Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CAPITAL ONE BANK -V- SANCHEZ Print
On March 22, 2018 a rule 3.740 collections $10,000 or less limited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 22, 2018
Last Refreshed
August 30, 2023
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
San Bernardino
Category
Rule 3.740 Collections $10,000 or Less Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Default Judgment
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: Jul 10, 2018Signed Judgment Filed With Court
Date: Jul 10, 2018Request for Entry of Default and Request for Clerks/Court
Date: Jul 10, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: Apr 09, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: Mar 22, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: Mar 22, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: Mar 22, 2018Summons Issued and Filed
Date: Mar 22, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2019 | |||
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
September 28, 2018 | |||
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED 180820-0906-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 180820-0906-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 95513 | |
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Does Only DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. AS TO DOES ONLY |
|
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event | SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT. JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 07/10/18 JUDGMENT FOR: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. JUDGMENT AGAINST: MONICA SANCHEZ JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,041.79 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $310.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00. JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $5351.79 STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON MONICA SANCHEZ. | |
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Reqst for Court Judgment under CCP585D Filed DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED. |
|
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY REGARDING NONMILITARY STATUS FILED |
|
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. AS TO MONICA SANCHEZ. |
|
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: PURSUANT TO CODE CIVIL PROCEDURE 1033 (B) FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. | |
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MONICA SANCHEZ; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 04/05/18 WITH COSTS OF $70.00 FILED. |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE IMAGED | |
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. | |
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. | |
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED | |
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Prayer for Interest Percentage at the Rate of PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0.00 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 03/22/18 |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff First Paper Fee Previously Paid in Full PLAINTIFF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL. |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $5,041.79 | |
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEE 180327-0505-CK CLS/ 240.00 PAYMT 180327-0505-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 004691 | |
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY REGARDING NONMILITARY STATUS FILED |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED | |
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17 |