Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
SBCPF-V-MOON, ET AL Print
On October 14, 2009 a business tort/unfair business practice unlimited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. Judge W. Robert Fawke presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 14, 2009
Last Refreshed
October 14, 2022
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
San Bernardino
Category
Business Tort
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Economic Torts
Status
Closed
Case Duration
2 months and 21 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER AWARD OF REASONABLE ATTNY'S FEES & COSTS DETERMINE D BY SUBSEQUENT MTN HEARD ON 4-13-10 FILED |
|
April 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING Motion to Strike COMPLAINT FILED. |
|
April 16, 2010 | |||
April 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
April 16, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED. | |
April 13, 2010 |
Judge: Fawke, W Robert |
||
April 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Complaint Filed JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF SAN BERNARDINO CITY RS PROFESSIONAL FIREFIGHTE FILED JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF SAN BERNARDINO CITY RS PROFESSIONAL FIREFIGHTE ORDERED ENTERED 04/13/10 JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT DENNIS MOON AND AGAINST SAN BERNAR |
|
April 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER GRANTING Motion to Strike COMPLAINT HELD 1-4-2010 FILED |
|
April 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS FILED BY DEFENDANT DENNIS MOON W ROBERT FAWKE PRESIDING. CLERK: KIM ALLAIN COURT REPORTER MEEMO TOMASSIAN;10435 COURT ATTENDANT C LOCKMAN - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY COREY GLAVE PRESENT FOR |
|
April 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed PROOF OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING Motion to Strike & ATTORNEY FEES FILED. |
|
April 02, 2010 | Docket Event | CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 025-0027803119 | |
April 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY BRIEF OF DEFTS FOR MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES FILED. |
|
April 02, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY DENNIS MOON FOR SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY BRIEF 100405-0742-VS FAX/ 9.00 PAYMT | |
April 01, 2010 | |||
April 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: TO STRIKE COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT DENNIS MOON, SAN BERNARDINO CITY PROFESSIONAL FIRE |
|
March 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Filed OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO/FOR ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY SAN BERNARDINO CITY PROFESSIONAL FIRE |
|
March 29, 2010 | Docket Event | CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 025-0027543782 | |
March 29, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY SAN BERNARDINO CITY PROFESSIONAL FIRE FOR FAX FILING FEE 100329-3759-VS FAX/ 7.00 PAYMT 100329-3759-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 025-0027543782 | |
March 29, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY SAN BERNARDINO CITY PROFESSIONAL FIRE FOR POSTAGE AND ENVELOPE 100329-3779-VS FFS/ 0.20 FPC/ 0.44 PAYMT 100329-3779-VS TSB/ 0.02 PAYMT 100329-3779-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 025-0027543782 | |
March 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed Supplemental Declaration OF WILLIAM P TOOKE ATTACHING FIRM INVOICES FILED. |
|
March 11, 2010 |
Judge: Fawke, W Robert |
||
March 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS FILED BY DEFENDANT DENNIS MOON W ROBERT FAWKE PRESIDING. CLERK: ATISHMA KANT COURT REPORTER MEEMO TOMASSIAN;10435 COURT ATTENDANT C LOCKMAN - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY COREY GLAVE PRESENT FO |
|
March 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed DEF DENIS MOON MEMO OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED. |
|
March 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed REPLY OF DENNIS MOON TO IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR ATTORNEYS FEES & COSTS FILED |
|
March 04, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY DENNIS MOON FOR FAX FILING FEE 100304-5387-VS FAX/ 16.00 PAYMT | |
March 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Filed OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO/FOR DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY SAN BERNARDINO CITY RS PROFESSIONAL FIREFIGHTE |
|
March 01, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY SAN BERNARDINO CITY RS PROFESSIONAL FIREFIGHTE FOR FAX FILING OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR FEES 100304-0161-VS FAX/ 9.00 PAYMT 100304-0161-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 024-0084513316 | |
March 01, 2010 | Docket Event | CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 024-0084513316 | |
March 01, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY SAN BERNARDINO CITY RS PROFESSIONAL FIREFIGHTE FOR ENVELOPE & POSTAGE 100304-0166-VS FFS/ 0.20 FPC/ 0.44 PAYMT 100304-0166-VS TSB/ 0.02 PAYMT 100304-0166-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 024-0084513316 | |
February 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed Notice of Lodging OF FEDERAL AUTHORITY FILED. |
|
February 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed MOTION RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS FILED BY DEFENDANT DENNIS MOON 100216-2352-CK MMF/ 40.00 PAYMT 100216-2352-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 21185 |
|
January 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): PROP ORDER GRANTING MTN TO STIKE/JUDGMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PER JUDGE NO MEMO OF COST OR AMOUNTS FILLED IN. |
|
January 15, 2010 | |||
January 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION |
|
January 04, 2010 |
Judge: Fawke, W Robert |
||
January 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: Motion to Strike COMPLAINT * FILED BY DEFENDANT DENNIS MOON W ROBERT FAWKE PRESIDING. CLERK: KATHLEEN SAENZ COURT REPORTER MEEMO TOMASSIAN;10435 COURT ATTENDANT C LOCKMAN - APPEARANCES: COREY GLAVE APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR SAN BERNARDINO CITY R |
|
December 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed REPLY OF DENNIS MOON TO SUPPORT OF MOTION OF DEFS TO STRIKE COMPLAINT FILED |
|
December 24, 2009 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY DENNIS MOON FOR FAX FEE 091224-1668-VS FAX/ 10.00 PAYMT | |
December 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Comment: CASE TRACKED TO LEGAL RESEARCH |
|
December 18, 2009 | Docket Event | CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 024-0075130955 | |
December 18, 2009 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY SAN BERNARDINO CITY RS PROFESSIONAL FIREFIGHTE FOR ENVELOPE AND POSTAGE 091218-4723-VS FFS/ 0.20 FPC/ 0.44 PAYMT 091218-4723-VS TSB/ 0.02 PAYMT | |
December 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Filed OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO/FOR DEFENDANTS Motion to Strike COMPLAINT FILED BY SAN BERNARDINO CITY RS PROFESSIONAL FIREFIGHTE |
|
December 18, 2009 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY SAN BERNARDINO CITY RS PROFESSIONAL FIREFIGHTE FOR PLTFF'S OPPO TO DEFTS MTN TO STRIKE 091218-4721-VS FAX/ 14.00 PAYMT | |
November 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Comment: CASE TRACKED TO MOTION WALL |
|
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed MOTION RE: TO STRIKECOMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT DENNIS MOON, SAN BERNARDINO CITY PROFESSIONAL FIRE 091106-0317-CK MMF/ 40.00 PAYMT |
|
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF MTN TO STRIKE BY MAIL ON 01/23/07 AS TO COREY W GLAVE ESQ, FILED. |
|
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE L&M HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/01/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S38. |
|
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF STACIA GLENN FILED |
|
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF WILLIAM TOOKE FILED |
|
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF DENIS MOON FILED |
|
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF DEE NORMAN FILED |
|
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY DENNIS MOON FOR FIRAT APPEARANCE 091106-0340-CK CVR/ 355.00 PAYMT | |
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes EX-PARTE MOTION RE: FINDINGS ON PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE W ROBERT FAWKE PRESIDING. CLERK: KIM ALLAIN NOT REPORTED - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCES REQUIRED - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR FINDINGS ON PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE. UPON REVIEW BY THE COURT, THE PEREMPTOR |
|
October 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Peremptory Challenge Under CCP 170.6 Filed PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE UNDER CCP 170.6 AS TO W ROBERT FAWKE. |
|
October 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes EX-PARTE MOTION RE: APPL FOR TRO W ROBERT FAWKE PRESIDING. CLERK: KIM ALLAIN COURT REPORTER MEEMO TOMASSIAN;10435 COURT ATTENDANT C LOCKMAN ATTORNEY COREY GLAVE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. ATTORNEY WILLIAM TOOKE PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. - PR |
|
October 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed Supplemental Declaration OF COREY GLAVE ESQ RE ADVANCED NOTIFICATION OF Ex Parte Application FOR TRO FILED |
|
October 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF EX PARTE PLEADINGS AND MOVING PAPERS FILED |
|
October 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed OPPOSITION TO Ex Parte Application FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED |
|
October 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed DECLARATION OF DENIS MOON FILED |
|
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S38 | |
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED | |
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Party Added ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF SAN BERNARDINO CITY RS PROFESSIONAL FIREFIGHTE, DENNIS MOON DBA PRESIDENT OF THE SAN IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT. |
|
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event | Summons ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF SAN BERNARDINO CITY RS PROFESSIONAL FIREFIGHTE - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE. | |
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Party Removed ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF SAN BERNARDINO CITY RS PROFESSIONAL FIREFIGHTE, DENNIS MOON REMOVED AS A PARTY. |
|
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY SAN BERNARDINO CITY RS PROFESSIONAL FIREFIGHTE FOR FIRST APPEARANCE 091014-0784-CK CVF/ 355.00 PAYMT | |
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Party Added ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF SAN BERNARDINO CITY RS PROFESSIONAL FIREFIGHTE, SAN BERNARDINO CITY PROFESSIONAL FIRE IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT. |
|
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Motion Filed re: EX-PARTE MOTION RE: APPL FOR TRO TO BE HEARD ON 10/15/09 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S38A. 091014-0877-CK MMF/ 40.00 PAYMT |
|
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed DECLARATION OF COREY W GLAVE ESQ RE: ADVANCED NOTIFICATION OF Ex Parte Application FOR TEMPORY RESTR FILED |
|
October 14, 2009 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet FILED. |