Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DISCOVER BANK -v- MICHELE L FILES Print
On October 01, 2009 a rule 3.740 collections $10,000 or less limited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. Judge Ludvigsen, Cynthia presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 01, 2009
Last Refreshed
October 14, 2022
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
San Bernardino
Category
Collections-CRC3.740
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
1 year, 2 months and 1 day
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2010 | |||
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL |
|
December 02, 2010 | Docket Event | CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 025-0034777997 | |
December 02, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY DISCOVER BANK FOR FAX FILING OF DISMISSAL 101202-4199-VS FAX/ 3.00 PAYMT | |
December 02, 2010 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
November 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO S34 |
|
November 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MICHELE L FILES FILED. |
|
November 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF DISCOVER BANK AS TO MICHELE L FILES. |
|
October 29, 2010 |
Judge: Ludvigsen, Cynthia A |
||
October 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL CYNTHIA LUDVIGSEN,JUDGE CLERK: VERONICA GAYTON COURT REPORTER IDA APPLEBY;6243 COURT ATTENDANT B VARTANIAN - APPEARANCES: SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY JOHN FARMER FOR SUE KLUMP FOR PLAINTIFF. DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION |
|
October 28, 2010 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING MANN BRACKEN, LLP WITH CIR LAW OFFICES INTERNATION LLP AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR DISCOVER BANK. | |
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO S34 |
|
September 24, 2010 |
Judge: Ludvigsen, Cynthia A |
||
September 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 CYNTHIA LUDVIGSEN,JUDGE CLERK: VERONICA GAYTON COURT REPORTER IDA APPLEBY;6243 COURT ATTENDANT B VARTANIAN - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD THERE BEING NO APP |
|
September 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO S34 |
|
September 07, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S34 | |
April 02, 2010 | |||
April 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
October 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/02/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37. |
|
October 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO MICHELE L FILES SERVED ON 10/18/09 WITH FEES OF $60.00. |
|
October 13, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED TO NEW DEPARTMENT | |
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED 091001-2755-CK CLT/ 220.00 PAYMT | |
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 395 (B) FILED |
|
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S34T | |
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. | |
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED |