Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CAPITAL ONE -V- PAEZ Print
On October 01, 2009 a rule 3.740 collections $10,000 or less limited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. Judge Cynthia Ann Ludvigsen presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 01, 2009
Last Refreshed
October 14, 2022
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
San Bernardino
Category
Collections-CRC3.740
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year, 1 month and 12 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2010 |
Judge: Ludvigsen, Cynthia A |
||
November 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL CYNTHIA LUDVIGSEN,JUDGE CLERK: VERONICA GAYTON COURT REPORTER JULIE FEDERICO;10947 COURT ATTENDANT R DELGADO - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD ON COURT'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJU |
|
November 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO S34 |
|
September 24, 2010 |
Judge: Ludvigsen, Cynthia A |
||
September 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 CYNTHIA LUDVIGSEN,JUDGE CLERK: VERONICA GAYTON COURT REPORTER IDA APPLEBY;6243 COURT ATTENDANT B VARTANIAN - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD THERE BEING NO APP |
|
September 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO S34 |
|
September 07, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S34 | |
April 02, 2010 | |||
April 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
November 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/02/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S34. |
|
November 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JESS PAEZ SERVED ON 11/10/09 WITH FEES OF $60.00. |
|
October 13, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED TO NEW DEPARTMENT | |
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED 091001-2897-CK CLT/ 220.00 PAYMT 091001-2897-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 00410894 | |
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 395 FILED. |
|
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S34T | |
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED | |
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. |