Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CITY OF FONTANA -V- PEARSON, ETAL Print
On October 01, 2009 an eminent domain/inv cond unlimited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 01, 2009
Last Refreshed
October 14, 2022
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
San Bernardino
Category
Eminent Domain
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Eminent Domain
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
6 months and 11 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2010 | |||
June 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL |
|
April 15, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. | |
April 13, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
April 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): ORDER TO DISBURSE FUNDS IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PER JUDGE - NEEDS PROOF OF SERVICE ON ALL PARTIES.. |
|
April 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL FILED BY CITY OF FONTANA. |
|
April 02, 2010 | |||
April 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION JUDGE AWAY FROM COURT CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE NOT REPORTED COURT ATTENDANT K CORNETT - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY BRADY BRAMMER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: CASE |
|
April 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE JUDGE AWAY FROM COURT CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE NOT REPORTED COURT ATTENDANT B AUTEN - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY BRADY BRAMMER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. - PROCEEDINGS: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD. COUNSEL INFORMS THE CLERK |
|
March 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO DISBURSE FUNDS ON DEPOSIT FILED. |
|
March 15, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY CITY OF FONTANA. | |
February 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING FILED BY CITY OF FONTANA. |
|
February 19, 2010 |
Judge: Frangie, Janet M |
||
February 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION JANET M FRANGIE PRESIDING. CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE COURT REPORTER CYNTHIA GARCIA;12152 COURT ATTENDANT B AUTEN - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY MONA NEMAT PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD HEAR |
|
February 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: CASE TRACKED TO S32 FOR HEARING |
|
December 18, 2009 | |||
December 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION JUDGE AWAY FROM COURT CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE NOT REPORTED COURT ATTENDANT B AUTEN - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL FOR THE PLAINTIFF. REASON: ATTE |
|
December 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Comment: CASE TRACKED TO S32 FOR HEARING |
|
November 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO GEORGE A PEARSON. PARTY SERVED ON 11/06/09. TYPE OF SERVICE IS NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT. WITH FEES OF $0.00. |
|
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Party Added ON THE EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT OF CITY OF FONTANA, LAND AMERICA TITLECOMPANY,, JAMES R KRUSE, ALLAN STEWARD, INC.,, BERNARD G CINQUE AND PATRICIA CINQUE,, MYRON P CINQUE ANDRUBY E CINQUE,, ORANGE COAST TITLECOMPANY,, CHEVRON U.S.A., INC.,, FIRST AMERICAN |
|
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF DEPOSIT AND SUPPORTING DECLARATION FILED BY CITY OF FONTANA. |
|
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED ON EMINENT DOMAIN COMPLAINT OF CITY OF FONTANA - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE. | |
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32 | |
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed COPY OF LIS PENDENS FILED. |
|
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED | |
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. |