Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CAPITAL ONE BANK -V- TUCHAN Print
On March 22, 2018 a rule 3.740 collections $10,000 or less limited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 22, 2018
Last Refreshed
August 30, 2023
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
San Bernardino
Category
Rule 3.740 Collections $10,000 or Less Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Default Judgment
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of
Date: May 20, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: May 20, 2019Signed Judgment Filed With Court
Date: Jul 10, 2018Request for Entry of Default and Request for Clerks/Court
Date: Jul 10, 2018Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: Jul 10, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: Mar 22, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: Mar 22, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: Mar 22, 2018Summons Issued and Filed
Date: Mar 22, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - Los Angeles LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $37.18. |
|
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - Los Angeles WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. ( $3,695.33 ) |
|
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ Fee Paid WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID 190715-0793-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 190715-0793-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 121250 |
|
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $138.42) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) |
|
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.. |
|
March 27, 2019 | |||
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
September 28, 2018 | |||
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FOR ABSTRACT FEE 180824-0755-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 180824-0755-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 095512 | |
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED | |
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event | SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT. JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 07/10/18 JUDGMENT FOR: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. JUDGMENT AGAINST: OLDYN TUCHAN JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,221.91 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $310.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00. JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3531.91 STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON OLDYN TUCHAN. | |
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Does Only DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. AS TO DOES ONLY |
|
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1033 (B) FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. | |
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. AS TO OLDYN TUCHAN. |
|
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS ATTY REGARDING NONMILITARY STATUS FILED |
|
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Reqst for Court Judgment under CCP585D Filed DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED. |
|
April 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/28/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17. |
|
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO OLDYN TUCHAN SERVED ON 04/06/18 WITH FEES OF $70.00. |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE IMAGED | |
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. | |
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. | |
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED | |
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,221.91 | |
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEE 180327-0564-CK CLS/ 240.00 PAYMT 180327-0564-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 004695 | |
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED | |
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff First Paper Fee Previously Paid in Full PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL. |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17 | |
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Prayer for Interest Percentage at the Rate of PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0.00 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 03/22/18 |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY REGARDING NONMILITARY STATUS FILED |