Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ARROW -V-BURNS Print
On October 14, 2009 a rule 3.740 collections $10,000 or less limited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 14, 2009
Last Refreshed
October 14, 2022
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
San Bernardino
Category
Collections-CRC3.740
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Closed
Case Duration
7 months and 10 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2010 | |||
October 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: OSC RE: DISMISSA/SANCTIONS/FAILURE TO SERVE |
|
October 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
May 25, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
April 16, 2010 |
Judge: Ludvigsen, Cynthia A |
||
April 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 CYNTHIA LUDVIGSEN PRESIDING. CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD COURT REPORTER IDA APPLEBY;6243 COURT ATTENDANT B VARTANIAN - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD THERE BEING NO APPEARA |
|
April 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: CASE TRACKED TO S34 FOR HEARING |
|
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED |
|
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service UNSERVED Filed PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO JEANNIE L BURNS. |
|
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S34 | |
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. | |
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED 091014-1891-CK CLT/ 220.00 PAYMT | |
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED |