Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CHASE BANK -V- STEVENS Print
On October 01, 2009 a rule 3.740 collections $10,000 or less limited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. Judge Alvarez, Donald presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 01, 2009
Last Refreshed
October 14, 2022
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
San Bernardino
Category
Collections-CRC3.740
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year, 1 month and 28 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2011 | |||
February 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL |
|
November 29, 2010 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY CHASE BANK USA, N.A. | |
November 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF CHASE BANK USA, N.A. AS TO LAURIE A STEVENS. |
|
November 29, 2010 | Docket Event | DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED | |
November 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Req for Default Judgment Filed DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED. |
|
November 29, 2010 | Docket Event | DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST ORIGINAL CONTRACT/WAIVER OF EXCESS INTEREST FILED. | |
November 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Does Only DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT OF CHASE BANK USA, N.A. AS TO DOES ONLY |
|
November 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST LAURIE A STEVENS FILED. |
|
November 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Complaint Filed JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT OF CHASE BANK USA, N.A. FILED JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT OF CHASE BANK USA, N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 11/29/10 JUDGMENT FOR: CHASE BANK USA, N.A. JUDGMENT AGAINST: LAURIE A STEVENS JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $12,787.12 INTEREST $1,3 |
|
November 19, 2010 |
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL DONALD ALVAREZ,JUDGE CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON;7079 COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE - APPEARANCES: SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY JOHN FARMER FOR PLAINTIFF. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: LAURIE A STEVENS - PROCEEDINGS: HEARING ON: OS |
|
November 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO CP36 |
|
September 24, 2010 |
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
September 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 DONALD ALVAREZ,JUDGE CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON;7079 COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE - APPEARANCES: SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY JOHN R FARMER FOR PLAINTIFF. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: LAURI |
|
September 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO CP36 |
|
September 07, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36 | |
September 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order To Show Cause Re: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT 9/24/10 |
|
April 02, 2010 | |||
April 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
November 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/02/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S34. |
|
October 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: FILED PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons/ COMPAINT AS TO LAURIE A STEVENS SERVED ON 10/26/09 WITH FEES OF $41.00. |
|
October 13, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED TO NEW DEPARTMENT | |
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S34T | |
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event | Summons ISSUED AND FILED | |
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED 091001-3501-CK CVL/ 340.00 PAYMT 091001-3501-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 484068 | |
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet FILED. |