENZ NOT REPORTED COURT ATTENDANT V AMADOR - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD OFF-CALEN |
|
May 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT JOSE R RODRIGUEZ JOHN M PACHECO PRESIDING. CLERK: KATHLEEN SAENZ NOT REPORTED COURT ATTENDANT V AMADOR - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD OFF-CALEN |
|
May 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE TO S31 |
|
May 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: PUT FILE IN LEGAL RESEARCH BIN FOR REVIEW |
|
April 16, 2010 | |||
April 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
March 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed MOTION RE: SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND DEFAULTJUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT MIRIAM RODRIGUEZ 100309-4697-VS CAN/ 220.00 PAYMT 100309-4697-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 622624 |
|
March 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed MOTION RE: SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND DEFAULTJUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT JOSE R RODRIGUEZ 100309-4682-VS CAN/ 220.00 PAYMT 100309-4682-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 507127 |
|
January 22, 2010 | |||
January 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MIRIAM RODRIGUEZ, JOSE R RODRIGUEZ FILED. |
|
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Certificate & Order Vacating Docs Filed. Ntc Sent to Parties CERTIFICATE AND ORDER VACATING DOCUMENTS FILED. ANSWER OF MIRIAM RODRIGUEZ AND JOSE R RODRIGUEZ IS/ARE HEREBY VACATED. NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. SET ASIDE ANSWER ON THE COMPLAINT OF ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC FOR DEFENDANT MIRIAM RODRIGUEZ, JOSE R RODRIGUE |
|
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF FOR INTEREST, COST AND ATTORNEY FEES, CCP 1033 FILED |
|
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Complaint Filed JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT OF ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC FILED JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT OF ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC ORDERED ENTERED 01/08/10 JUDGMENT FOR: ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC JUDGMENT AGAINST: MIRIAM RODRIGUEZ, JOSE R RODRIGUEZ JUDGMENT IN THE AMO |
|
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL CERTIFICATE AND ORDER VACATING DOCUMENTS TO COUNSEL OF RECORD |
|
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC AS TO MIRIAM RODRIGUEZ, JOSE R RODRIGUEZ. |
|
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Does Only DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT OF ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC AS TO DOES ONLY |
|
November 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request for Waiver of Fees and Costs is Denied REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF FEES AND COSTS OF JOSE R RODRIGUEZ IS DEN. |
|
November 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request for Waiver of Fees and Costs is Denied REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF FEES AND COSTS OF MIRIAM RODRIGUEZ IS DEN. |
|
November 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE OSCD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/18/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S34. |
|
November 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs Filed REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MIRIAM RODRIGUEZ. |
|
November 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs Filed REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY JOSE R RODRIGUEZ. |
|
November 17, 2009 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY MIRIAM RODRIGUEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER. | |
November 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER-CONTRACT BY MAIL ON 11/17/09 AS TO MARK D. WALSH, FILED. |
|
November 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWSER-CONTRACT BY MAIL ON 11/17/09 AS TO MARK D. WALSH, FILED. |
|
November 17, 2009 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY JOSE R RODRIGUEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER. | |
October 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/16/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37. |
|
October 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO MIRIAM RODRIGUEZ SERVED ON 10/23/09 WITH FEES OF $64.50. |
|
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JOSE R RODRIGUEZ; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/20/09 |
|
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE FILED. |
|
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC FOR 1ST APPR FEES 091014-2173-CK CLT/ 220.00 PAYMT 091014-2173-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 87380 | |
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Fee Voided ** VOID ** LIMITED COMPLAINT FEE SB1407 RECEIPT# 091014-2102 VOIDED BY TWARN FROM NENRI RANG WRONG AMOUNT |
|
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S34 | |
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. | |
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED 091014-2102-CK CDL/ 196.00 PAYMT 091014-2102-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 87380 | |
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED |