Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
IN RE: KHASHAYAR SHAHBABAIE Print
On December 20, 2018 a petition for change of name case was filed by Shahbabaie, Khashayar, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. Judge Lynn M. Poncin presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 20, 2018
Last Refreshed
July 01, 2023
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
San Bernardino
Category
Petition re Change of Name
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Name Change
Status
Closed
Case Duration
1 month and 12 days
Overview
Causes of Action
ionyou should read the nstructions for Filing a Petition for Change ofNameform NC 100 INFO You
check all boxes that apply to you on this petition
You must file this petition in the superior court of the
name is to be changed resides
KHASHAYAR SHAHBABAIE resides in this county
court decree the following name changes list every name that you are seeking to change
sent name Proposed name
changed to KASHA SHAHABI
changed to
changed to
changed to
seeking to change additional names you must prepare a list and attach it to this petition as
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a petition for a change of name. The petitioner, Khashayar Shahbabaie, is requesting that the court decree a name change from Khashayar Shahbabaie to Kasha Shahabi. The petition states that it must be filed in the superior court…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Documents
Legacy Minutes
Date: Jan 31, 2019Decree Changing Name filed.
Date: Jan 31, 2019Proof of Publication re:
Date: Jan 23, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: Dec 20, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: Dec 20, 2018Petition Filed (Civil)
Date: Dec 20, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: Dec 20, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: NAME CHANGE LYNN PONCIN,JUDGE CLERK: ILAYALI WADE COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE COURT ATTENDANT T MEJIA - APPEARANCES: PETITIONER KHASHAYAR SHAHBABAIE PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED 08:39 PROOF OF PUBLICATION FILED IN COURT. COURT FINDS THERE IS APPROPRIATE SERVICE. WITNESS -- KHASHAYAR SHAHBABAIE IS SWORN AND EXAMINED. COURT FINDS ALLEGATIONS IN PETITION SUFFICIENT AND TRUE. NO OPPOSITION PRESENTED. DECREE CHANGING NAME IS SIGNED BY THE COURT. HENCEFORTH THE APPLICANT'S NAME SHALL BE KASHA SHAHABI. ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED. 08:43 ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Decree Changing Name filed. DECREE CHANGING NAME FROM KHASHAYAR SHAHBABAIE TO KASHA SHAHABI FILED. |
|
January 31, 2019 |
Judge: Poncin, Lynn |
||
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: KHASHAYAR SHAHBABAIE FILED. | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR CHANGE OF NAME FILED. |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | PETITION FILED (CIVIL) | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff First Paper Fee Previously Paid in Full PLAINTIFF KHASHAYAR SHAHBABAIE FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL. |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF PETITIONER AND REQUEST FOR RECORDS CHECK FILED |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | SET DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO S16 | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY KHASHAYAR SHAHBABAIE FOR FIRST APPEARANCE 181220-0347-MC CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 181220-0347-MC REFERENCE NUMBER 033-0101977672 |