Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CAVALRY SPV -V- TIM HAMILTON Print
On October 23, 2017 a rule 3.740 collections $10,000 or less limited case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 23, 2017
Last Refreshed
August 30, 2023
Filing Location
San Bernardino County, CA
Filing Court House
San Bernardino
Category
Rule 3.740 Collections $10,000 or Less Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Proof of Service UNSERVED Filed
Date: Jan 29, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: Oct 23, 2017Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: Oct 23, 2017Notice Imaged
Date: Oct 23, 2017Summons Issued and Filed
Date: Oct 23, 2017Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2018 | |||
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
April 23, 2018 | |||
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service UNSERVED Filed PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO TIM HAMILTON WITH COSTS OF $75.00 |
|
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. | |
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Prayer for Interest Percentage at the Rate of PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0% PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 10/23/17 |
|
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event | PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $8,557.21 | |
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff First Paper Fee Previously Paid in Full PLAINTIFF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL. |
|
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. | |
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES 171025-0520-CK CLS/ 240.00 PAYMT 171025-0520-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 0762774 | |
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE IMAGED | |
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED | |
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17 | |
October 23, 2017 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FILED |