Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
(COMPLEX CASE)CAMPBELL ET AL V. WHISPER RANCH LTD
A Construction Defect-Complex case was filed in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 01, 2009
Last Refreshed
June 01, 2022
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Category
Construction Defect-Complex
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Construction
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
7 months and 12 days
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Complaint DISMISSAL FILED AS TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD FILED BY WHISPER RANCH LTD, WITH PREJUDICE. DISMISS COMPLAINT OF WHISPER RANCH, LTD, ON 10/24/12 |
|
October 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: FOR RELIEF FROM DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED BY DEFENDANT WHISPER RANCH, LTD, E. WAYNE SIMMONS, INC BRIAN S MCCARVILLE,JUDGE CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD COURT REPORTER KATHY SELLERS;4420 COURT ATTENDANT A CERVANTES - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY MEGAN |
|
October 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Comment: COPIES ON MTN FOR RELIEF FROM DISMISSAL & NTCE OF ERRATA PLACED IN ATTY BIN UNDER "S" NO ENVELOPE |
|
October 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF ERRATA TO MTN FOR RELIEF FROM DISMISSAL FILED BY WHISPER RANCH, LTD, E. WAYNE SIMMONS, INC. |
|
October 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed MOTION RE: RELIEF FROM DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE SET FOR HEARING ON 10/22/12, FILED BY DEFENDANT WHISPER RANCH, LTD, E. WAYNE SIMMONS, INC (IMAGED) 121019-0236-CK MMF/ 60.00 CRU/ 30.00 PAYMT |
|
September 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CASE PREVIOUSLY DISMISSED AS TO ENTIRE ACTION ON 07/06/12. |
|
August 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Comment: $150.00 JURY FEES FORFEITED |
|
July 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): DEFENDANTS LISTED PREVIOUSLY DISMISSED ON 01/15/10 & 07/06/12. |
|
July 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): REQ FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED ON 7/6/12. |
|
July 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Coversheet for Rejected Document COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED) |
|
July 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): ENTIRE ACTION WAS DISMISSED BY THE COURT ON 07/06/12. |
|
July 09, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. (IMAGED) | |
July 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL BRIAN S MCCARVILLE,JUDGE CLERK: JESSICA GABLE COURT REPORTER KATHY SELLERS;4420 COURT ATTENDANT A CERVANTES - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE BY COUNSEL IN THIS MATTER |
|
July 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Comment: VOL V SENT TO S36 |
|
June 25, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. (IMAGED) | |
June 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER ON WHISPER RANCH/SIMMONS INC APL TO DEEM SETTLEMENT IN GOOD FAITH FILED (IMAGED) |
|
June 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Coversheet for Rejected Document COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED) |
|
June 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): DEFENDANTS REGAL CULTURED MARBLE INC AND SCHMID INSUALTION CONTRACTORS, INC WE. RE PREVIOUSLY DISMISSED |
|
June 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant DISMISSAL FILED AS TO TRIPACIFIC PLUMBING, WITH PREJUDICE |
|
June 18, 2012 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. (IMAGED) SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT TRIPACIFIC PLUMBING. SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT AS TO TRIPACIFIC PLUMBING | |
June 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER FILED BY LETWINCH CONSTRUCTION, INC.. (IMAGED) |
|
June 13, 2012 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT ULTRA-WALL, INC.. SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT AS TO ULTRA-WALL, INC. | |
June 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant DISMISSAL FILED AS TO DEVORE CONCRETE, INC., GARY'S CARPETING, INC., MESA WEATHERSTRIPPING COMPANY, ON TRAC OVERHEAD DOOR CO, ULTRA-WALL, INC., BOURNE ROOFING, DRI RESIDENTIAL CORPORATION, WITH PREJUDICE (IMAGED) |
|
June 11, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. (IMAGED) | |
June 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): 3 PARTIES ARE DISMISSED, 1 NOT ON CASE . |
|
June 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL BRIAN S MCCARVILLE,JUDGE CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD COURT REPORTER KATHY SELLERS;4420 COURT ATTENDANT A CERVANTES - APPEARANCES: BETH HENDERSON APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR WHISPER RANCH, LTD. JEFFREY KRAMER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR DARYL C. REYK |
|
June 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Comment: VOL V OF V SENT TO S36 |
|
May 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): APPLICATION, NOTICE, ORDER IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THE COURT ONLY RECEIVED FACE PAGES . |
|
May 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant DISMISSAL FILED AS TO SUNCOAST ELECTRIC, WITH PREJUDICE |
|
May 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: Notice of Settlement IN GOOD FAITH FILED BY WHISPER RANCH, LTD, E WAYNE SIMMONS INC. |
|
May 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed WHISPER RANCH/SIMMONS INC APPL TO DEEM STLMENT WIT H TRIPACIFIC IN GOOD FAITH FILED. (IMAGED) |
|
May 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Attorney of Record Changed LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH IS REMOVED AS ATTORNEY FOR WILLIAM BECHTEL, AND DEBORAH ELLIOTT IS ADDED AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD. |
|
May 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY WILLIAM BECHTEL. |
|
April 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed ORDER GRANTING LETWINCH CONSTRUCTION, INC'S APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED. |
|
April 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed Request for Judicial Notice IN SUPPORT OF DRI RESIDENTIAL CORPORATION'S APPLICATION FOR GFS FILED. |
|
April 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF GFS APPLICATION FOR DRI RESIDENTIAL CORPORATION FILED. |
|
April 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF APPLICATION FOR GFS OF DRI RESIDENTIAL CORP BY U.S. MAIL ON 04/17/12 AS TO SEE ATTACHED SERVICE LIST, FILED. |
|
April 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OF DRI RESIDENTIAL CORPORATION FILED. |
|
April 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY C EARL IN SUPPORT OF GFS APPLICATION FOR DRI RESIDENTIAL CORPORATION FILED. |
|
April 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed NOTICE OF LODGMENT IN SUPPORT OF DRI RESIDENTIAL CORPORATION'S APP FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED. |
|
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF OUTSTANDING SETTLEMENT PAYMENTS AND SIGNATURES FILED BY WHISPER RANCH LTD, E WAYNE SIMMONS INC. |
|
April 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL BRIAN S MCCARVILLE,JUDGE CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD COURT REPORTER KATHY SELLERS;4420 COURT ATTENDANT A CERVANTES - APPEARANCES: JOHN GOTTLIEB APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR DEVORE CONCRETE, INC.. ATTORNEY STEVEN PEARSE PRESENT FOR WHISPER RANCH, L |
|
April 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Complaint DISMISSAL FILED AS TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF CHARLES CAMPBELL FILED BY CHARLES CAMPBELL, WITH PREJUDICE. DISMISS COMPLAINT OF CHARLES CAMPBELL, JEAN CAMPBELL, ON 04/02/12 |
|
March 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Comment: VOL IV SENT TO S36 |
|
March 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
Amended Document Filed re: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OF LETWINCH CONSTRUCTION FILED. |
|
March 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Comment: ORDER ON WHISPER RANCH, LTD AND E WAYNE SIMMONS,IN C'S APPLICATION TO DEEM SETTLEMENT IN GOOD FAITH FILED. |
|
March 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Comment: $150.00 JURY FEES REFUNDED TO HOMAN & STONE |
|
March 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): ORDER FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PER JUDGE MCCARVILLE ON THE PROOF OF SERVICE IT NEEDS TO STATE THAT. |
|
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO A&A FENCE CO., INC IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THE DEFENDANT WAS ALREADY DISMISSED ON 1-24-12 WITH P. |
|
March 12, 2012 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant DISMISSAL FILED AS TO REGAL CULTURED MARBLE, INC., WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
March 12, 2012 | Docket Event | DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED | |
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. | |
March 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Comment: ORDR GRANTING MASCO GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ROUTED TO CAL PREP FOR UPCOMING HEARING |
|
March 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Comment: A&A GOOD FAITH ORDER ROUTED TO CAL PREP FOR UPCOMING HEARING |
|
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF ERRATA TO DEFTS/X-COMPLNTS APPL FOR GFS FILED BY WHISPER RANCH, LTD.,, E. WAYNE SIMMONS, INC.. |
|
February 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: Notice of Settlement OF GOOD FAITH FILED BY LETWINCH CONSTRUCTION, INC.. |
|
February 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed LETWINCH CONSTRUCTION, INC'S APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED. |
|
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed APPLICATION TO DEEM SETTLEMENT IN GOOD FAITH BY WHISPER RANCH, LTDA ND E. WAYNE SIMMONS, INC] FILED. |
|
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE SETTLEMENT OF GOOD FAITH FILED BY WHISPER RANCH, LTD.,, E. WAYNE SIMMONS, INC.. |
|
February 15, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: JOHN C. GOTTLIEB IN SPPRT OF GFS FILED BY DEVORE CONCRETE, INC. | |
February 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH BY A&A FENCE CO INC FILED |
|
February 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: Notice of Settlement OF GOOD FAITH FILED BY DEVORE CONCRETE, INC.. |
|
February 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF SETTLEMENT/APPL/DECL/PROPOSED ORDER BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON 02/15/12 AS TO SEE POS FOR MAILING, FILED. |
|
February 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed DEVORE CONCRETE,INC'S APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATIO N OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED. |
|
February 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER GRANTING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OF MASCO CONTRACTOR SERVICES OF CA FKA SCMID INSULATION FILED |
|
February 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant DISMISSAL FILED AS TO PRECISION SURFACES, INC., WITH PREJUDICE |
|
February 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS. |
|
February 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
New Volume Made. Volume Includes Documents Filed Between NEW VOLUME MADE. VOLUME 4 INCLUDES DOCUMENTS FILED BETWEEN 06/01/11 AND 01/31/12 |
|
February 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes READINESS CALENDAR BRIAN S MCCARVILLE,JUDGE CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD COURT REPORTER KATHY SELLERS;4420 COURT ATTENDANT A CERVANTES - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY STEVEN PEARSE PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/CROSS COMP WHISPER RANCH & E. WAYNE SIMM. SUSAN GREEN APPEARS BY CO |
|
February 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Volume Begins on this Date VOLUME #5 BEGINS ON THIS DATE. |
|
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: Notice of Settlement FILED BY WHISPER RANCH LTD, E. WAYNE SIMMONS, INC.. |
|
January 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Comment: VOL IV SENT TO CP36 |
|
January 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent re: NOTICE OF REJECTED REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SENT. THE DEFENDANT CWP SURFACES AND DESIGNS,INC., NEEDS TO BE DISMISSED AS ANSWERED. SEE ATTACHED PRINTOUT. NOTICES PRINTED |
|
January 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant DISMISSAL FILED AS TO PACIFIC RAIN GUTTERS, INC., WITH PREJUDICE |
|
January 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant DISMISSAL FILED AS TO A & A FENCE CO., INC., WITH PREJUDICE |
|
January 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant DISMISSAL FILED AS TO B&D GRANITE, INC., WITH PREJUDICE |
|
January 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed REQUEST FOR REFUND OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT BY HOMAN & STONE FILED. |
|
January 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF SETTLEMENT/APPL FOR GFS/DECL/ORDER BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON 01/16/12 AS TO SEE POS FOR MAILING, FILED. |
|
January 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF MONA J. JEFFERY IN SPPRT OF APPL FOR GFS FILED |
|
January 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT BY CROSS DEFT A&A FENCE CO., FILED. |
|
January 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT BY MASCO CONTRACTOR SERVICES OF CALIF FILED. |
|
January 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: Notice of Settlement OF GOOD FAITH FILED BY MASCO CONTRACTOR SERVICES OF CALIFORNIA, IN. |
|
January 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: Notice of Settlement OF GOOD FAITH FILED BY A & A FENCE CO., INC.. |
|
January 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Comment: VOL. 4 ONLY |
|
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT FILED BY DEVORE CONCRETE, INC.. |
|
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): APPLICATION TO DEEM SETTLEMENT IN GOOD FAITH IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NEED ORIGINALS COPIES WERE SUBMITTED -. |
|
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BRIAN S MCCARVILLE,JUDGE CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE COURT ATTENDANT A CERVANTES - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY NOT PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. ATTORNEY SUSANNE GREEN PRESENT FOR CERAMINCSTYLE, INC. |
|
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event | JURY FEES POSTED BY XDF DEVORE CONCRETE IN THE AMOUNT OF $150.00 120106-3563-CK JTF/ 150.00 PAYMT 120106-3563-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 3230169 | |
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO S36 |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES FILED BY HUDCO, INC.. |
|
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event | JURY FEES POSTED BY XDEF HUDCO, INC. IN THE AMOUNT OF $150.00 111230-2027-CK JTF/ 150.00 PAYMT 111230-2027-CK REFERENCE NUMBER #047948 | |
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed DEVORE CONCRETE, INC'S MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED. |
|
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): CONFIDENTIAL MSC BRIEF IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THE COURTS DO NOT FILE ANY CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS. |
|
December 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUJNSEL AS TO DARYL C. REYDAL PLASTERING FILED |
|
December 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed STIP BETWEEN WHISPER RANCH, LTD; E. WAYNE SIMMONS, INC. AND DARYL C. REYKDAL PLASTERING RE DESIGNATI FILED |
|
December 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY DEFENDANT DARYL C. REYKDAL PLASTERING BRIAN S MCCARVILLE,JUDGE CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD COURT REPORTER KATHY SELLERS;4420 COURT ATTENDANT A CERVANTES - APPEARANCES: MATTHEW BALTIERRA APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR DAR |
|
December 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE TO S36 |
|
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE DELIVERED TO LR (VOL.4) |
|
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is: PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons AND AMENDED Cross-Complaint FILED AS TO SECURITY ONE SERVICES, INC.. PARTY SERVED ON 12/01/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUB-SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $64.85. |
|
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY FILED BY DEVORE CONCRETE, INC.. |
|
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY FILED BY MESA WEATHERSTRIPPING COMPANY. |
|
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER DETERMING SETTLEMENT TO BE IN GOOD FATIH BY PACIFIC RAIN GUTTERS, INC. DBA PACIFIC RAIN GUTTER FILED |
|
November 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion Re: (Imaged) MOTION RE: TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL SET FOR HEARING ON 12/20/11, FILED BY DEFENDANT DARYL C. REYKDAL PLASTERING (IMAGED) 111207-1715-CK MMF/ 40.00 PAYMT |
|
November 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF SEE SERVICE LIST BY MAIL ON 11/18/11 AS TO NTC OF MTN & MTN TO BE RELIEVED, FILED. (IMAGED) |
|
November 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF ROBYN S MCCLAIN IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO BE RELIEVED FILED (IMAGED) |
|
November 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed NOTICE OF RULING ON DISCOVERY REFEREE FILED. |
|
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER RE GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF CROSS-DEFENDANT B&D GRANITE, INC. FILED |
|
November 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed PROOF THAT CERTIFIED DOCUMENTS WERE DELIVERED TO THE PARTIES IN SUPPORT FOR GOOD FAITH SETTL FILED. |
|
October 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT OF CAMPBELL NAMING DOES 81 TO BE JENSTAR DBA WESTERN DOOR FILED. |
|
October 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT OF CAMPBELL NAMING DOES 82 TO BE CRIMEWATCH SECURITY FILED. |
|
October 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT OF CAMPBELL NAMING DOES 80 TO BE SECURITY ONE SERVICES, INC. FILED. |
|
October 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Party Added ON THE 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD, CRIMEWATCH SECURITY IS ADDED AS A CROSS DEFENDANT. |
|
October 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Party Added ON THE 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD, JENSTAR IS ADDED AS A CROSS DEFENDANT. |
|
October 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Party Added ON THE 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD, SECURITY ONE SERVICES, INC. IS ADDED AS A CROSS DEFENDANT. |
|
October 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
AKA added for Defendant ON 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD FOR JENSTAR, ADD WESTERN DOOR. |
|
October 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed ORDR FINDING SETTLMNT BY INTERVENOS ON BEHALF OF MARBLEDGE OF CA INC TO BE IN GOOD FAITH FILED. ON COURT'S'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED AS TO DEFENDANT MARBLEDGE CALIFORNIA, INC. WITH PREJUDICE. |
|
October 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF SETTLEMENT/APPLICATION FOR GFS/ORDER BY MAIL ON 10/14/11 AS TO SEE SERVICE LIST, FILED. |
|
October 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed APPLICATION BY PACIFIC RAIN GUTTERS FOR DETERMINATION OF GFS FILED. |
|
October 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE Notice of Settlement FILED BY PACIFIC RAIN GUTTERS, INC.. |
|
October 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF SEE SERVICE LIST BY MAIL ON 09/20/11 AS TO NTC OF SETTLEMENT/APP & ORDER/DECLARATION, FILED. |
|
October 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF MATTHEW C ANDERSON IN SUPPORT OF GFS FILED |
|
October 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed CROSS-DEF B&D GRANITE'S APPLICATION FOR GFS FILED. |
|
October 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY HUDCO, INC.. |
|
October 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Attorney of Record Changed STUTZ ARTIANO SHINOFF & HOLTZ IS REMOVED AS ATTORNEY FOR HUDCO, INC., AND STUTZ ARTIANO SINOFF & HOLTZ APC IS ADDED AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD. |
|
September 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER DETERMINING SETTLEMENT TO BE IN GOOD FAITH AS TO PRECISION SURFACES, INC FILED |
|
September 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OF KEVIN PEGAN FOR PRECISION SURFACES, INC. CHANGES ITS NAME TO LAW OFFICE OF PEGAN & FRASER FILED |
|
September 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OF DEBORAH ELLIOTT FOR PACIFIC RAIN GUTTERS, INC. CHANGES ITS NAME TO LAW OFFICE OF PEGAN & FRASER FILED |
|
September 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
New Volume Made. Volume Includes Documents Filed Between NEW VOLUME MADE. VOLUME 3 INCLUDES DOCUMENTS FILED BETWEEN 01/04/11 AND 05/27/11 |
|
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed Notice of Settlement OF INTERVENORS USF&G AND TRAVELERS FILED. |
|
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF DONNA E MOORE IN SUPPORT OF GFS FILED |
|
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GFS BY INTERVENRS USF&G AND TRAVELERS FILED. |
|
September 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER APPROVING GFS BETWEEN X-DEF GARY'S CARPETING, INC AND X-COMPLAINTANT WHISPER RANCH, LTD FILED |
|
September 14, 2011 | Docket Event | FEE PAYMENT 110914-0666-CK FCP/ 5.00 PAYMT 110914-0666-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 129501 | |
August 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BRIAN S MCCARVILLE,JUDGE CLERK: TRENESHA BEAMON COURT REPORTER KATHY SELLERS;4420 COURT ATTENDANT A CERVANTES - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY ANGELA ELLIS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR WHISPER RANCH, LTD, E. WAYNE SIMMONS, INC. ATTOR |
|
August 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Association of Counsel for Defendant Filed NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD AS TO WILLIAM BECHTEL ADDING ATTORNEY DAVID DRISCOLL FILED |
|
August 24, 2011 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COMPLAINT INTERVENTION OF CLARENDON AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY FILED BY CLARENDON AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. DISMISS COMPLAINT OF CLARENDON AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY, ON 08/24/11 | |
August 24, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY A & A FENCE CO., INC.. | |
August 23, 2011 | Docket Event | FEE PAYMENT 110823-3564-CK FCP/ 8.00 PAYMT | |
August 23, 2011 | Docket Event | FEE PAYMENT 110823-0867-CK FCP/ 8.00 PAYMT | |
August 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GFS BY PRECISION SURFACES, INC. FILED. |
|
August 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): YOU ARE UNABLE TO DISMISS THE ENTIRE ACTION DUE TO THERE ARE OTHER COMPLAINT ON FILE. |
|
August 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: Notice of Settlement BY PRECISION SURFACES FILED BY PRECISION SURFACES, INC.. |
|
August 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF SEE SERVICE LIST BY MAIL ON 08/16/11 AS TO NTC OF SETTLEMENT/APP & ORDER FOR GFS, FILED. |
|
August 11, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY WHISPER RANCH, LTD, E. WAYNE SIMMONS, INC. | |
August 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed RECOMMENDATION AND ORDER AMENDING CMO:1ST AMEND- MENT TO EXH "A" CMO TIMELINE FILED. |
|
August 11, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY DEVORE CONCRETE, INC.. | |
August 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant DISMISSAL FILED AS TO WESTERN INSULATION, INC., WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
August 10, 2011 | Docket Event | CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 025-0038099186 | |
August 10, 2011 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY DRI RESIDENTIAL CORPORATION FOR FAX FEE FOR CMC STATEMENT/POS FOR CMC STATEMENT 110811-0030-VS FAX/ 14.00 PAYMT | |
August 10, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY DRI RESIDENTIAL CORPORATION. | |
August 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY MAIL ON 08/10/11 AS TO ANDERSON & KRIGER/SPRINGEL & FINK/SEE LIST, FILED. |
|
August 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant DISMISSAL FILED AS TO ORANGE STAIR & MILLWORK INC., WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
August 09, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY DEVORE CONCRETE, INC.. | |
August 08, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY CHARLES CAMPBELL, JEAN CAMPBELL. | |
August 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 79 TO BE LASCO BATHWARE FILED |
|
August 05, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY MARBLEDGE CALIFORNIA, INC., GARY'S CARPETING, INC.. | |
August 05, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY DARYL C. REYKDAL PLASTERING. | |
August 04, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY B&D GRANITE, INC.. | |
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: Notice of Settlement FILED BY GARY'S CARPETING, INC.. |
|
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GFS BY CROSS- DEFENDANT GARY'S CARPETING, INC. FILED. |
|
August 01, 2011 | Docket Event | FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 8/29/11 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36 | |
August 01, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36 | |
August 01, 2011 | Docket Event | FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 8/29/11 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32 - RESCHEDULED TO: | |
July 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Comment: VOLUME 3 ONLY SENT TO DEPT. |
|
July 19, 2011 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL FILED AS TO PLAINTIFF MICHELLE RODRIGUEZ, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED AS TO PLA /PET MICHELLE RODRIGUEZ WITHOUT PREJUDICE. | |
July 19, 2011 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL FILED AS TO PLAINTIFF RAYMOND RODRIGUEZ, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED AS TO PLA /PET RAYMOND RODRIGUEZ WITHOUT PREJUDICE. | |
July 18, 2011 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING MARSHALL FRENCH & DEGRAVE WITH PRENOVOST NORMANDIN BERGH & DAWE AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR BUTE PLUMBING, INC.. | |
July 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FILED BY BUTE PLUMBING, INC.. |
|
June 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Comment: NEW VOLUME MADE - FILES ON FAT FILE SHELF |
|
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD AS TO BUILT RIGHT CONSTRUCTION, INC.. |
|
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST SUPERIOR LANDSCAPE FILED. |
|
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST STEPHEN PATTERSON PAINTING FILED. |
|
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JRC CONSTRUCTION, INC. FILED. |
|
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD AS TO SUPERIOR LANDSCAPE. |
|
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD AS TO JRC CONSTRUCTION, INC.. |
|
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD AS TO CENTURY MARBLE CO., INC.. |
|
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD AS TO STEPHEN PATTERSON PAINTING. |
|
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST BUILT RIGHT CONSTRUCTION, INC. FILED. |
|
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST CENTURY MARBLE CO., INC. FILED. |
|
May 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Association of Counsel for Defendant Filed NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD AS TO BUTE PLUMBING, INC. ADDING ATTORNEY PRENOVOST NORMANDIN BERGH & DAWE FILED |
|
May 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Association of Counsel for Defendant Filed NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD AS TO BUTE PLUMBING, INC. ADDING ATTORNEY PRENOVOST NORMANDIN BERGH & DAWE FILED |
|
May 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER DETERMINING SETTLEMENT TO BE IN GOOD FAITH FILED |
|
May 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order filed STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT OF XDEF LETWINCH CONST FILED. SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT LETWINCH CONSTRUCTION, INC.. SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT AS TO LETWINCH CONSTRUCTION, INC. |
|
May 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Cross-Complaint FILED ON 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD BY LETWINCH CONSTRUCTION, INC. | |
May 26, 2011 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY LETWINCH CONSTRUCTION, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRENOVOST NORMANDIN BERGH & DAWE. | |
May 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Summons ISSUED ON Cross-Complaint OF LETWINCH CONSTRUCTION, INC. - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE. | |
May 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST PACIFIC WINDOW CORPORATION FILED. |
|
May 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST SIERRA GRADING FILED. |
|
May 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD AS TO PACIFIC WINDOW CORPORATION. |
|
May 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD AS TO SIERRA GRADING. |
|
May 17, 2011 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY LETWINCH CONSTRUCTION, INC. FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES 110523-0324-CK CVS/ 395.00 PAYMT | |
May 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Association of Counsel for Defendant Filed NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD AS TO WILLIAM BECHTEL ADDING ATTORNEY MCMAHAN LAW FIRM FILED |
|
May 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Association of Counsel for Defendant Filed NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD AS TO DARYL C. REYKDAL PLASTERING ADDING ATTORNEY KRAMER, DEBOER, ENDELICATO & KEANE FILED |
|
April 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DONALD ALVAREZ,JUDGE CLERK: JESSICA GABLE COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON;7079 COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY MARY CRENSHAW-TYLER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR CHARLES CAMPBELL, JEAN CAMPBELL. ATTORNEY LARRY S |
|
April 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Comment: VOL II OF II GIVEN TO INTAKE SPLIT FOR PROCESSING |
|
April 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FOR CROSS-DEFENDANT, WILLIAM BECHTEL DBA SUNCOAST ELECTRIC FILED. |
|
April 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT BY ON TRAC OVERHEAD DOOR CO. FILED. |
|
April 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF Notice of Settlement & APPLICATION FOR GFS BY MAIL ON 04/15/11 AS TO SEE SERVICE LIST, FILED. |
|
April 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): NTCE OF ASSOCIATION IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): DEFENDANTS NAME DOES NOT MATCH OUR RECORDS & ALL ATTYS NEED TO BE NAMED AS BEING. |
|
April 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: Notice of Settlement FILED BY ON TRAC OVERHEAD DOOR CO. |
|
April 15, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY MARBLEDGE CALIFORNIA, INC., GARY'S CARPETING, INC.. | |
April 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Party Removed ON Cross-Complaint OF DEVORE CONCRETE, INC., CLARENDON AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY REMOVED AS A PARTY. |
|
April 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order filed STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: Complaint in Intervention FILED. |
|
April 14, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY WHISPER RANCH, LTD, E WAYNE SIMMONS INC. | |
April 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Complaint in Intervention FILED BY CLARENDON AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY. | |
April 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Party Removed ON 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD, REYKDAL PLASTERING REMOVED AS A PARTY. |
|
April 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed DARYL C REYKDAL PLASTERING'S JELD-WEN, INC V SUPERIOR COURT OBJECTION FILED. |
|
April 13, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY DEVORE CONCRETE, INC.. | |
April 13, 2011 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY DARYL C. REYKDAL PLASTERING FOR COMPLEX CASE FEE 110426-0429-CK CXC/ 500.00 FSS/ 50.00 PAYMT | |
April 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Party Added ON THE 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD, DARYL C. REYKDAL PLASTERING IS ADDED AS A CROSS DEFENDANT. |
|
April 13, 2011 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY DARYL C. REYKDAL PLASTERING; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LETOFSKY & MCCLAIN. 110426-0423-CK CVS/ 395.00 PAYMT | |
April 13, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY DRI RESIDENTIAL CORPORATION. | |
April 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed DARYL C REYKDAL PLASTERING'S CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER OBJECTIONS FILED. |
|
April 13, 2011 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY DRI RESIDENTIAL CORPORATION FOR FAX FILING 110413-2710-VS FAX/ 11.00 PAYMT | |
April 11, 2011 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL FILED AS TO PLAINTIFF SUE AUSTIN, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED AS TO PLA /PET SUE AUSTIN WITHOUT PREJUDICE. | |
April 11, 2011 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL FILED AS TO PLAINTIFF PAMELA PECK, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED AS TO PLA /PET PAMELA PECK WITHOUT PREJUDICE. | |
April 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
Party Added ON THE Cross-Complaint OF DEVORE CONCRETE, INC., CLARENDON AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY IS ADDED AS A INT. |
|
April 06, 2011 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY CLARENDON AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE 110406-0277-CK CVS/ 395.00 PAYMT | |
April 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF ROE AMENDMENT & CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 03/19/11 AS TO SIERRA GRADING, FILED. |
|
April 04, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY CHARLES CAMPBELL. | |
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY B&D GRANITE, INC.. | |
March 29, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32 | |
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NEED TO ANSWER AS SUED. |
|
March 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): DEFAULT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): ALL PLTFS NEED TO BE NAMED ON DEFAULT & CHARLES CAMPBELL HAS BEEN DISMISSED ON COMPLAINT. |
|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY BUTE PLUMBING, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY MARSHALL FRENCH & DEGRAVE. 110323-2690-CK CVS/ 395.00 PAYMT | |
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY BUTE PLUMBING, INC. FOR COMPLEX CASE FEE 110323-2694-CK COP/ 550.00 PAYMT | |
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event | FEE PAYMENT 110322-3041-CK FCP/ 3.50 PAYMT | |
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): DEFENDANT NAME ON REQUEST FOR DEFAULT MUST MATCH HOW THEY WERE SUED (SE. |
|
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: FILED PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF AMNDMT/Summons /FIRST AMNDED CROSS-COMPLT AS TO SPECIALTIES SALES AND SERVICES SERVED ON 02/07/11 WITH FEES OF $0.00. |
|
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF INTENT TO OPT OUT OF PROVISION 1.5 OF CMC ORDR FILED BY DRI RESIDENTIAL CORPORATION. |
|
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY DRI RESIDENTIAL CORPORATION FOR FAX FILING OF NOTICE 110223-0315-VS FAX/ 8.00 PAYMT 110223-0315-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 025-0035788351 | |
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY DRI RESIDENTIAL CORPORATION FOR POSTAGE/ENEVELOPE/MISC COPY 110223-0332-VS FFS/ 0.20 FPC/ 0.44 PAYMT 110223-0332-VS TSB/ 0.02 FCP/ 0.50 PAYMT 110223-0332-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 025-0035788351 | |
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event | CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 025-0035788351 | |
February 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Association of Counsel for Defendant Filed NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD AS TO WILLIAM BECHTEL ADDING ATTORNEY LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH FILED |
|
February 04, 2011 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY DRI RESIDENTIAL CORPORATION FOR FAX FILINT OF ANSWER & PRF OF SVC 110210-0998-VS FAX/ 18.00 PAYMT 110210-0998-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 025-0035648981 | |
February 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF XDEFS DRI RESIDENTIAL CORP ANSWER TO XCMPLT BY MAIL ON 02/04/11 AS TO SEE SERVICE LIST, FILED. |
|
February 04, 2011 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY DRI RESIDENTIAL CORPORATION FOR MISC COPY/POSTAGE/ENEVELOPE 110210-1012-VS FFS/ 0.20 FPC/ 0.44 PAYMT 110210-1012-VS TSB/ 0.02 FCP/ 1.00 PAYMT 110210-1012-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 025-0035648981 | |
February 04, 2011 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY DRI RESIDENTIAL CORPORATION; PARTY REPRESENTED BY JAMES DRUMMOND. 110210-0971-VS CVS/ 395.00 PAYMT 110210-0971-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 025-0035648981 | |
January 31, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. | |
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY ELISINORE CONSTRUCTION, INC. FOR POSTAGE/ENEVELOPE 110201-2138-VS FFS/ 0.20 FPC/ 0.44 PAYMT 110201-2138-VS TSB/ 0.02 PAYMT 110201-2138-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 025-0035539044 | |
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY ELISINORE CONSTRUCTION, INC. | |
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed NOTICE OF RULING ON FURTHER CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE FILED. |
|
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY ELISINORE CONSTRUCTION, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY STACY FIERMAN -CRIBBS. | |
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
AKA added for Defendant ON 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD FOR ELISINORE CONSTRUCTION, INC., ADD ELISINORE CONSTRUCTION, INC.. |
|
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY ELISINORE CONSTRUCTION, INC. FOR FAX FILING OF ANSWER TO XCMPLT/DJT 110201-2128-VS FAX/ 20.00 PAYMT 110201-2128-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 025-0035539044 | |
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event | CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 025-0035539044 | |
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
AKA added for Defendant ON 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD FOR ELISINORE CONSTRUCTION, INC., ADD BOURNE ROOFING. |
|
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Party Added ON THE 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD, ELISINORE CONSTRUCTION, INC. IS ADDED AS A CROSS DEFENDANT. |
|
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DONALD ALVAREZ,JUDGE CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER COURT REPORTER CHERI ATKINSON;12624 COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY (NOT) PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. DONNA MOORE APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR USF&G INSURAN |
|
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service UNSERVED Filed PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO CENTURY MARBLE CO., INC.. |
|
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is: PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons/Cross-Complaint FILED AS TO DEVORE CONCRETE, INC.. PARTY SERVED ON 11/22/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBST. WITH FEES OF $61.82. |
|
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is: PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons/CROSS-COMPLT FILED AS TO SUNCOAST ELECTRIC. PARTY SERVED ON 11/08/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBST. WITH FEES OF $63.85. |
|
January 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CHARLES CAMPBELL IS NOT PARTY ON COMPLAINT FILED ON 100709. |
|
January 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Comment: VOL II OF II SENT TO CP32 |
|
January 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant DISMISSAL FILED AS TO VALLEY WOODWORKS, WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
January 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET ON CENTURY MARBLE CO., INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/07/11 |
|
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY GARY'S CARPETING, INC.. | |
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY CHARLES CAMPBELL, JEAN CAMPBELL. | |
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY WHISPER RANCH, LTD, E. WAYNE SIMMONS, INC. | |
January 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant DISMISSAL FILED AS TO M&R WOOD PRODUCTS, WITH PREJUDICE |
|
January 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant DISMISSAL FILED AS TO MICHAEL A. NOVAK, GENERAL CONTRACTOR, WITH PREJUDICE |
|
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY REGAL CULTURED MARBLE, INC. | |
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY REGAL CULTURED MARBLE, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BRAGG & KULUVA. 101230-0534-CK CVS/ 395.00 PAYMT | |
December 28, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY WILLIAM BECHTEL FOR COMPLEX CASE FEE 101228-0494-CK COR/ 550.00 PAYMT | |
December 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
AKA added for Defendant ON 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD FOR WILLIAM BECHTEL, ADD SUNCOAST ELECTRIC. |
|
December 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Party Added ON THE 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD, WILLIAM BECHTEL IS ADDED AS A X DEFENDANT. |
|
December 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Party Removed ON 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD, SUNCOAST ELECTRIC REMOVED AS A PARTY. |
|
December 28, 2010 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY WILLIAM BECHTEL; PARTY REPRESENTED BY DEBORAH ELLIOTT. 101228-0487-CK CVS/ 395.00 PAYMT | |
December 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO WINDOW LOGIC CORP SERVED ON 12/20/10 WITH FEES OF $33.45. |
|
December 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO DESIGNER CHOICE CABINETS SERVED ON 12/16/10 WITH FEES OF $98.85. |
|
December 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO PACIFIC WINDOW CORPORATION SERVED ON 12/20/10 WITH FEES OF $57.85. |
|
December 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF RELEASE OF SDS CONCRETE INC'S LIEN FILED BY SDS CONCRETE, INC.. |
|
December 20, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE TRANSFERRED TO NEW DEPARTMENT | |
December 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO SUPERIOR LANDSCAPE SERVED ON 12/06/10 WITH FEES OF $63.85. |
|
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 78 TO BE WINDOW LOGIC CORP FILED |
|
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant DISMISSAL FILED AS TO SDS CONCRETE, INC., WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY WESTERN INSULATION, INC. FOR COMPLEX CASE 101201-0296-CK CXC/ 500.00 FSS/ 50.00 PAYMT 101201-0296-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 1101053844 | |
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY WESTERN INSULATION, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY MARSHALL FRENCH & DEGRAVE. 101201-0290-CK CVS/ 395.00 PAYMT 101201-0290-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 1101053850 | |
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY SDS CONCRETE, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF LAWRENCE M BUREK. | |
November 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY WITHIN THE FIRM FILED BY GARY'S CARPETING, INC.. |
|
November 12, 2010 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY HUDCO, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY STUTZ ARTIANO SHINOFF & HOLTZ. 101112-3546-CK CVS/ 395.00 PAYMT 101112-3546-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 032983 | |
November 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): NOTICE OF ERRATA IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): UNABLE TO FILE DUE TO DISMISSED PARTY. |
|
November 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO SIERRA GRADING SERVED ON 11/01/10 WITH FEES OF $63.85. |
|
November 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET ON REYKDAL PLASTERING; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/31/10 |
|
November 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET ON WESTERN INSULATION, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/22/10 |
|
October 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET ON JRC CONSTRUCTION, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/12/10 |
|
October 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET ON BUILT RIGHT CONSTRUCTION, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/12/10 |
|
October 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO BOURNE ROOFING SERVED ON 10/13/10 WITH FEES OF $88.85. |
|
October 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO REGAL CULTURED MARBLE, INC. SERVED ON 10/14/10 WITH FEES OF $57.85. |
|
October 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO BUTE PLUMBING, INC. SERVED ON 10/12/10 WITH FEES OF $63.85. |
|
October 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Association of Counsel for Defendant Filed NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD AS TO ON TRAC OVERHEAD DOOR CO ADDING ATTORNEY MARSHALL FRENCH & DEGRAVE FILED |
|
October 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant DISMISSAL FILED AS TO AMS STAFF LEASING N.A., INC., B&B ELECTRIC, INC., BARRETT BUSINESS SERVICES, INC., DANNY'S BACKHOE SERVICE, INTERTILE DISTRIBUTORS, LITE CENTER OF CALIFORNIA, NICHOLSON CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, RON BURTON'S BACKHOE SERVICE, TONKA BOYS GR |
|
October 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant DISMISSAL FILED AS TO WINDOW LOGIC CORP., WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
October 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO RON BURTON'S BACKHOE SERVICE SERVED ON 10/18/10 WITH FEES OF $63.85. |
|
October 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO TONKA BOYS GRADING& PAVING SERVED ON 10/11/10 WITH FEES OF $63.85. |
|
October 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO DRI RESIDENTIAL CORPORATION SERVED ON 10/08/10 WITH FEES OF $46.85. |
|
October 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET ON MICHAEL A. NOVAK, GENERAL CONTRACTOR; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/10/10 |
|
October 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET ON SDS CONCRETE, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/07/10 |
|
October 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Set Aside Default of SET ASIDE DEFAULT ON THE B&B ELECTRIC, INC.. |
|
October 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET ON NICHOLSON CONSTRUCTION COMPANY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/14/10 |
|
October 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant DISMISSAL FILED AS TO B&B ELECTRIC, INC., WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
October 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO HUDCO, INC. SERVED ON 10/11/10 WITH FEES OF $63.85. |
|
October 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO STEPHEN PATTERSON PAINTING SERVED ON 10/11/10 WITH FEES OF $63.85. |
|
October 15, 2010 | Docket Event | SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT B&B ELECTRIC, INC.. | |
October 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET ON TRUSS SYSTEMS MANUFACTURING, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/08/10 |
|
October 07, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY DEVORE CONCRETE, INC.. | |
October 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DONALD ALVAREZ,JUDGE CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON;7079 COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE - APPEARANCES: MARY CRENSHAW TYLER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR RAYMOND RODRIGUEZ, MICHELLE RODRIGUEZ, DENISE MATTHEW |
|
October 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FILED. |
|
October 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: VOL II OF II SENT TO CP36 |
|
September 28, 2010 | Docket Event | FEE PAYMENT 100928-0362-CK FCP/ 5.50 PAYMT 100928-0362-CK REFERENCE NUMBER #118432 | |
September 23, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY WHISPER RANCH, LTD, E. WAYNE SIMMONS, INC. | |
September 20, 2010 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY GREAT LAKES REINSURANCE COMPANY; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HOMAN & STONE. | |
September 14, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY CHARLES CAMPBELL, JEAN CAMPBELL. | |
September 08, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY GREAT LAKES REINSURANCE COMPANY FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES 100923-1086-CK CVR/ 355.00 PAYMT 100923-1086-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 19003 | |
September 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order filed STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO ALLOW INTERVENTION FILED. |
|
September 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Party Added ON THE 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD, GREAT LAKES REINSURANCE COMPANY IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT IN INTERVENTION. |
|
August 31, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DONALD ALVAREZ PRESIDING. CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON;7079 COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY BILL SICKINGER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. ASTHA GHAI APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR |
|
August 31, 2010 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY WHISPER RANCH, LTD.,, E. WAYNE SIMMONS, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SPRINGEL & FINK. | |
August 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: GAVE VOL II OF II TO INTAKE SPLIT FOR PROCESSING |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 72 TO BE SUPERIOR LANDSCAPE FILED |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 73 TO BE T.J. ROGER DRYWALL, INC. FILED |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 71 TO BE SUNCOAST ELECTRIC FILED |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 53 TO BE BUTE PLUMBING, INC. FILED |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 65 TO BE REYKDAL PLASTERING FILED |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 63 TO BE NICHOLSON CONSTRUCTION COMPANY FILED |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 64 TO BE REGAL CULTURED MARBLE, INC. FILED |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 61 TO BE LITE CENTER OF CALIFORNIA FILED |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 56 TO BE DESIGNER CHOICE CABINETS FILED |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 57 TO BE DRI RESIDENTIAL CORPORATION FILED |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 55 TO BE DANNY'S BACKHOE SERVICE FILED |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 76 TO BE WESTERN INSULATION, INC. FILED |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 50 TO BE BARRETT BUSINESS SERVICES, INC. FILED |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 75 TO BE TRUSS SYSTEMS MANUFACTURING, INC. FILED |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 69 TO BE SPECIALTIES SALES AND SERVICES FILED |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 68 TO BE SIERRA GRADING FILED |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 58 TO BE HUDCO, INC. FILED |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 52 TO BE BUILT RIGHT CONSTRUCTION, INC. FILED |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 48 TO BE AMS STAFF LEASING N.A., INC. FILED |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 74 TO BE TONKA BOYS GRADING& PAVING FILED |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 70 TO BE STEPHEN PATTERSON PAINTING FILED |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 49 TO BE B&B ELECTRIC, INC. FILED |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 62 TO BE MICHAEL A. NOVAK, GENERAL CONTRACTOR FILED |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 77 TO BE WINDOW LOGIC CORP. FILED |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 67 TO BE SDS CONCRETE, INC. FILED |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 59 TO BE INTERTILE DISTRIBUTORS FILED |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 54 TO BE CENTURY MARBLE CO., INC. FILED |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 66 TO BE RON BURTON'S BACKHOE SERVICE FILED |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 51 TO BE BOURNE ROOFING FILED |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 60 TO BE JRC CONSTRUCTION, INC. FILED |
|
August 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (SUITE NUMBER ONLY) FILED BY MASCO CONTRACTOR SERVICES OF CALIFORNIA, IN. |
|
August 18, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY WHISPER RANCH, LTD, E. WAYNE SIMMONS, INC. | |
August 16, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY CHARLES CAMPBELL. | |
August 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 47 TO BE PACIFIC WINDOW CORPORATION FILED |
|
August 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST VALLEY WOODWORKS FILED. |
|
August 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD AS TO ULTRA-WALL, INC.. |
|
August 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD AS TO VALLEY WOODWORKS. SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT VALLEY WOODWORKS. SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT AS TO VALLEY WOODWORKS |
|
August 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST B&B ELECTRIC, INC. FILED. |
|
August 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ULTRA-WALL, INC. FILED. |
|
August 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD AS TO B&B ELECTRIC, INC.. |
|
August 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALARMCO SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC. FILED. |
|
August 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD AS TO ALARMCO SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC.. |
|
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event | Complaint in Intervention FILED BY USF&G INSURANCE COMPANY, TRAVELERS PROPERTYCASUALTY COMPANY. | |
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY DEVORE CONCRETE, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BREMER WHYTE BROWN & O'MEARA. 100804-3333-CK CVR/ 355.00 PAYMT 100804-3333-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 47735 | |
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event | Cross-Complaint FILED ON 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD BY DEVORE CONCRETE, INC. | |
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order filed STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: ALLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION FILED. |
|
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: NO Summons ISSUED FOR COMPLAINT-IN-INTERVENTION |
|
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY USF&G INSURANCE COMPANY FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE 100723-3412-CK CVF/ 355.00 PAYMT | |
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY TRAVELERS PROPERTYCASUALTY COMPANY FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE 100723-3418-CK CVF/ 355.00 PAYMT | |
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
AKA added for Plaintiff ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF CHARLES CAMPBELL FOR USF&G INSURANCE COMPANY, ADD MARBLEDGE CALIFORNIA, INC. |
|
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
AKA added for Plaintiff ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF CHARLES CAMPBELL FOR TRAVELERS PROPERTYCASUALTY COMPANY, ADD MARBLEDGE CALIFORNIA, INC. |
|
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Party Added ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF CHARLES CAMPBELL, USF&G INSURANCE COMPANY, TRAVELERS PROPERTYCASUALTY COMPANY IS ADDED AS A INTERVENORS. |
|
June 17, 2010 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL FILED AS TO PLAINTIFF CHARLES CAMPBELL, JEAN CAMPBELL, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ON PLAITNIFF'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED AS TO PLA /PET CHARLES CAMPBELL, JEAN CAMPBELL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. | |
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY PACIFIC RAIN GUTTERS, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY DEBORAH ELLIOTT. | |
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event | SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT PACIFIC RAIN GUTTERS, INC.. | |
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order filed STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AS TO PACIFIC RAIN GUTTERS,IN FILED. |
|
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Set Aside Default of SET ASIDE DEFAULT ON THE PACIFIC RAIN GUTTERS, INC.. |
|
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed MESA WEATHERSTRIPPING COMPANY'S OPT OUT OF THE DEEMED Cross-Complaint PROVISION OF THE CMC FILED. |
|
June 10, 2010 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY CERAMICSTYLE, INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY MCMAHAN LAW FIRM. | |
June 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order filed STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SET ASIDE DEFAULT OF X-DEFT CERAMICSTYLE, INC FILED. SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT CERAMICSTYLE, INC. SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT AS TO CERAMICSTYLE, INC |
|
June 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Party Removed ON 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD, PACIFIC RAIN GUTTER, INC REMOVED AS A PARTY. |
|
June 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Party Added ON THE 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD, PACIFIC RAIN GUTTERS, INC. IS ADDED AS A CROSS-DEFENDANT. |
|
June 04, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY PACIFIC RAIN GUTTERS, INC. FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES 100611-1968-CK CVF/ 355.00 PAYMT 100611-1968-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 114795 | |
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER / CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER |
|
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DONALD ALVAREZ PRESIDING. CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE NOT REPORTED - APPEARANCES: MARY CRENSHAW TYLER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR CHARLES CAMPBELL. BETHANY HENDERSON APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR WHISPER RAN |
|
May 27, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY A & A FENCE CO., INC.. | |
May 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Fee Voided ** VOID ** FEE RECEIPT# 100527-0488 VOIDED BY TWARN FROM NENRI RANG WRONG AMOUNT |
|
May 27, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY A & A FENCE CO., INC. FOR FAX FEE 100527-2955-VS FAX/ 8.00 PAYMT | |
May 27, 2010 | Docket Event | CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 025-0029760653 | |
May 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE LM37 HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/02/10 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36. |
|
May 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: MOTION SET 6/2/10 TAKEN OFF CAL AT REQUEST OF M/P |
|
May 21, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY CHARLES CAMPBELL. | |
May 21, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY WHISPER RANCH, LTD. | |
May 18, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY GARY'S CARPETING, INC.. | |
May 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO LR36 |
|
May 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT & PROPOSED ORDER IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): NEED TO SUBMIT 1ST APPEARANCE FEES FOR CROSS DEFE. |
|
May 13, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY CERAMICSTYLE, INC FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEES 100624-0568-CK CVR/ 335.00 PAYMT 100624-0568-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 18714 | |
May 13, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY CERAMICSTYLE, INC FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEES 100527-0488-CK CVR/ 355.00 PAYMT 100527-0488-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 18714 | |
May 13, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY WHISPER RANCH, LTD FOR STIP/ORDER TO SET ASISE DEFAULT 100527-0501-CK RSO/ 20.00 PAYMT 100527-0501-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 18665 | |
May 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: $20.00 FEE PD FOR STIP ON 051310 SHOULD HAVE BEEN FOR PART OF 1ST APPR FEES FOR DEF CERAMICSTYLE |
|
May 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed NOTICE OF RULING ON OBJECTIONS TO THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FILED. |
|
May 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed NOT OF LODGING OF OBJECTIONS TO PROP CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY A&A FENCE CO & WITHDRAWAL OF OBJECTION FILED |
|
April 22, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY MESA WEATHERSTRIPPING COMPANY FOR COMPLEX CASE FEE 100428-0522-CK CXC/ 500.00 FSS/ 50.00 PAYMT | |
April 22, 2010 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY MESA WEATHERSTRIPPING COMPANY; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BORTON PETRINI LLP. 100428-0514-CK CVR/ 355.00 PAYMT | |
April 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST PACIFIC RAIN GUTTERS, INC. FILED. |
|
April 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD AS TO TRIPACIFIC PLUMBING. |
|
April 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST PACIFIC RAIN GUTTER, INC FILED. |
|
April 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD AS TO LETWINCH CONSTRUCTION, INC.. |
|
April 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST TRIPACIFIC PLUMBING FILED. |
|
April 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST LETWINCH CONSTRUCTION, INC. FILED. |
|
April 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD AS TO CERAMICSTYLE, INC. |
|
April 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST CERAMICSTYLE, INC FILED. |
|
April 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD AS TO PACIFIC RAIN GUTTER, INC. |
|
April 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD AS TO VERMAX, INC.. |
|
April 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST VERMAX, INC. FILED. |
|
April 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD AS TO PACIFIC RAIN GUTTERS, INC.. |
|
April 02, 2010 | Docket Event | CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 025-0027733298 | |
April 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed OBJECTION TO PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY A&A FENCE FILED. |
|
April 02, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY A & A FENCE CO., INC. FOR FAX FILING 100402-2344-VS FAX/ 6.00 PAYMT | |
April 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: FILED PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons/ COMPLAINT AS TO MESA WEATHERSTRIPPING COMPANY SERVED ON 03/26/10 WITH FEES OF $41.90. |
|
March 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DONALD ALVAREZ PRESIDING. CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON;7079 COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY MARY CRENSHAW TYLER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. KATHRYN DROTT APPEARS BY COURT |
|
March 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes EX-PARTE MOTION RE: SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR Motion for Protective Order DONALD ALVAREZ PRESIDING. CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON;7079 COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY MARY CRENSHAW TYLER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONE |
|
March 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed CONDITIONAL OPPOSITION TO EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER BY A&A FENCE CO., INC. FILED. |
|
March 25, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36 | |
March 25, 2010 | Docket Event | CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 025-0027402823 | |
March 25, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY A & A FENCE CO., INC. FOR FAX FILING FEE 100325-0429-VS FAX/ 21.00 PAYMT 100325-0429-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 025-0027402823 | |
March 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Motion Filed re: EX-PARTE MOTION RE: SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR Motion for Protective Order TO BE HEARD ON 03/25/10 AT 09:30 IN DEPARTMENT S31. 100324-0639-CK MMF/ 40.00 PAYMT |
|
March 22, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY WHISPER RANCH, LTD, E. WAYNE SIMMONS, INC. | |
March 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO CP36 |
|
March 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY FILED BY GARY'S CARPETING, INC.. |
|
March 10, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY CHARLES CAMPBELL. | |
February 11, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. | |
February 11, 2010 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY ORANGE STAIR & MILLWORK INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY KEVIN PEGAN. 100218-1045-CK CVR/ 355.00 PAYMT 100218-1045-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 110837 | |
February 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant DISMISSAL FILED AS TO WESTERN INSULATION, L.P., WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
February 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Party Removed ON 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD, CWP SURFACES AND DESIGNS, INC. REMOVED AS A PARTY. |
|
January 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Party Added ON THE 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD, PRECISION SURFACES, INC. IS ADDED AS A CROSS DEFT. |
|
January 27, 2010 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY PRECISION SURFACES, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY KEVIN PEGAN. 100201-0151-CK CVR/ 355.00 PAYMT 100201-0151-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 536858 | |
January 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant DISMISSAL FILED AS TO STEPHEN PATTERSON PAINTING, SUNCOAST ELECTRIC, WESTERN INSULATION, INC., WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
January 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant DISMISSAL FILED AS TO BOURNE ROOFING, BUILT RIGHT CONSTRUCTION, INC., DESIGNER CHOICE CABINETS, DRI RESIDENTIAL CORPORATION, HUDCO, INC., JRC CONSTRUCTION, INC., MICHAEL A. NOVAK, REGAL CULTURED MARBLE, INC., REYKDAL PLASTERING, SDS CONCRETE, INC., WITHOU |
|
January 06, 2010 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY ON TRAC OVERHEAD DOOR CO; PARTY REPRESENTED BY KEVIN PEGAN. 100107-0113-CK CVR/ 355.00 PAYMT 100107-0113-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 536652 | |
January 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): XDEF WESTERN SPECIALTIES REMOVED AS A PARTY ON 112309. |
|
December 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Association of Counsel for Defendant Filed NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD AS TO GARY'S CARPETING, INC. ADDING ATTORNEY LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH FILED |
|
December 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET ON VALLEY WOODWORKS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/14/09 |
|
December 14, 2009 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY M&R WOOD PRODUCTS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY AVILA & PEROS LLP. 091217-2191-MC CVR/ 355.00 PAYMT | |
December 14, 2009 | Docket Event | CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 024-0074898438 | |
December 14, 2009 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY M&R WOOD PRODUCTS FOR FAX FILING FEE 091217-2201-MC FAX/ 9.00 PAYMT | |
December 10, 2009 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY B&D GRANITE, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY ROBERT WALKER. 091210-3134-CK CVR/ 355.00 PAYMT | |
December 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): WINDOW LOGIC HAS BEEN DISMISSED ON CROSS CMPLAINT *. |
|
December 09, 2009 | Docket Event | FEE PAYMENT 091209-5292-CK FCP/ 2.50 PAYMT | |
December 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE JUDGE AWAY FROM COURT CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE NOT REPORTED - APPEARANCES: MARY CRENSHAW TYLER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR CHARLES CAMPBELL, JEAN CAMPBELL, WHISPER RANCH, LTD, RAYMOND RODRIGUEZ, MICH |
|
December 01, 2009 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY GARY'S CARPETING, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY OSMAN & ASSOCIATES. 091202-0541-CK CVR/ 355.00 PAYMT 091202-0541-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 515493 | |
December 01, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY WHISPER RANCH, LTD, E. WAYNE SIMMONS, INC. | |
November 30, 2009 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY FENCEWORKS, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY CRAIG SILVER. 091130-0106-CK CVR/ 355.00 PAYMT | |
November 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Comment: FILE SENT TO CP36 |
|
November 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons & COMPLAINT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): BUILT RIGHT CONSTRUCTION NOT A CROSS-DEFENDANT BUILT RIGHT R. |
|
November 24, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY CHARLES CAMPBELL, JEAN CAMPBELL. | |
November 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Party Added ON THE 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD, MASCO CONTRACTOR SERVICES OF CALIFORNIA, IN IS ADDED AS A X-DEFENDANT. |
|
November 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO SOME XDEF IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): XDEFENDANTS HAVE BEEN PREVIOUSLY DISMISSED ON 11/4/09. |
|
November 23, 2009 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY WESTERN INSULATION, L.P.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY JEFFERY & GROSFELD LLP. 091201-1973-CK CVR/ 355.00 PAYMT 091201-1973-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 12057 | |
November 23, 2009 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY MASCO CONTRACTOR SERVICES OF CALIFORNIA, IN; PARTY REPRESENTED BY JEFFERY & GROSFELD LLP. 091201-0412-CK CVR/ 355.00 PAYMT 091201-0412-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 12056 | |
November 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Party Removed ON 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD, WESTERN SPECIALTIES REMOVED AS A PARTY. |
|
November 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Party Removed ON 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD, SCHMID INSULATION CONTRACTORS,INC. REMOVED AS A PARTY. |
|
November 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Party Added ON THE 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD, WESTERN INSULATION, L.P. IS ADDED AS A X-DEFENDANT. |
|
November 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF LIEN FILED BY SDS CONCRETE, INC.. |
|
November 19, 2009 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY SDS CONCRETE, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF LAWRENCE M BUREK. 091123-3654-CK CVR/ 355.00 PAYMT 091123-3654-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 3148 | |
November 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed CERTIFIED CPY OF JDGMT IN SPPRT OF LIEN BY SDS CONCRETE INC PURS TO CCP 708.410 FILED. |
|
November 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO B&B ELECTRIC, INC. SERVED ON 11/11/09 WITH FEES OF $98.85. |
|
November 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO LETWINCH CONSTRUCTION, INC. SERVED ON 11/08/09 WITH FEES OF $88.85. |
|
November 13, 2009 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY SCHMID INSULATION CONTRACTORS,INC. FOR FAX FILING OF ANSWER TO X-CMPLT 091123-3546-MC FAX/ 9.00 PAYMT 091123-3546-MC REFERENCE NUMBER 024-0072985765 | |
November 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Comment: FAX FILING PD BY M&R WOOD PRODUCTS NOT SCHMID INSULATION |
|
November 13, 2009 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY M&R WOOD PRODUCTS FOR POSTAGE/ENEVELOPE 091123-3564-MC FFS/ 0.20 FPC/ 0.44 PAYMT 091123-3564-MC TSB/ 0.02 PAYMT 091123-3564-MC REFERENCE NUMBER 024-0072985765 | |
November 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO DEVORE CONCRETE, INC. SERVED ON 10/29/09 WITH FEES OF $153.85. |
|
November 13, 2009 | Docket Event | CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 024-0072985765 | |
November 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET ON SCHMID INSULATION CONTRACTORS,INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/19/09 |
|
November 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET ON B&D GRANITE, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/05/09 |
|
November 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET ON VERMAX, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/05/09 |
|
November 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET ON MARBLEDGE CALIFORNIA, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/05/09 |
|
November 09, 2009 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY A & A FENCE CO., INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY THE MORRISON LAW GROUP. 091109-5522-CK CVR/ 355.00 PAYMT | |
November 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO REYKDAL PLASTERING SERVED ON 11/03/09 WITH FEES OF $63.85. |
|
November 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO WESTERN INSULATION, INC. SERVED ON 10/29/09 WITH FEES OF $157.25. |
|
November 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant DISMISSAL FILED AS TO NICHOLSON CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, RON BURTON'S BACKHOE SERVICE, TONKA BOYS GRADING& PAVING, WINDOW LOGIC CORP., TRUSS SYSTEMS MANUFACTURING, INC., WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
November 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant DISMISSAL FILED AS TO AMS STAFF LEASING N.A., INC., BARRETT BUSINESS SERVICES, INC., DANNY'S BACKHOE SERVICE, INTERTILE DISTRIBUTORS, LITE CENTER OF CALIFORNIA, WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
November 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET ON WESTERN SPECIALTIES; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/27/09 |
|
October 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO BUILT RIGHT CONSTRUCTION, INC. SERVED ON 10/21/09 WITH FEES OF $88.85. |
|
October 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Party Added ON THE 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD, TRUSS SYSTEMS MANUFACTURING, INC. IS ADDED AS A CROSS DEFENDANT. |
|
October 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET ON NICHOLSON CONSTRUCTION COMPANY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/15/09 |
|
October 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES 40 TO BE TRUSS SYSTEMS MANUFACTURING, INC. FILED. |
|
October 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET ON TRUSS SYSTEMS MANUFACTURING, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/19/09 |
|
October 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO ON TRAC OVERHEAD DOOR CO SERVED ON 10/23/09 WITH FEES OF $63.85. |
|
October 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET ON CWP SURFACES AND DESIGNS, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/23/09 |
|
October 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO JRC CONSTRUCTION, INC. SERVED ON 10/21/09 WITH FEES OF $57.85. |
|
October 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO GARY'S CARPETING, INC. SERVED ON 10/20/09 WITH FEES OF $63.85. |
|
October 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET ON MICHAEL A. NOVAK; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/25/09 |
|
October 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET ON CERAMICSTYLE, INC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/19/09 |
|
October 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO TONKA BOYS GRADING& PAVING SERVED ON 10/19/09 WITH FEES OF $63.85. |
|
October 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO ALARMCO SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC. SERVED ON 10/27/09 WITH FEES OF $58.90. |
|
October 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO INTERTILE DISTRIBUTORS SERVED ON 10/21/09 WITH FEES OF $57.85. |
|
October 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO BOURNE ROOFING SERVED ON 10/20/09 WITH FEES OF $88.85. |
|
October 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): BUILT RIGHT CONSTRUCTION REMOVED AS A DEFENDANT NOT SHOWN AS A CROSS-DEF. |
|
October 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons & COMPLAINT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): TRUSS SYSTEMS MANUFACTURING, INC, ROE 40 NOT A PARTY TO THIS. |
|
October 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): PROOF OF SERVICE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): TRUSS SYSTEMS IS ANOT A PARTY TO THIS CASE *. |
|
October 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO PACIFIC RAIN GUTTERS, INC. SERVED ON 10/20/09 WITH FEES OF $88.85. |
|
October 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO FENCEWORKS, INC. SERVED ON 10/20/09 WITH FEES OF $63.85. |
|
October 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO PACIFIC WINDOW CORPORATION SERVED ON 10/20/09 WITH FEES OF $63.85. |
|
October 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO REGAL CULTURED MARBLE, INC. SERVED ON 10/21/09 WITH FEES OF $57.85. |
|
October 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO PACIFIC RAIN GUTTER, INC SERVED ON 10/20/09 WITH FEES OF $88.85. |
|
October 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET ON TRIPACIFIC PLUMBING; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/19/09 |
|
October 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO ORANGE STAIR & MILLWORK INC. SERVED ON 10/20/09 WITH FEES OF $63.85. |
|
October 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET ON M&R WOOD PRODUCTS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/16/09 |
|
October 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO DRI RESIDENTIAL CORPORATION SERVED ON 10/20/09 WITH FEES OF $46.85. |
|
October 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO WINDOW LOGIC CORP. SERVED ON 10/20/09 WITH FEES OF $63.85. |
|
October 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO SDS CONCRETE, INC. SERVED ON 10/20/09 WITH FEES OF $63.85. |
|
October 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO A & A FENCE CO., INC. SERVED ON 10/20/09 WITH FEES OF $88.85. |
|
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET ON HUDCO, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/18/09 |
|
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO STEPHEN PATTERSON PAINTING SERVED ON 10/19/09 WITH FEES OF $63.85. |
|
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET ON ULTRA-WALL, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/19/09 |
|
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO DESIGNER CHOICE CABINETS SERVED ON 10/19/09 WITH FEES OF $63.85. |
|
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF Summons AND COMP/PET AS TO SUNCOAST ELECTRIC SERVED ON 10/19/09 WITH FEES OF $63.85. |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 45 TO BE WESTERN SPECIALTIES FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 18 TO BE INTERTILE DISTRIBUTORS FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 11 TO BE DANNY'S BACKHOE SERVICE FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 14 TO BE DRI RESIDENTIAL CORPORATION FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 5 TO BE B&D GRANITE, INC. FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Party Removed ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF CHARLES CAMPBELL, B&B ELECTRIC, INC. REMOVED AS A PARTY. |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF CHARLES CAMPBELL NAMING ROES 8 TO BE BUILT RIGHT CONSTRUCTION, INC. FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF CHARLES CAMPBELL NAMING ROES 5 TO BE B&D GRANITE, INC. FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 44 TO BE WESTERN INSULATION, INC. FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 36 TO BE STEPHEN PATTERSON PAINTING FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 27 TO BE ON TRAC OVERHEAD DOOR CO FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 26 TO BE NICHOLSON CONSTRUCTION COMPANY FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 20 TO BE LETWINCH CONSTRUCTION, INC. FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 13 TO BE DEVORE CONCRETE, INC. FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Party Removed ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF CHARLES CAMPBELL, BOURNE ROOFING REMOVED AS A PARTY. |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Party Removed ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF CHARLES CAMPBELL, BARRETT BUSINESS SERVICES, INC. REMOVED AS A PARTY. |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Party Removed ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF CHARLES CAMPBELL, AMS STAFF LEASING N.A., INC. REMOVED AS A PARTY. |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF CHARLES CAMPBELL NAMING ROES 4 TO BE B&B ELECTRIC, INC. FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 38 TO BE TONKA BOYS GRADING& PAVING FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 37 TO BE SUNCOAST ELECTRIC FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 6 TO BE BARRETT BUSINESS SERVICES, INC. FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 33 TO BE RON BURTON'S BACKHOE SERVICE FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Party Added ON THE 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD, BUILT RIGHT CONSTRUCTION, INC. IS ADDED AS A CROSS DEFENDANT. |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
AKA added for Defendant ON 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD FOR SCHMID INSULATION CONTRACTORS,INC., ADD PARAGON SCHMID BUILDING PRODUCTS. |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 42 TO BE VALLEY WOODWORKS FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 30 TO BE PACIFIC WINDOW CORPORATION FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 25 TO BE MICHAEL A. NOVAK FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 21 TO BE LITE CENTER OF CALIFORNIA FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 3 TO BE AMS STAFF LEASING N.A., INC. FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 17 TO BE HUDCO, INC. FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF CHARLES CAMPBELL NAMING ROES 6 TO BE BARRETT BUSINESS SERVICES, INC. FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 2 TO BE ALARMCO SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC. FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 34 TO BE SCHMID INSULATION CONTRACTORS,INC. FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 24 TO BE MESA WEATHERSTRIPPING COMPANY FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 29 TO BE PACIFIC RAIN GUTTER, INC FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 16 TO BE GARY'S CARPETING, INC. FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 15 TO BE FENCEWORKS, INC. FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 1 TO BE A & A FENCE CO., INC. FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 35 TO BE SDS CONCRETE, INC. FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 39 TO BE TRIPACIFIC PLUMBING FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 4 TO BE B&B ELECTRIC, INC. FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Comment: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT IS FOR CROSS COMPLAINT OF WHISPER RANCH NOT CAMPBELL |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF CHARLES CAMPBELL NAMING ROES 7 TO BE BOURNE ROOFING FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF CHARLES CAMPBELL NAMING ROES 3 TO BE AMS STAFF LEASING N.A., INC. FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 41 TO BE ULTRA-WALL, INC. FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 43 TO BE VERMAX, INC. FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 28 TO BE ORANGE STAIR & MILLWORK INC. FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 23 TO BE MARBLEDGE CALIFORNIA, INC. FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 19 TO BE JRC CONSTRUCTION, INC. FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD | |
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 8 TO BE CERAMICSTYLE, INC FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 31 TO BE REGAL CULTURED MARBLE, INC., REYKDAL PLASTERING FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 46 TO BE WINDOW LOGIC CORP. FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 22 TO BE M&R WOOD PRODUCTS FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 10 TO BE CWP SURFACES AND DESIGNS, INC. FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 12 TO BE DESIGNER CHOICE CABINETS FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED Cross-Complaint OF WHISPER RANCH LTD NAMING ROES 7 TO BE BOURNE ROOFING FILED |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Party Removed ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF CHARLES CAMPBELL, BUILT RIGHT CONSTRUCTION, INC. REMOVED AS A PARTY. |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Party Removed ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF CHARLES CAMPBELL, B&D GRANITE, INC. REMOVED AS A PARTY. |
|
October 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant DISMISSAL FILED AS TO LAMCO HOUSING, INC, WESTERN PACIFIC HOUSING-MURRIETA, LLC, WITHOUT PREJUDICE |