Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
SYNCHRONY BANK-V-BORIS LOVE Print
On June 14, 2018 a rule 3.740 collections $10,000 or less limited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 14, 2018
Last Refreshed
August 30, 2023
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
San Bernardino
Category
Rule 3.740 Collections $10,000 or Less Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Request for Dismissal Filed
Date: Dec 11, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: Jun 14, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: Jun 14, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: Jun 14, 2018Summons Issued and Filed
Date: Jun 14, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2019 | |||
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
December 13, 2018 | |||
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. | |
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE IMAGED | |
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. | |
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED | |
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff First Paper Fee Previously Paid in Full PLAINTIFF SYNCHRONY BANK FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL. |
|
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17 | |
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY SYNCHRONY BANK FOR NEW FILIGN FEE 180619-0856-CK CLS/ 240.00 PAYMT 180619-0856-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 732104 | |
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED |