Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
SANDOVAL -V- PROVIDENT BANK Print
On October 01, 2009 an other contract unlimited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. Judge Donald Alvarez presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 01, 2009
Last Refreshed
October 14, 2022
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
San Bernardino
Category
Other Civil Contracts
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Removal
Case Duration
2 years, 10 months and 12 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2012 | |||
November 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL |
|
August 13, 2012 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. (IMAGED) STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
June 04, 2012 | |||
June 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: CASE MGMT CONF/ STATUS OF SETTLEMENT |
|
May 31, 2012 | Docket Event | CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FILED BY JENNIFER A SANDOVAL | |
May 31, 2012 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY JENNIFER A SANDOVAL FOR FAX FILING OF NTC OF SETTLEMENT(NO COPY RQ) 120531-3074-VS FAX/ 4.00 PAYMT 120531-3074-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 028-0045035536 | |
May 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Comment: VOL II OF II SENT TO S32 |
|
April 04, 2012 |
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
April 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: CASE MGMT CONF/ STATUS OF SETTLEMENT DONALD ALVAREZ,JUDGE CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON;7079 COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE - APPEARANCES: GEORGE HOLLAND APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JENNIFER A SANDOVAL. JOHN PINGEL APPEARS BY C |
|
March 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Comment: VOL II OF II SENT TO S32 |
|
March 20, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, I, RECONTRUST COMPANY, NA. | |
February 09, 2012 |
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
February 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DONALD ALVAREZ,JUDGE CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON;7079 COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE - APPEARANCES: COMETRIA COOPER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JENNIFER A SANDOVAL. CRAIG BAUMBERTNER APPEARS BY COURTCA |
|
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Comment: VOL II OF II SENT TO CP32 |
|
January 25, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY RECONTRUST COMPANY, NA, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, I. | |
November 09, 2011 |
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
November 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DONALD ALVAREZ,JUDGE CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON;7079 COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE - APPEARANCES: COMATRIA COOPER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JENNIFER A SANDOVAL. JOHN PINGEL APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR |
|
November 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Comment: VOL II OF II SENT TO CP32 |
|
October 28, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY JENNIFER A SANDOVAL. | |
October 25, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY RECONTRUST COMPANY, NA, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, I, COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS. | |
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
New Volume Made. Volume Includes Documents Filed Between NEW VOLUME MADE. VOLUME 1 INCLUDES DOCUMENTS FILED BETWEEN 10/01/09 AND 04/01/11 |
|
August 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): AMENDED SUMMONS IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): AMENDED SUMMONS MUST MATCH THE AMENDED COMPLAINT (MISSING DEFENDANT). |
|
August 16, 2011 | |||
August 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE JUDGE AWAY FROM COURT CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE NOT REPORTED - APPEARANCES: GEORGE HOLLAND JR APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JENNIFER A SANDOVAL. JOHN PINGEL APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC |
|
August 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO CP32 |
|
August 10, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY JENNIFER A SANDOVAL. | |
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, I, RECONTRUST COMPANY, NA, COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY REED SMITH, LLP. | |
August 01, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY RECONTRUST COMPANY, NA, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, I, COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS. | |
June 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is: PROOF OF SERVICE OF 000102 FILED AS TO 06/21/11. PARTY SERVED ON BY MAIL. TYPE OF SERVICE IS 0000000000000000.DEL.. WITH FEES OF . |
|
June 28, 2011 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF JENNIFER A SANDOVAL | |
May 16, 2011 |
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
May 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DONALD ALVAREZ,JUDGE CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON;7079 COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE - APPEARANCES: GEORGE HOLLAND JR APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JENNIFER A SANDOVAL. JOHN PINGEL APPEARS BY COURTCALL F |
|
May 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLTFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT RECONTRUST COMPANY, NA, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, I, COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS DONALD ALVAREZ,JUDGE CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON; |
|
May 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, I, RECONTRUST COMPANY, NA, COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS DONALD ALVAREZ,JUDGE CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON;7079 C |
|
May 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed DEF RECONTRUST,ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS,& COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO OLA 1ST A FILED |
|
May 06, 2011 |
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Comment: PUT FILE IN LEGAL RESEARCH BIN FOR REVIEW |
|
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DONALD ALVAREZ,JUDGE CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON;7079 COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE - APPEARANCES: COMETRIA COOPER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JENNIFER A SANDOVAL. JOHN PINGEL APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR |
|
May 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed PLA OPPO TO DEF COUNTRYWIDE,RECONTRUST CO, & MORTGAGE SYSTEMS,INC. REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE. FILED |
|
May 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed PLA MEMO OF POINTS & AUTH IN OPPO TO DEF'S MOTION TO STRIKE. FILED |
|
May 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO CP32 |
|
May 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed MEMO OF POINTS & AUTH SUPPORTING PLA OPPO TO DEMURRER OF DEF'S RECONTRUST CO,COUNTRYWIDE, & MORTGAGE FILED |
|
April 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Party Added ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF JENNIFER A SANDOVAL, ONEWEST BANK, FSB IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT. |
|
April 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 3 TO BE ONEWEST BANK, FSB FILED. |
|
April 27, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY JENNIFER A SANDOVAL. | |
April 21, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY RECONTRUST COMPANY, NA, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, I, COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS. | |
April 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTN FOR FACTS & DOCS DEEMED ADMITTED BY MAIL ON 04/04/11 AS TO STEPHEN BERGEY, FILED. |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed APPENDIX OF NON-CALIFORNIA AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFTS DEMURRER FILED. |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLTFF'S FIRSTAMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT RECONTRUST COMPANY, NA, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, I, COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS 110401-3357-CK MMF/ 40.00 PAYMT |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event | DEMURRER FILED BY RECONTRUST COMPANY, NA, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, I, COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS; REPRESENTED BY REED SMITH, LLP 110401-3367-CK MMF/ 40.00 PAYMT | |
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED. | |
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32 | |
February 08, 2011 | |||
February 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, I, RECONTRUST COMPANY, NA |
|
February 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC |
|
February 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE L&M HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 02/08/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32. |
|
February 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, I, RECONTRUST COMPANY, NA |
|
February 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL DONALD ALVAREZ,JUDGE CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON;7079 COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE - APPEARANCES: GEORGE HOLLAND JR APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JENNIFER A SANDOVAL. JOHN PINGEL APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR COUNTRYWIDE HOM |
|
February 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: JOINDER TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC |
|
February 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Party Added ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF JENNIFER A SANDOVAL, PROVIDENT BANK, COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANTS NAMED IN FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. |
|
February 07, 2011 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF JENNIFER A SANDOVAL | |
February 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Party Removed ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF JENNIFER A SANDOVAL, COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC REMOVED AS A PARTY. |
|
January 31, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY PROVIDENT BANK. | |
January 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE TO S32 |
|
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO LR32 |
|
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY RECONTRUST COMPANY, NA. | |
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PORTIONSOF COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC 110124-2619-CK MMF/ 40.00 PAYMT |
|
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed MOTION RE: JOINDER TO DEMURRERTO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC 110124-2606-CK CVS/ 395.00 PAYMT |
|
January 19, 2011 |
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
January 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/13/11 |
|
January 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL DONALD ALVAREZ,JUDGE CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON;7079 COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE - APPEARANCES: SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY SUZANNE KLUMP FOR PLAINTIFF. JOHN PINGEL APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRA |
|
January 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO CP36 |
|
January 13, 2011 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY JENNIFER A SANDOVAL FOR FAX FILING OF RESPONSIVE DECLARATION 110113-3132-VS FAX/ 3.00 PAYMT | |
January 13, 2011 | Docket Event | CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 025-0035325805 | |
January 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED. |
|
December 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, I, RECONTRUST COMPANY, NA 101222-3311-CK MMF/ 40.00 PAYMT 101222-3311-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 51632 |
|
December 22, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED. | |
December 22, 2010 | Docket Event | DEMURRER FILED BY RECONTRUST COMPANY, NA, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, I; REPRESENTED BY REED SMITH, LLP 101222-3301-CK CVS/ 790.00 PAYMT 101222-3301-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 51632 | |
December 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed APPENDIX OF OUT OF STATE AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER FILED. |
|
September 29, 2010 |
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
September 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DONALD ALVAREZ,JUDGE CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON;7079 COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD. THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINT |
|
September 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO CP36 |
|
August 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY PLAINTIFF JENNIFER A SANDOVAL JOHN M PACHECO PRESIDING. CLERK: LEVORA JOSEPH COURT REPORTER JEAN THOMPSON;4403 COURT ATTENDANT V AMADOR - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD |
|
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO LR31 |
|
July 22, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS/COMPLAINT BY MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, I WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 07/06/10 FILED | |
July 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS/COMPLAINT BY MAIL & ACKNWLDMT SRVCE ON 07/06/10 AS TO MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, FILED. |
|
July 19, 2010 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: IN SPPT OF ATTY'S MOTN TO BE RELIEVED FILED BY JENNIFER A SANDOVAL | |
July 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed MOTION RE: TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY PLAINTIFF JENNIFER A SANDOVAL 100723-0103-CK MMF/ 40.00 PAYMT |
|
July 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: NO COPIES SUBMTTD TO CONFORM |
|
July 09, 2010 | Docket Event | FEE PAYMENT 100709-0920-CS FCP/ 1.00 PAYMT | |
July 01, 2010 |
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
July 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DONALD ALVAREZ PRESIDING. CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON;7079 COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE - APPEARANCES: HENRI NORRIS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JENNIFER A SANDOVAL. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: MORTGAGE ELEC |
|
June 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: CASE TRACKED TO S36 FOR HEARING |
|
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY JENNIFER A SANDOVAL. | |
May 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant DISMISSAL FILED AS TO PROVIDENT BANK, WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
May 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 2 TO BE COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC FILED. |
|
May 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Party Added ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF JENNIFER A SANDOVAL, COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC IS ADDED AS A DEF. |
|
May 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON PROVIDENT BANK; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 05/10/10 |
|
May 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Conformed Copies in the Attorney Bin - No Envelope Provided CONFORMED COPIES IN THE ATTORNEY BIN -- NO ENVELOPE PROVIDED |
|
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36 | |
April 02, 2010 |
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
April 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DONALD ALVAREZ PRESIDING. CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON;7079 COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE - APPEARANCES: SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY SUZANNE KLUMP FOR PLAINTIFF. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATI |
|
April 01, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY JENNIFER A SANDOVAL. | |
March 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO CP36 |
|
March 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, I; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/26/10 |
|
March 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Conformed Copies in the Attorney Bin - No Envelope Provided CONFORMED COPIES IN THE ATTORNEY BIN -- NO ENVELOPE PROVIDED |
|
January 15, 2010 | Docket Event | FEE PAYMENT 100115-4038-CK FCP/ 12.50 PAYMT | |
December 18, 2009 |
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
December 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION DONALD ALVAREZ PRESIDING. CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD COURT REPORTER BETTY KELLEY;3981 COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION. PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD THE |
|
December 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO CP36 |
|
November 24, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED | |
November 03, 2009 | Docket Event | FEE PAYMENT 091103-1216-CS FCP/ 12.50 PAYMT | |
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED TO NEW DEPARTMENT | |
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): SUMMONS IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): SUMMONS DOES NOT MATCH NAMES LISTED ON COMPLAINT. |
|
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event | NO SUMMONS ISSUED | |
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36T | |
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. | |
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED 091001-4541-CK CVF/ 355.00 PAYMT 091001-4541-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 3108452 | |
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed COPY OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED. |