Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MERCURY -V- COPPOLA ET AL Print
On October 05, 2009 a personal injury non-motor vehiclelimited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. Judge John W. Burdick presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 05, 2009
Last Refreshed
October 14, 2022
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
San Bernardino
Category
Personal Injury-Non Motor Vehicle(ltd)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Personal Injury
Status
Transfer
Case Duration
1 year, 4 months and 13 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2011 | |||
March 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: OSC RE:MEDIATION COMPLETION/TSC |
|
February 18, 2011 | |||
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MEDIATION SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
February 17, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE PUT IN SJAR BIN |
|
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED TO NEW DEPARTMENT | |
November 05, 2010 | |||
November 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: OSC RE:MEDIATION COMPLETION/TSC |
|
October 22, 2010 | |||
October 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MEDIATION SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
October 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER TO CONTINUE MEDIATION DATE FILED |
|
October 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order filed STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CONTINUE MEDIATION DATE FILED. MEDIATION SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 02/18/11 AT 11:00 IN DEPT. SJAR HEARING RE:OSC RE:MEDIATION COMPLETION/TSC SET FOR 03/04/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32. |
|
October 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE PUT IN SJAR BIN |
|
October 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE SCMED HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/22/10 AT 11:00 IN DEPARTMENT SJAR. |
|
October 15, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY AURORA COPPOLA, EDUARDO COPPOLA FOR STIP TO CONTINUE 101020-1807-CK RSO/ 20.00 PAYMT | |
October 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Filed re: STIPULATION RE: CONTINUE MEDIATION DATE FILED. |
|
September 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY JOHN M PACHECO PRESIDING. CLERK: ATISHMA KANT COURT REPORTER JEAN THOMPSON;4403 COURT ATTENDANT V AMADOR - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPO |
|
September 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGS FILED BY PLAINTIFF MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY JOHN M PACHECO PRESIDING. CLERK: ATISHMA KANT COURT REPORTER JEAN THOMPSON;4403 COURT ATTENDANT V AMADOR - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITI |
|
September 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: DEEMED ADMISSIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY JOHN M PACHECO PRESIDING. CLERK: ATISHMA KANT COURT REPORTER JEAN THOMPSON;4403 COURT ATTENDANT V AMADOR - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD OFF |
|
September 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: DEEM ADMISSIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY JOHN M PACHECO PRESIDING. CLERK: ATISHMA KANT COURT REPORTER JEAN THOMPSON;4403 COURT ATTENDANT V AMADOR - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD OFF-C |
|
August 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO LR31 |
|
August 13, 2010 | |||
August 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: OSC RE:MEDIATION COMPLETION/TSC |
|
August 06, 2010 | |||
August 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order filed STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CONTINUE MEDIATION DATES FILED. MEDIATION SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/22/10 AT 11:00 IN DEPT. SJAR |
|
August 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MEDIATION SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE JUDGE PRO TEM: John Burdick PRESIDING DO NOT ACTIVATE AB CLERK: KATHLEEN SAENZ NOT REPORTED COURT ATTENDANT R DELGADO - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD THE PARTIES HAVE SUBMITTED A STIPUL |
|
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO SJAR |
|
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY AURORA COPPOLA, EDUARDO COPPOLA FOR STIP TO CONTINUE 100805-2503-CK RSO/ 20.00 PAYMT | |
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Filed OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL VERIFIED RESPONS TO REQ FOR PRODUCTION FILED BY EDUARDO COPPOLA |
|
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Filed OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL VERIFIED RESPONSES TO REQ FOR PRODUCTION FILED BY AURORA COPPOLA |
|
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Filed OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL VERIFIED RESPONSES TO RFA FILED BY AURORA COPPOLA |
|
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Filed OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL VERIFIED RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGS FILED BY EDOARDO COPPOLA |
|
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed DEFT EDOARDO COPPOLA'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPREL VERIFIED RESPONSES TO RFA FILED. |
|
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Filed OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL VERIFIED RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGS FILED BY AURORA COPPOLA |
|
July 23, 2010 | |||
July 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MEDIATION SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
July 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed MOTION RE: COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIALINTERROGS FILED BY PLAINTIFF MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY 100719-1206-CK MMF/ 40.00 PAYMT |
|
July 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed MOTION RE: COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIALINTERROGS FILED BY PLAINTIFF MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY 100719-1197-CK MMF/ 40.00 PAYMT |
|
July 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed MOTION RE: COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEMAND FORPRODUCTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY 100719-1202-CK MMF/ 40.00 PAYMT |
|
July 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed MOTION RE: DEEMEDADMISSIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY 100719-1204-CK MMF/ 40.00 PAYMT |
|
July 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed MOTION RE: DEEMADMISSIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY 100719-1174-CK MMF/ 40.00 PAYMT |
|
July 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed MOTION RE: COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEMAND FORPRODUCTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY 100719-1209-CK MMF/ 40.00 PAYMT |
|
July 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MEDIATION HEARING SET 8-6-2010 FILED. |
|
July 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE SCMED HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/23/10 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT SJAR. |
|
May 07, 2010 |
Judge: Frangie, Janet M |
||
May 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE JANET M FRANGIE PRESIDING. CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE COURT REPORTER CYNTHIA GARCIA;12152 COURT ATTENDANT K CORNETT - APPEARANCES: ALEXIS ORTEGA APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY. ATTORNEY DEENA FARAH PRESENT FOR DE |
|
May 06, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY AURORA COPPOLA, EDUARDO COPPOLA. | |
May 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: CASE TRACKED TO S32 FOR HEARING |
|
April 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST KIMBERLY SMITH FILED. |
|
April 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY AS TO KIMBERLY SMITH. |
|
April 20, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY. | |
March 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEMAND FOR JURY FILED. |
|
March 23, 2010 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY AURORA COPPOLA, EDUARDO COPPOLA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF KIM L BENSEN. 100323-3646-CK CAN/ 410.00 PAYMT 100323-3647-CK CAN/ 30.00 PAYMT | |
March 23, 2010 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY AURORA COPPOLA, EDUARDO COPPOLA | |
March 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Party Added ON THE COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY, EDUARDO COPPOLA IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT. |
|
March 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Party Removed ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY, EDOARDO COPPOLA REMOVED AS A PARTY. |
|
March 22, 2010 | |||
March 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION |
|
March 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET ON KIMBERLY SMITH; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/25/10 |
|
March 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE OSCSV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/22/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32. |
|
March 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO EDOARDO COPPOLA SERVED ON 02/22/10 WITH FEES OF $66.50. |
|
March 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO AURORA COPPOLA SERVED ON 02/22/10 WITH FEES OF $66.50. |
|
March 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR ATTORNEY FILED BY MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY. |
|
February 05, 2010 |
Judge: Frangie, Janet M |
||
February 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION JANET M FRANGIE PRESIDING. CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE COURT REPORTER CYNTHIA GARCIA;12152 COURT ATTENDANT B AUTEN - APPEARANCES: ALEXIS ORTEGA APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING |
|
February 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: CASE TRACKED TO S32 FOR HEARING |
|
November 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Summons ISSUED AND FILED | |
October 05, 2009 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet FILED. | |
October 05, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32 | |
October 05, 2009 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED 091102-3826-CK CLT/ 220.00 PAYMT |