Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
VIAMONTES-V-ADVANCE(COMPLEX) Print
On December 20, 2018 an employment - complex case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. Judge David Cohn presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 20, 2018
Last Refreshed
August 30, 2023
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
San Bernardino
Category
Employment-Other-Complex
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Matter Type
General Employment
Status
Removal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: Mar 14, 2019Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: Dec 20, 2018Summons Issued and Filed
Date: Dec 20, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: Dec 20, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2019 | |||
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: STATUS CONFERENCE |
|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION TRIAL JUDGE FILED BY LISET VIAMONTES. |
|
September 13, 2019 |
Judge: Cohn, David |
||
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court Orders Matter Stayed MATTER STAYED |
|
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: NOTICE OF COORDINATION ORDER DAVID COHN,JUDGE CLERK: ERIN MUELLER MATTER NOT REPORTED OR ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED. COURT ATTENDANT CHRISTIAN HERNANDEZ - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD THE COURT NOTES AN ORDER HAS BEEN ENTERED GRANTING THE PETITION FOR COORDINATION. THE COURT STAYS THIS PROCEEDING PENDING FURTHER ORDER OF THE COORDINATION TRIAL JUDGE. NO FUTURE HEARING DATES SET. NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER DATED 9/13/19 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY LISET VIAMONTES FOR FAX FILING 190809-0746-VS FAX/ 8.00 PAYMT 190809-0746-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 033-0144454265 | |
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Document(s) Placed in File NOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR COORDINATION JCCP NO.5019 PLACED IN FILE |
|
June 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Document(s) Placed in File SERVICE COPY OF DECLARATION OF SCOTT A. BROOKS RE COURT'S MAY 23, 2019 ORDR & EXHIBITS PLACED IN FILE |
|
June 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Document(s) Placed in File SERVICE COPY OF NTC OF CONTINUED JUNE 20, 2019 HRG ON PET FOR COORDINATION & COURT ORDERS PLACED IN FILE |
|
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Document(s) Placed in File JUDICIAL COUNCIL COORDINATION PROCEEDING NO. 5019 PLACED IN FILE |
|
May 15, 2019 |
Judge: Cohn, David |
||
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. DAVID COHN,JUDGE CLERK: JESSICA MORALES COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA;12612 COURT ATTENDANT CHRISTIAN HERNANDEZ - APPEARANCES: SCOTT BROOKS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR LISET VIAMONTES. ALEXANDER CHEMERS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC, ADVANCE AMERICA, CAS ADVANCE CENTERS OF. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD COUNSEL INFORMS THE COURT A HEARING FOR COORDINATION IN ORANGE COUNTY HAD BEEN SET FOR 5/23/19. - COURT ORDERS CASE STAYED PENDING RULING ON COORDINATION CASE IN ORANGE COUNTY. - HEARINGS: HEARING RE:STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 09/16/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26. NOTICE WAIVED. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF PETITION FOR COORDINATION FILED BY LISET VIAMONTES. |
|
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S) | |
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): NTC OF SUBMISSION OF PET FOR COORDINATION BY PLA IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): DOCUMENT HAS BEEN PREVIOUSLY FILED ON 3/19/19 PLEAS. |
|
March 08, 2019 |
Judge: Cohn, David |
||
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. DAVID COHN,JUDGE CLERK: WIMALA BLANCHARD COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA;12612 COURT ATTENDANT P HERNANDEZ - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY MIKAEL STAHLE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. ATTORNEY ALEXANDER CHEMERS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC, ADVANCE AMERICA, CAS ADVANCE CENTERS OF. - PROCEEDINGS: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD. COURT NOTES RESPONSIVE PLEADING NOT YET FILED. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL INDICATES PETITION WILL BE SUBMITTED TO COORDINATION JUDGE IN ORANGE COUNTY. - COURT ORDERS STAY TO REMAIN IN EFFECT. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/15/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY LISET VIAMONTES, ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC, ADVANCE AMERICA, CAS ADVANCE CENTERS OF. | |
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY LISET VIAMONTES FOR FAX FILING OF JOINT CONFERENCE STATEMENT 190306-0427-VS FAX/ 9.00 PAYMT 190306-0427-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 033-0114834441 | |
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 033-0114834441 | |
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF GENERAL APPEARANCE FILED BY ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC, ADVANCE AMERICA, CAS ADVANCE CENTERS OF. |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC, ADVANCE AMERICA, CAS ADVANCE CENTERS OF. |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC, ADVANCE AMERICA, CAS ADVANCE CENTERS OF FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES 190211-0886-CK CVT/ 870.00 PAYMT 190211-0886-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 136840 | |
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY ADVANCE AMERICA, CAS ADVANCE CENTERS OF FOR COMPLEX FEES 190211-0898-CK COT/ 1000.00 PAYMT 190211-0898-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 136823 | |
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC FOR COMPLEX FEES 190211-0894-CK COT/ 1000.00 PAYMT 190211-0894-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 136824 | |
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND GUIDELINES TO COUNSEL OF RECORD LISET VIAMONTES, ADVANCE AMERICA, CAS ADVANCE CENTERS OF, ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE IMAGED | |
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER RE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY LISET VIAMONTES FOR COMPLEX FEES 181220-0454-CK COS/ 1000.00 PAYMT 181220-0454-CK REFERENCE NUMBER CK 3661557 | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Party Added ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF LISET VIAMONTES, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC., ADVANCE AMERICA, CAS ADVANCE CENTERS OF IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT. |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Party Removed ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF LISET VIAMONTES, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC. REMOVED AS A PARTY. |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | CORRECT CASE NAME. | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY LISET VIAMONTES FOR 1ST APPEARANCE 181220-0455-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 181220-0455-CK REFERENCE NUMBER CK 3661557 | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Update Party Address PARTY ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC UPDATED: NAME |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S26 |